This case was last updated from PACER on 02/03/2020 at 07:44:36 (UTC).

Savich v. Nadia O'Neal, DDS, P.A.

Case Summary

On 12/05/2019 Savich filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against Nadia O'Neal, DDS, P A. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Virginia M. Hernandez Covington and Christopher P. Tuite. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:19-CV-02992

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Middle District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Virginia M. Hernandez Covington

Referral Judge

Christopher P. Tuite

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Yuriy Savich

Defendant

Nadia O'Neal, DDS, P.A.

Not Classified By Court

Mark A. Hanley

Tampa, FL 33602-5809

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Donna V. Smith

Attorney at Wenzel Fenton Cabassa, PA

1110 N Florida Ave Ste 300

Tampa, FL 33602-3343

Defendant Attorney

Max Richard Price, Jr.

Attorney at Law Offices of Max R. Price, PA

6701 Sunset Dr Ste 104

Miami, FL 33143-4529

Not Classified By Court Attorney

Mark A. Hanley

Attorney at Bradley Arant Boult Cummings LLP

100 N Tampa St Ste 2200

Tampa, FL 33602-5809

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) ORDER: Plaintiff is directed to effect service of process as required by Rule 4, Fed. R. Civ. P., and file proof thereof with the Court as soon as service has been effected. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 12/9/2019. (TWL) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

#10

(#10) SCHEDULING ORDER: The parties are directed to adhere to the Court's Scheduling Order. This action is hereby referred to Mark A. Hanley, Esq., for mediation. The parties must mediate no later than March 23, 2020. Lead Counsel shall file a notice of mediation informing the Court as to the date, time, and location of mediation by February 4, 2020. Neither party may reschedule or cancel the mediation conference once it is set; leave of Court must be obtained before the mediation conference may be rescheduled or cancelled. The parties shall not mediate until the information exchange outlined in the Scheduling Order is completed. Absent compelling circumstances and leave of Court, lead counsel must appear at the mediation conference. Lead Counsel shall file a notice informing the Court as to the results of mediation within 24 hours of the mediation conference. In the event mediation results in an impasse, the parties must file their jointly-prepared fast-track case management report within 24 hours of the mediation conference. Upon review of the jointly-prepared case management report, the Court will determine whether a case management hearing is necessary. If a case management hearing is necessitated, the Court will set the hearing by separate notice. Furthermore, if mediation results in an impasse, the Court intends to schedule this action for trial within 90-120 days from the mediation conference. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 1/10/2020. (TWL) (TWL). (Entered: 01/10/2020)

#2

(#2) PROPOSED summons to be issued by Yuriy Savich. (Smith, Donna) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

#14

(#14) ORDER appointing Mark Hanley as mediator in this action. The mediation conference is scheduled for March 19, 2020, at 9:30 AM. The Court directs that all counsel, parties, corporate representatives, and any other required claims professionals shall be present at the mediation conference with full authority to negotiate a settlement. The Court does not allow mediation by telephone or video conference. Personal attendance is required. See Local Rule 9.05(c). Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 1/27/2020. (SGM) (Entered: 01/27/2020)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Nadia O'Neal, DDS, P.A. with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-16220277) filed by Yuriy Savich.(Smith, Donna) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

#11

(#11) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Nadia O'Neal, DDS, P.A.. (Price, Max) (Entered: 01/17/2020)

#7

(#7) PROOF of service by Yuriy Savich (Smith, Donna) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

#4

(#4) SUMMONS issued as to Nadia O'Neal, DDS, P.A.. (BES) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

#13

(#13) NOTICE of mediation conference/hearing to be held on March 19, 2020 at 9:30am before Mark A. Hanley. (Smith, Donna) (Entered: 01/27/2020)

#5

(#5) RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 12/9/2019. (TWL) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #5 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Yuriy Savich. Related case(s): no (Smith, Donna) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ORDER appointing Mark Hanley as mediator in this action. The mediation conference is scheduled for March 19, 2020, at 9:30 AM. The Court directs that all counsel, parties, corporate representatives, and any other required claims professionals shall be present at the mediation conference with full authority to negotiate a settlement. The Court does not allow mediation by telephone or video conference. Personal attendance is required. See Local Rule 9.05(c). Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 1/27/2020. (SGM) (Entered: 01/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE of mediation conference/hearing to be held on March 19, 2020 at 9:30am before Mark A. Hanley. (Smith, Donna) (Entered: 01/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ENDORSED ORDER granting the unopposed motion for extension of time to file answer. (Doc. #11). Answer now due February 3, 2020. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 1/17/2020. (DMD) (Entered: 01/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Nadia O'Neal, DDS, P.A.. (Price, Max) (Entered: 01/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) SCHEDULING ORDER: The parties are directed to adhere to the Court's Scheduling Order. This action is hereby referred to Mark A. Hanley, Esq., for mediation. The parties must mediate no later than March 23, 2020. Lead Counsel shall file a notice of mediation informing the Court as to the date, time, and location of mediation by February 4, 2020. Neither party may reschedule or cancel the mediation conference once it is set; leave of Court must be obtained before the mediation conference may be rescheduled or cancelled. The parties shall not mediate until the information exchange outlined in the Scheduling Order is completed. Absent compelling circumstances and leave of Court, lead counsel must appear at the mediation conference. Lead Counsel shall file a notice informing the Court as to the results of mediation within 24 hours of the mediation conference. In the event mediation results in an impasse, the parties must file their jointly-prepared fast-track case management report within 24 hours of the mediation conference. Upon review of the jointly-prepared case management report, the Court will determine whether a case management hearing is necessary. If a case management hearing is necessitated, the Court will set the hearing by separate notice. Furthermore, if mediation results in an impasse, the Court intends to schedule this action for trial within 90-120 days from the mediation conference. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 1/10/2020. (TWL) (TWL). (Entered: 01/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • Docket(#9) Entry made in error(TWL). (Entered: 01/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #5 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Yuriy Savich. Related case(s): no (Smith, Donna) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) PROOF of service by Yuriy Savich (Smith, Donna) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER: Plaintiff is directed to effect service of process as required by Rule 4, Fed. R. Civ. P., and file proof thereof with the Court as soon as service has been effected. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 12/9/2019. (TWL) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 12/9/2019. (TWL) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS issued as to Nadia O'Neal, DDS, P.A.. (BES) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • Docket(#3) NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington and Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite. New case number: 8:19-cv-2992-T-33CPT. (SJB) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) PROPOSED summons to be issued by Yuriy Savich. (Smith, Donna) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Nadia O'Neal, DDS, P.A. with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-16220277) filed by Yuriy Savich.(Smith, Donna) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.