This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/12/2019 at 07:56:30 (UTC).

Saxon Global Inc v. Cuccinelli

Case Summary

On 09/13/2019 Saxon Global Inc filed an Immigration - Other Immigration lawsuit against Cuccinelli. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Sam A. Lindsay and David L. Horan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-02194

  • Filing Date:

    09/13/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Immigration - Other Immigration

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Sam A. Lindsay

Referral Judge

David L. Horan

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Saxon Global Inc

Techstra Solutions LLC

Techno Bytes Inc

Genius Minds LLC

Pyramid Consulting Inc

Lucid Technologies Inc

Riverpoint MGMT LLC

Binary Computer Intl Corp.

Denken Solutions Inc

Redbud Technologies Inc

Vastek Inc

Lean Innovation Labs LLC

Defendant

Kenneth T Cuccinelli

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Bradley Banias

Attorney at Barnwell Whaley Patterson Helms

288 Meeting Street, Suite 200

Charleston, SC 29401

Sharadha Gangaikondan Sankararaman

Attorney at Kodem Law Firm PLLC

4251 Shady Hill Drive

Dallas, TX 75229

Defendant Attorney

Sarah Elizabeth Delaney-DOJ

Attorney at US Attorney's Office

1100 Commerce Street, Suite 300

Dallas, TX 75242-1699

 

Court Documents

#22

#21

RESTRICTED

#20

RESTRICTED

#19

RESTRICTED

#18

RESTRICTED

#17

RESTRICTED

#16

RESTRICTED

#15

#14

RESTRICTED

#8

#6

RESTRICTED

#5

RESTRICTED

#4

RESTRICTED

#3

RESTRICTED

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) ELECTRONIC Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge David L. Horan: Motion Hearing held on 11/7/2019 re #6 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Order to enter. Attorney Appearances: Plaintiff - Bradley Banias; Defense - Sarah Elizabeth Delaney. (Court Reporter: Shawn McRoberts) (No exhibits) Time in Court - :36. (mcrd) (Entered: 11/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) ORDER SETTING HEARING ON #6 MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION: The Court now SETS the motion for preliminary injunction for hearing on 11/7/2019 at 10:00 AM in US Courthouse, Courtroom 1561, 1100 Commerce St., Dallas, TX 75242-1310 before Magistrate Judge David L. Horan. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Horan on 10/29/2019) (twd) (Entered: 10/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) RESPONSE filed by Kenneth T Cuccinelli re: #19 Notice (Other), (Delaney-DOJ, Sarah) (Entered: 10/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) REPLY filed by Binary Computer Intl Corp., Denken Solutions Inc, Genius Minds LLC, Lean Innovation Labs LLC, Lucid Technologies Inc, Pyramid Consulting Inc, Redbud Technologies Inc, Saxon Global Inc, Techno Bytes Inc, Techstra Solutions LLC, Vastek Inc re: #6 MOTION Preliminary Injunction (Banias, Bradley) (Entered: 10/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) NOTICE of New Plaintiffs Joining In the Pending re: #6 MOTION Preliminary Injunction filed by Binary Computer Intl Corp., Denken Solutions, Inc., Genius Minds LLC, Lean Innovation Labs LLC, Lucid Technologies Inc, Pyramid Consulting, Inc., Redbud Technologies Inc, Saxon Global Inc, Techno Bytes, Inc., Techstra Solutions, LLC, Vastek Inc (Banias, Bradley) (Entered: 10/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Kenneth T Cuccinelli filed by Redbud Technologies Inc, Lucid Technologies Inc, Lean Innovation Labs LLC, Saxon Global Inc, Vastek Inc, Techstra Solutions, LLC, Genius Minds LLC, Denken Solutions, Inc., Techno Bytes, Inc., Binary Computer Intl Corp., Pyramid Consulting, Inc.. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Banias, Bradley) (Entered: 10/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) Appendix in Support filed by Kenneth T Cuccinelli re #16 Response/Objection to #6 Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Delaney-DOJ, Sarah) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) RESPONSE filed by Kenneth T Cuccinelli re: #6 MOTION Preliminary Injunction (Delaney-DOJ, Sarah) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) ORDER granting #14 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Defendant shall respond to the Motion for Preliminary Injunction on or before October 15, 2019. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Horan on 10/9/2019) (mcrd) (Entered: 10/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) Unopposed MOTION to Extend Time to Respond to Plaintiff Saxon Global, Inc.'s Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Kenneth T Cuccinelli with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Delaney-DOJ, Sarah) (Entered: 10/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 09/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ORDER granting #2 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Bradley B. Banias. Important Reminder: Unless excused for cause, an attorney who is not an ECF user must register within 14 days of the date the attorney appears in a case pursuant to LR 5.1(f) and LCrR 49.2(g). The Court will set an expedited briefing schedule and hearing on the request for a preliminary injunction once counsel for USCIS appears. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Horan on 9/19/2019) (axm) Modified filed date on 9/20/2019 (axm). (Entered: 09/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE of Filing Proof of Service as to Kenneth T Cuccinelli; served on 9/18/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A - Proof of Service) (Banias, Bradley) Modified text on 9/21/2019 (axm). (Entered: 09/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) STANDING ORDER OF REFERENCE: This case is hereby referred to United States Magistrate Judge David L. Horan for pretrial management. All nondispositive motions, pending or prospective, are referred to the magistrate judge for determination. All dispositive motions, pending or prospective, are referred to the magistrate judge for findings of fact and recommendations. (Ordered by Judge Sam A. Lindsay on 9/19/2019) (aaa) (Entered: 09/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Saxon Global Inc re #6 MOTION Preliminary Injunction (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A: 2018 Memo, #2 Exhibit(s) B: Saxon Denial 1, #3 Exhibit(s) C: Saxon Denial 2, #4 Exhibit(s) D: Saxon Denial 3, #5 Exhibit(s) E: Saxon Denial 4, #6 Exhibit(s) F: ITServe Transcript) (Banias, Bradley) (Entered: 09/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MOTION Preliminary Injunction filed by Saxon Global Inc (Banias, Bradley) (Entered: 09/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Summons issued as to Kenneth T Cuccinelli, U.S. Attorney, and U.S. Attorney General. (sre) (Entered: 09/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (sre) (Entered: 09/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Saxon Global Inc. (Sankararaman, Sharadha) (Entered: 09/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $100; Receipt number 0539-10264213) filed by Saxon Global Inc (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing) (Banias, Bradley) (Entered: 09/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Kenneth T Cuccinelli filed by Saxon Global Inc. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-10264184) Clerk to issue summons(es) for federal defendant(s). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Summons - USAG, #3 Summons - USAO, #4 Summons - USCIS) (Sankararaman, Sharadha) (Entered: 09/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Vastek, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Sharadha Gangaikondan Sankararaman

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Bradley Bruce Banias