This case was last updated from PACER on 02/04/2020 at 07:35:51 (UTC).

Savoie v. Carnival Corporation

Case Summary

On 12/06/2019 Savoie filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Carnival Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Federico A. Moreno. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-25032

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Federico A. Moreno

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Catherine Savoie

Defendant

Carnival Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

David W. Singer

Attorney at David W Singer & Associates PA

1011 S Federal Highway

Hollywood, FL 33020

Peter G Walsh

Attorney at David W. Singer & Associates, P.A.

1011 South Federal Highway

Hollywood, FL 33020

Defendant Attorney

John Michael Magee

Attorney at Carnival Cruise Lines

3655 Nw 87Th Avenue

Miami, FL 33178-2428

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MEDIATION. The mediation deadline is 5/8/2020. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 1/7/2020. See attached document for full details. (km02) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Mediator Selection. Selected/Added Dominic L. Brandy as Mediator. (Brandy, Dominic) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

#5

(#5) Defendant's ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint by Carnival Corporation. Attorney John Michael Magee added to party Carnival Corporation(pty:dft). (Magee, John) (Entered: 12/24/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#13

(#13) FINAL ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. Closing Case. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 1/23/2020. See attached document for full details. (km02) (Entered: 01/23/2020)

#12

(#12) STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice by Catherine Savoie (Walsh, Peter) (Entered: 01/23/2020)

#8

(#8) SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for the two-week period commencing 7/7/2020 before Judge Federico A. Moreno. Calendar Call set for 6/30/2020 at 2:00 PM before Judge Federico A. Moreno. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 1/7/2020. See attached document for full details. (km02) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here. (Entered: 01/07/2020)

#7

(#7) Plaintiff's Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by Catherine Savoie (Walsh, Peter) (Entered: 12/26/2019)

#4

(#4) SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Catherine Savoie. Carnival Corporation served on 12/9/2019, answer due 12/30/2019. (Walsh, Peter) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to Carnival Corporation. (kpe) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

#6

(#6) Defendant's Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by Carnival Corporation (Magee, John) (Entered: 12/24/2019)

#11

(#11) ORDER SCHEDULING MEDIATION before Mediator Dominic Brandy on 1/24/2020 at 9:00 AM. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 1/13/2020. See attached document for full details. (km02) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

1 #2

Summon(s)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Carnival Corporation. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-12205463, filed by Catherine Savoie. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s))(Singer, David) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) FINAL ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. Closing Case. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 1/23/2020. See attached document for full details. (km02) (Entered: 01/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice by Catherine Savoie (Walsh, Peter) (Entered: 01/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) ORDER SCHEDULING MEDIATION before Mediator Dominic Brandy on 1/24/2020 at 9:00 AM. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 1/13/2020. See attached document for full details. (km02) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE of Mediator Selection. Selected/Added Dominic L. Brandy as Mediator. (Brandy, Dominic) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MEDIATION. The mediation deadline is 5/8/2020. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 1/7/2020. See attached document for full details. (km02) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for the two-week period commencing 7/7/2020 before Judge Federico A. Moreno. Calendar Call set for 6/30/2020 at 2:00 PM before Judge Federico A. Moreno. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 1/7/2020. See attached document for full details. (km02) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here. (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Plaintiff's Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by Catherine Savoie (Walsh, Peter) (Entered: 12/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Defendant's Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by Carnival Corporation (Magee, John) (Entered: 12/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Defendant's ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint by Carnival Corporation. Attorney John Michael Magee added to party Carnival Corporation(pty:dft). (Magee, John) (Entered: 12/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Catherine Savoie. Carnival Corporation served on 12/9/2019, answer due 12/30/2019. (Walsh, Peter) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Summons Issued as to Carnival Corporation. (kpe) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • (#2) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Federico A. Moreno. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Lauren F. Louis is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (kpe) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Carnival Corporation. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-12205463, filed by Catherine Savoie. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s))(Singer, David) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.