This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/05/2022 at 13:16:50 (UTC).

SB IP Holdings LLC v. Vivint Smart Home, Inc.

Case Summary

On 12/07/2021 SB IP Holdings LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Vivint Smart Home, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are George H. Wu and Gail J. Standish. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-09472

  • Filing Date:

    12/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

George H. Wu

Referral Judge

Gail J. Standish

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SB IP Holdings LLC

Defendant

Vivint Smart Home, Inc.

Interested Party

David Keyzer

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

James Robert Perkins

Attorney at Cole Schotz, PC

901 Main Street, Suite 4120

Dallas, TX 75202

Niky R. Bagley

Attorney at Cole Schotz, PC

901 Main Street, Suite 4120

Dallas, TX 75202

Timothy J. H. Craddock

Attorney at Cole Schotz, PC

901 Main Street, Suite 4120

Dallas, TX 75202

Gary R. Sorden

Attorney at Cole Schotz PC

901 Main Street, Suite 4120

Dallas, TX 75202

Aaron D. Davidson

Attorney at Cole Schotz, PC

901 Main Street, Suite 4120

Dallas, TX 75202

Brian L. King

Attorney at Cole Schotz PC

901 Main Street, Suite 4120

Dallas, TX 75202

Hoda Rifai-Bashjawish

Attorney at Cole Schotz Meisel Forman and Leonard, PA

25 Main Street

Hackensack, NJ 07601

Defendant Attorneys

Andy Tindel

Attorney at Mann Tindel and Thompson - Attorneys at Law

112 East Line, Suite 304

Tyler, TX 75702

Brian Lance Jensen

Attorney at Maschoff Brennan Laycock Gilmore Israelsen and Wright PLLC

1389 Center Drive, Suite 300

Park City, UT 84089

David R. Wright

Attorney at Foley and Lardner LLP

299 South Main Street, Suite 2000

Salt Lake City, UT 84111

Kirk R. Harris

Attorney at Maschoff Brennan Laycock Gilmore Israelsen and Wright PLLC

1389 Center Drive, Suite 300

Park City, UT 84098

Michael A. Manookin

Attorney at Foley and Lardner LLP

299 South Main Street, Suite 2000

Salt Lake City, UT 84111

Michelle A. Moran

Attorney at Foley and Lardner LLP

777 East Wisconsin Avenue

Milwaukee, WI 53202

Sterling Arthur Brennan

Attorney at Maschoff Brennan Gilmore and Israelsen

100 Spectrum Center Drive Suite 1200

Irvine, CA 92618

Trevor L. Clark

Attorney at Maschoff Brennan Laycock Gilmore Israelsen and Wright PLLC

111 South Main Street Suite 600

Salt Lake City, UT 84111

Tyler Dever

Attorney at Maschoff Brennan

111 South Main Street, Suite 600

Salt Lake City, UT 84111

5 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#99

(#99) ORDER by Judge George H. Wu granting #98 Non-Resident Attorney Kumar Vinnakota APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of SkyBell Technologies, Inc., designating Aaron L Renfro as local counsel. (bm) (Entered: 02/03/2022)

98 #2

Proposed Order

98 #1

Texas Certificate of Good Standing

98 #98

Main Document

97 #1

Exhibit 2

97 #97

Main Document

96 #3

Exhibit 3

96 #1

Exhibit 1

96 #96

Main Document

1 #8

Exhibit G

1 #7

Exhibit F

1 #6

Exhibit E

1 #5

Exhibit D

1 #4

Exhibit C

1 #3

Exhibit B

1 #2

Exhibit A

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Main Document

109 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#99) ORDER by Judge George H. Wu granting #98 Non-Resident Attorney Kumar Vinnakota APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of SkyBell Technologies, Inc., designating Aaron L Renfro as local counsel. (bm) (Entered: 02/03/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#98) APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Rajakumar Vinnakota to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Counter Defendant Skybell Technologies, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-32724704) filed by Counterclaim Defendant Skybell Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Texas Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (Renfro, Aaron) (Entered: 02/02/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#97) Responsive Claim Construction BRIEF filed by Counterclaim Defendant Skybell Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2)(Renfro, Aaron) (Entered: 02/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#96) Responsive Claim Construction Brief BRIEF filed by Counterclaim Plaintiff Vivint Smart Home, Inc.. regarding Brief (non-motion non-appeal) #95 . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Brennan, Sterling) (Entered: 02/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#95) Opening Claim Construction BRIEF filed by Counterclaim Defendant Skybell Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Renfro, Aaron) (Entered: 02/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#94) Opening Claim Construction BRIEF filed by Counterclaim Plaintiff Vivint Smart Home, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(Brennan, Sterling) (Entered: 02/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#91) NOTICE OF LODGING filed re Scheduling Conference - optional html form,, Set/Reset Hearing, #90 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Letter, #2 Exhibit 2-DKT 88-1)(Brennan, Sterling) (Entered: 01/31/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#93) ORDER by Judge George H. Wu: granting #89 Non-Resident Attorney Vishal H. Patel APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of counterclaim defendant SkyBell Technologies Inc, designating Aaron L. Renfro as local counsel. (mrgo) (Entered: 01/31/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#92) ORDER by Judge George H. Wu: granting #88 Non-Resident Attorney Brian L. King APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of counterclaim defendant SkyBell Technologies Inc, designating Aaron L. Renfro as local counsel. (mrgo) (Entered: 01/31/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#90) MINUTES OF TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held before Judge George H. Wu. Court and counsel discuss scheduling. The Court sets a Markman Hearing for February 28, 2022 at 8:30 a.m. A Tutorial Hearing is set for February 23, 2022 at 9:30 a.m. Tutorial Markman Hearing will be held by video teleconference. All final documents are to be filed by noon on February 17, 2022. Court Reporter: Terri A. Hourigan. (mrgo) (Entered: 01/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
90 More Docket Entries
  • 02/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Brian Lance Jensen on behalf of Vivint Smart Home, Inc. (Jensen, Brian) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 12/17/2021.] (Entered: 02/03/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • DocketDefendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Vivint Smart Home, Inc. to 2/10/2021. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( rpc, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 12/17/2021.] (Entered: 01/05/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Vivint Smart Home, Inc..( Hardt, Jonathan) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 12/17/2021.] (Entered: 01/05/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by SB IP Holdings LLC. Vivint Smart Home, Inc. served on 12/21/2020, answer due 1/11/2021. (Sorden, Gary) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 12/17/2021.] (Entered: 12/22/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS Issued as to Vivint Smart Home, Inc. (rpc, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 12/17/2021.] (Entered: 12/21/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • DocketIn accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (rpc, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 12/17/2021.] (Entered: 11/17/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • DocketCase Assigned to District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III. (rpc, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 12/17/2021.] (Entered: 11/17/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by SB IP Holdings LLC (Sorden, Gary) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 12/17/2021.] (Entered: 11/17/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Sorden, Gary) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 12/17/2021.] (Entered: 11/17/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT against Vivint Smart Home, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-8110449.), filed by SB IP Holdings LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G)(Sorden, Gary) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 12/17/2021.] (Entered: 11/17/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less