Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 05/26/2020 at 07:39:24 (UTC).

Savino et al v. Hodgson et al

Case Summary

On 03/27/2020 Savino filed an Immigration - Habeas Corpus Alien Detainee lawsuit against Hodgson. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Massachusetts District. The Judge overseeing this case is William G. Young. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-10617

  • Filing Date:

    03/27/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Immigration - Habeas Corpus Alien Detainee

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Massachusetts District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

William G. Young

 

Party Details

Petitioners

Julio Cesar Medeiros Neves

Maria Alejandra Celimen Savino

Respondents

Matthew T. Albence

Thomas M. Hodgson

U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement (ICE)

Steven J. Souza

Chad F. Wolf

Todd Lyons

Amicus Curiae

Rick Raemisch

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Reena Parikh

Attorney at Yale Law School

127 Wall Street

New Haven, CT 06511

Ivan Espinoza-Madrigal

Attorney at Lawyers Committee for Civil Rights and Economic Justice

61 Batterymarch St, 5Th Floor

Boston, MA 02210

Oren N. Nimni

61 Batterymarch Street 5Th Floor

Boston, MA 02110

Michael J. Wishnie

Attorney at Yale Law School

127 Wall Street

New Haven, CT 06511

Oren M. Sellstrom

Attorney at Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights and Economic Justic

61 Batterymarch Street, 5Th Flr.

Boston, MA 02110

Nicole M.F. Dooley

Attorney at Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale and Dorr LLP (Bos)

60 State Street

Boston, MA 02109

Michael J. Brown

Attorney at Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale and Dorr LLP (Bos)

60 State Street

Boston, MA 02109

Muneer I. Ahmad

Attorney at Jerome N. Frank Legal Services Organization,

127 Wall Street

New Haven, CT 06520-0652

Gary B. Howell-Walton

Attorney at Wilmer Hale LLP

60 State Street

Boston, MA 02109

Annaleigh E. Curtis

Attorney at Wilmer Hale LLP

60 State Street

Boston, MA 02109

Lisa J. Pirozzolo

Attorney at Wilmer Hale LLP

60 State Street

Boston, MA 02109

Felicia H. Ellsworth

Attorney at Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale and Dorr LLP (Bos)

60 State Street

Boston, MA 02109

John J. Butts

Attorney at Wilmer Hale LLP

60 State Street

Boston, MA 02109

Vinita Ferrera

Attorney at Wilmer Hale LLP

60 State Street

Boston, MA 02109

Rama S. Attreya

Attorney at Wilmer Hale LLP

60 State Street

Boston, MA 02109

Respondent Attorneys

Thomas E. Kanwit

Attorney at United States Attorney's Office

Suite 9200, 1 Courthouse Way, John Joseph Moakley Federal Courthouse

Boston, MA 02210

Michael P. Sady

Attorney at United States Attorney's Office

1 Courthouse Way, Suite 9200

Boston, MA 02210

Amicus Curiae Attorney

William W. Fick

Attorney at Fick & Marx LLP

24 Federal Street, 4Th Flr.

Boston, MA 02110

3 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

185 #4

Exhibit 4

185 #3

Exhibit 3

185 #2

Exhibit 2

185 #1

Exhibit 1

#185

(#185) MOTION for Reconsideration of Preliminary Injunction Decision by Thomas M. Hodgson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Kanwit, Thomas) (Entered: 05/22/2020)

#184

RESTRICTED

#181

(#181) NOTICE by Steven J. Souza of Intent to Transfer Out (Kanwit, Thomas) (Entered: 05/20/2020)

#166

(#178) MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #166 MOTION to Compel Discovery Responses filed by Maria Alejandra Celimen Savino, Julio Cesar Medeiros Neves. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A, #2 Appendix B)(Butts, John) (Entered: 05/15/2020)

#11

RESTRICTED

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Oren M. Sellstrom on behalf of Maria Alejandra Celimen Savino, Julio Cesar Medeiros Neves (Sellstrom, Oren) (Entered: 03/27/2020)

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Vieira, Leonardo) (Entered: 03/27/2020)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Michael J. Wishnie on behalf of JULIO CESAR MEDEIROS NEVES, MARIA ALEJANDRA CELIM SAVINO (Wishnie, Michael) (Entered: 03/27/2020)

1 #5

*Restricted*

1 #4

*Restricted*

1 #3

Category Sheet

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet Attachment - Additional Counsel

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) Petition For Writ of Habeas Corpus Pursuant To 28 U.S.C. 2241 and For Declaratory and Injunctive Relief Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-8172787 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by JULIO CESAR MEDEIROS NEVES, MARIA ALEJANDRA CELIM SAVINO. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Attachment - Additional Counsel, #3 Category Sheet, #4 Exhibit A, #5 Exhibit B)(Nimni, Oren) (Attachment 1 replaced on 3/27/2020) (Vieira, Leonardo). (Modified on 3/27/2020 to Correct Docket Text as Counsel Filed the 2241 Habeas Under the Wrong Event in CM/ECF) (Paine, Matthew). (Entered: 03/27/2020)

303 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#185) MOTION for Reconsideration of Preliminary Injunction Decision by Thomas M. Hodgson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Kanwit, Thomas) (Entered: 05/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#184) MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Thomas M. Hodgson.(Kanwit, Thomas) (Entered: 05/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#183) ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Hearing. Hearing re #181 NOTICE by Steven J. Souza of Intent to Transfer Out set for 5/22/2020 09:00 AM by video before Judge William G. Young.This hearing will be conducted by video conference. Counsel of record will receive a video conference invite at the email registered in CM/ECF. If you have technical or compatibility issues with the technology, please notify the session's courtroom deputy as soon as possible.Access to the hearing will be made available to the media and public. In order to gain access to the hearing, you must sign up at the following address: #www.public.mad.uscourts.gov/seating-signup.html. For questions regarding access to hearings, you may refer to the Court's general orders and public notices available on #www.mad.uscourts.gov or contact media@mad.uscourts.gov. (Gaudet, Jennifer) (Entered: 05/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#182) Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered re #181 Notice of Intent to Transfer Out filed by Steven J. Souza. No one is to be moved until the testing ordered by the Court has been accomplished. (Gaudet, Jennifer) (Entered: 05/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#181) NOTICE by Steven J. Souza of Intent to Transfer Out (Kanwit, Thomas) (Entered: 05/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#180) Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting in part and denying in part #166 Motion to Compel. The motion to compel answers to interrogatories is ALLOWED as to interrogatories 6 and 9. The Court accepts plaintiffs counsels response that they have no such additional information as to interrogatory no. 6 after appropriate inquiry. Counsels objection to interrogatory no. 9 is overruled and a complete answer shall be furnished within 30 days of the date of this order. The motion is otherwise DENIED as immaterial. On or before Thursday, May 28, 2020 the defendants shall make a comprehensive and detailed report to the Court setting forth, with specific dates, the plan for testing staff and detainees at the Bristol facility as required by this Courts preliminary injunction. Comprehensive testing is key here. The Court is informed that the Massachusetts Department of Corrections has assured the Massachusetts Supreme Judicial Court that it is proceeding to test all DOC staff and is offering to test every inmate. Since, under our Constitution, ICE power to lock a person up is limited by its obligation to care for that person, surely ICE can be expected to care for its civil detainees at least as well as Massachusetts cares for its convicted felons. Since, under the orders presently. In place, no detainee is to leave the facility until such testing of staff and detainees has taken place, the defendants are under no additional duties to report beyond those presently ordered by this Court or other Judges thereof. (Gaudet, Jennifer) (Entered: 05/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#179) REPLY to Response to #11 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (Further Brief on Transfers Out) filed by Thomas M. Hodgson. (Kanwit, Thomas) (Entered: 05/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#178) MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #166 MOTION to Compel Discovery Responses filed by Maria Alejandra Celimen Savino, Julio Cesar Medeiros Neves. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A, #2 Appendix B)(Butts, John) (Entered: 05/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#177) BRIEF by Maria Alejandra Celimen Savino, Julio Cesar Medeiros Neves Further Briefing re Imminent Transfers. (Sellstrom, Oren) (Entered: 05/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#176) Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered re #173 MOTION Expedited Response to Motion to Compel filed by Thomas M. Hodgson. The Court requires a copy of the interrogatories sought to be enforced. (Gaudet, Jennifer) (Entered: 05/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
162 More Docket Entries
  • 03/27/2020
  • Docket(#10) ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case RE-Assignment. Judge William G. Young assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley. (Finn, Mary) (Entered: 03/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • Docket(#9) Judge Patti B. Saris: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. Pursuant to L.R. 40.1(g)(1) and (4), I find that this case is not related to 19-cv-11314-PBS or 13-cv-30125-PBS and therefore was erroneously assigned to me. The case is returned to the Clerk for random reassignment. (Lara, Miguel) (Entered: 03/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Judge Patti B. Saris: ELECTRONIC ORDER VACATING re 7 Standing Order on 2241 petitions - Alien Detainee, #6 General Order 19-02. (Lara, Miguel) (Entered: 03/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • Docket(#7) Judge Patti B. Saris: ORDER entered. STANDING ORDER on 2241 petitions regarding detention and removal of the Petitioner from the District of Massachusetts. (Lara, Miguel) (Entered: 03/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) General Order 19-02, dated June 1, 2019 regarding Public Access to Immigration Cases Restricted by Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 5.2(c). (Lara, Miguel) (Entered: 03/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Oren M. Sellstrom on behalf of Maria Alejandra Celimen Savino, Julio Cesar Medeiros Neves (Sellstrom, Oren) (Entered: 03/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Vieira, Leonardo) (Entered: 03/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • Docket(#3) ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Patti B. Saris assigned to case. (Finn, Mary) (Entered: 03/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Michael J. Wishnie on behalf of JULIO CESAR MEDEIROS NEVES, MARIA ALEJANDRA CELIM SAVINO (Wishnie, Michael) (Entered: 03/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Petition For Writ of Habeas Corpus Pursuant To 28 U.S.C. 2241 and For Declaratory and Injunctive Relief Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-8172787 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by JULIO CESAR MEDEIROS NEVES, MARIA ALEJANDRA CELIM SAVINO. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Attachment - Additional Counsel, #3 Category Sheet, #4 Exhibit A, #5 Exhibit B)(Nimni, Oren) (Attachment 1 replaced on 3/27/2020) (Vieira, Leonardo). (Modified on 3/27/2020 to Correct Docket Text as Counsel Filed the 2241 Habeas Under the Wrong Event in CM/ECF) (Paine, Matthew). (Entered: 03/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer William W. Fick