This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/07/2022 at 17:26:39 (UTC).

Saxena v. United States Citizenship & Immigration Services (USCIS) et al

Case Summary

On 09/08/2022 Saxena filed an Immigration - Other Immigration lawsuit against United States Citizenship Immigration Services USCIS. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:22-CV-05111

  • Filing Date:

    09/08/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Immigration - Other Immigration

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Dr. Vimal Deep Saxena

Defendants

United States Citizenship & Immigration Services (USCIS)

Ur Jaddou

Alejandro Mayorkas

Alissa Emmel

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Megan Nicole Guzman

Attorney at Law Office of Megan Guzman

1075 N Tustin Street, #5365

Orange, CA 92863

 

Court Documents

#2

RESTRICTED

#5

RESTRICTED

#6

(#6) Immigration Mandamus Case Procedural Order. (kkp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2022) (Entered: 09/09/2022)

#7

RESTRICTED

#8

RESTRICTED

#9

RESTRICTED

#10

RESTRICTED

12 #12

Main Document

12 #1

Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu no longer assigned to case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by The Clerk on 10/18/2022. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(jrs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2022) (Entered: 10/19/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2022
  • Docket(#11) CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/18/2022) (Entered: 10/18/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Vimal Deep Saxena.. (Guzman, Megan) (Filed on 10/18/2022) (Entered: 10/18/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SECOND CLERK'S NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: #http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 10/26/2022. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/12/2022) (Entered: 10/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CLERK'S NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 10/11/2022. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/26/2022) (Entered: 09/26/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Certificate of Interested Entities by Vimal Deep Saxena. CORRECTION OF DOCKET #2 . (Guzman, Megan) (Filed on 9/9/2022) Modified on 9/9/2022 (kkp, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 09/09/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Immigration Mandamus Case Procedural Order. (kkp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2022) (Entered: 09/09/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to Alissa Emmel, Ur Jaddou, Alejandro Mayorkas, United States Citizenship & Immigration Services (USCIS). (kkp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2022) (Entered: 09/09/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • Docket(#4) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 9/23/2022. (jrs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2022) (Entered: 09/09/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Proposed Summons. (Attachments: #1 Complaint Face Page)(Guzman, Megan) (Filed on 9/8/2022) (Entered: 09/08/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) *** DISREGARD, FILING ERROR. RE-FILED AT DOCKET #7 *** Certificate of Interested Entities by Vimal Deep Saxena (Guzman, Megan) (Filed on 9/8/2022) Modified on 9/9/2022 (kkp, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 09/08/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACANDC-17518758.). Filed byVimal Deep Saxena. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Guzman, Megan) (Filed on 9/8/2022) (Entered: 09/08/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where United States Department of Homeland Security is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Megan Nicole Guzman