This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/24/2021 at 10:27:21 (UTC).

SBP Royal Dane Mall, LLC v. CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYDS OF LONDON subscribing to Policy numbered B1230GP01654A19 et al

Case Summary

On 06/25/2021 SBP Royal Dane Mall, LLC filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYDS OF LONDON subscribing to Policy numbered B1230GP01654A19. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Virgin Islands District. The Judges overseeing this case are Ruth Miller and Robert A. Molloy. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-00054

  • Filing Date:

    06/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Ruth Miller

Presiding Judge

Robert A. Molloy

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SBP Royal Dane Mall, LLC

5600 Royal Dane Mallsuite 22

St. Thomas, VI 00802

Defendants

CHARLES TAYLOR ADJUSTING LIMITED

CHRISTOPHER H. GAMBOL

South Haven, MI 49090-1774

MARSHALL & STERLING ST. THOMAS, INC. d/b/a THEODORE TUNICK & COMPANY

1336 Beltjen Roadsuite 300

St. Thomas, VI 00802

CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYDS OF LONDON subscribing to Policy numbered B1230GP01654A19

Thompson Heath and Bond, Ltd.

107 Leadenhall Streetlondon Eca3 4Af

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Michael L. Sheesley

Attorney at MLSPC

P O Box 307728

St Thomas, VI 00803

Defendant Attorneys

Gregory Lee Mast

Attorney at Fields Howell LLP

1180 W. Peachtree Streetste 1600

Atlanta, GA 30309

Robert J. Kuczynski

Attorney at Law Office Of Beckstedt & Associates

2162 Church Street

Christiansted, VI 00820

John Golden

9155 S Dadeland Blvd.Suite 1012

Miami, FL 33156

 

Court Documents

24 #1

Affidavit Affidavit of Service - VITEMA

#24

23 #1

Affidavit Affidavit of Service - VIPD

#23

22 #1

Affidavit Affidavit of Service - VIFS

#22

21 #1

Affidavit Affidavit of Service - VIFS (Gladys Cafe)

#21

#20

#2

1 #8

Summons - Gambol

1 #7

Summons - Charles Taylor

1 #6

Summons - Marshall

1 #5

Summons - Thompson

1 #4

Summons - Lloyd's

1 #3

Corporate Disclosure Statement

1 #2

Exhibit Exhibit A - news article

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

45 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) Subpoena Returned Executed (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Service - VITEMA) (Sheesley, Michael) (Entered: 08/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) Subpoena Returned Executed (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Service - VIPD) (Sheesley, Michael) (Entered: 08/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) Subpoena Returned Executed (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Service - VIFS) (Sheesley, Michael) (Entered: 08/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) Subpoena Returned Executed (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Service - VIFS (Gladys Cafe)) (Sheesley, Michael) (Entered: 08/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) Subpoena Returned Executed (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Service - VIFS (Gladys Cafe)) (Sheesley, Michael) (Entered: 08/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) ORDER (RM) granting #18 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. CHARLES TAYLOR ADJUSTING LIMITED's answer due 9/1/2021; CHRISTOPHER H. GAMBOL's answer due 9/7/2021. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (Entered: 08/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,, by Defendants CHARLES TAYLOR ADJUSTING LIMITED, CHRISTOPHER H. GAMBOL. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Ruth Miller. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Exhibit A - Proposed Order) (Mast, Gregory) (Entered: 08/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory Lee Mast on behalf of Defendants CHARLES TAYLOR ADJUSTING LIMITED, CHRISTOPHER H. GAMBOL (Mast, Gregory) (Entered: 08/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) NOTICE Notice of Intent to Serve Subpoenas by SBP Royal Dane Mall, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Subpoena - VITEMA, #2 Exhibit Subpoena - VIFS, #3 Exhibit Subpoena - VIFS (Gladys), #4 Exhibit Subpoena - VIPD, #5 Exhibit Subpoena - VIDLCA (Gladys), #6 Exhibit Subpoena - ESI Houston) (Sheesley, Michael) (Entered: 08/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory Lee Mast on behalf of Defendant CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYDS OF LONDON subscribing to Policy numbered B1230GP01654A19 (Mast, Gregory) (Entered: 07/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 07/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) SUMMONS Returned Executed by SBP Royal Dane Mall, LLC. CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYDS OF LONDON subscribing to Policy numbered B1230GP01654A19 served on 7/6/2021, answer due 7/27/2021. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Service_LLoyd's) (Sheesley, Michael) (Entered: 07/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) STIPULATION Re: Extension of Time by MARSHALL & STERLING ST. THOMAS, INC. d/b/a THEODORE TUNICK & COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Kuczynski, Robert) (Entered: 07/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Robert J. Kuczynski on behalf of Defendant MARSHALL & STERLING ST. THOMAS, INC. d/b/a THEODORE TUNICK & COMPANY (Kuczynski, Robert) (Entered: 07/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • Docket(#7) CLERK'S NOTICE to Parties of Consent and Reference of A Civil Action to Magistrate Judge issued to plaintiff(s) Michael Sheesley with a copy of Notice attached to each summons (W, K) (Entered: 06/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Issued as to CHRISTOPHER H. GAMBOL. (W, K) (Entered: 06/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to CHARLES TAYLOR ADJUSTING LIMITED. (W, K) (Entered: 06/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to MARSHALL & STERLING ST. THOMAS, INC. d/b/a THEODORE TUNICK & COMPANY. (W, K) (Entered: 06/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Thompson Heath and Bond, Ltd.. (W, K) (Entered: 06/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYDS OF LONDON subscribing to Policy numbered B1230GP01654A19. (W, K) (Entered: 06/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYDS OF LONDON subscribing to Policy numbered B1230GP01654A19, CHARLES TAYLOR ADJUSTING LIMITED, CHRISTOPHER H. GAMBOL, MARSHALL & STERLING ST. THOMAS, INC. d/b/a THEODORE TUNICK & COMPANY, Thompson Heath and Bond, Ltd. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AVIDC-942616.)filed by SBP Royal Dane Mall, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A - news article, #3 Corporate Disclosure Statement, #4 Summons - Lloyd's, #5 Summons - Thompson, #6 Summons - Marshall, #7 Summons - Charles Taylor, #8 Summons - Gambol) (Sheesley, Michael) (Entered: 06/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Robert J. Kuczynski

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Gregory Lee Mast