6:22-CV-01130
10/27/2022
Pending - Other Pending
Intellectual Property - Patent
Alan D Albright
Savannah Licensing LLC
Warby Parker Inc.
Howard L. Wernow
Main Document
Exhibit A-US8680992
Exhibit B-'992 Amended Notice of Allowance
Exhibit C-US9454777
Exhibit D-'777 Amended Notice of Allowance
Exhibit E-'992 Claim Chart
Exhibit F-'777 Claim Chart
Civil Cover Sheet
Civil Cover Sheet Related Cases
(#2) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Savannah Licensing LLC. (Wernow, Howard) (Entered: 10/27/2022)
(#3) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Wernow, Howard) (Entered: 10/27/2022)
(#4) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Savannah Licensing LLC. (Wernow, Howard) (Entered: 10/27/2022)
(#5) Summons Issued as to Warby Parker Inc.. (lad) (Entered: 10/28/2022)
(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Savannah Licensing LLC. Warby Parker Inc. served on 11/3/2022, answer due 11/28/2022. (Wernow, Howard) (Entered: 11/07/2022)
(#7) NOTICE for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by Savannah Licensing LLC re #1 Complaint, (Wernow, Howard) (Entered: 11/21/2022)
DocketReset Deadlines: Warby Parker Inc. answer due 2/24/2023. (bw) (Entered: 11/22/2022)
[-] Read LessDocket(#7) NOTICE for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by Savannah Licensing LLC re #1 Complaint, (Wernow, Howard) (Entered: 11/21/2022)
[-] Read LessDocket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Savannah Licensing LLC. Warby Parker Inc. served on 11/3/2022, answer due 11/28/2022. (Wernow, Howard) (Entered: 11/07/2022)
[-] Read LessDocket(#5) Summons Issued as to Warby Parker Inc.. (lad) (Entered: 10/28/2022)
[-] Read LessDocketCase assigned to Judge Alan D Albright due to related cases. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (lad) (Entered: 10/28/2022)
[-] Read LessDocket(#4) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Savannah Licensing LLC. (Wernow, Howard) (Entered: 10/27/2022)
[-] Read LessDocket(#3) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Wernow, Howard) (Entered: 10/27/2022)
[-] Read LessDocket(#2) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Savannah Licensing LLC. (Wernow, Howard) (Entered: 10/27/2022)
[-] Read LessDocket(#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATXWDC-16687362), filed by Savannah Licensing LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-US8680992, #2 Exhibit B-'992 Amended Notice of Allowance, #3 Exhibit C-US9454777, #4 Exhibit D-'777 Amended Notice of Allowance, #5 Exhibit E-'992 Claim Chart, #6 Exhibit F-'777 Claim Chart, #7 Civil Cover Sheet, #8 Civil Cover Sheet Related Cases)(Wernow, Howard) (Entered: 10/27/2022)
[-] Read Less