This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/28/2023 at 07:13:36 (UTC).

Savannah Licensing LLC v. Taco Bell Corp.

Case Summary

On November 29, 2022, Savannah Licensing LLC (“Plaintiff”), represented by Howard L. Wernow of Sand, Sebolt & Wernow, filed an intellectual property lawsuit against Taco Bell Corp. (“Defendant”), seeking declaratory and injunctive relief with damages for alleged infringement of U.S. patents owned by the plaintiff. This case was filed in the U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Ohio.

The plaintiff filed this complaint for the alleged infringement of U.S. patent Nos. 8,680,992 (“the ‘992 Patent”) and 9,454,777 (“the ‘777 Patent”) (collectively, the “Patents-in-Suit”) owned by the plaintiff.

In the complaint, the plaintiff stated, “Plaintiff is presently the owner of the ‘992 Patent, having received all right, title and interest in and to the ‘992 Patent from the previous assignee of record. Plaintiff possesses all rights of recovery under the ‘992 Patent, including the exclusive right to recover for past infringement.”

Plaintiff then alleged, “In violation of 35 U.S.C. § 271, Defendant is now, and has been directly infringing, either literally or under the doctrine of equivalents, the ‘992 Patent. Defendant has had knowledge of infringement of the ‘992 Patent at least as of the service of the present Complaint.”

The plaintiff further alleged, “Defendant has directly infringed and continues to directly infringe at least one claim of the ‘992 Patent by making, using, at least through internal testing or otherwise, offering to sell, selling and/or importing, without limitation, the Accused Instrumentality without authority in the United States, and will continue to do so unless enjoined by this Court. As a direct and proximate result of Defendant’s direct infringement of the ‘992 Patent, Plaintiff has been and continues to be damaged.”

Plaintiff also alleged, “Defendant has induced others to infringe the ‘992 Patent by encouraging infringement, knowing that the acts Defendant induced constituted patent infringement, and its encouraging acts actually resulted in direct patent infringement either literally or under the doctrine of equivalents.”

The plaintiff additionally alleged, “Defendant actively, knowingly, and intentionally has been and continues materially contribute to their own customers’ infringement of the ‘992 Patent, literally or by the doctrine of equivalents, by selling the Accused Instrumentality to their customers for use in end-user products in a manner that infringes one or more claims of the ‘992 Patent. Moreover, the Accused Instrumentality is not a staple article of commerce suitable for substantial non-infringing use.”

The plaintiff then alleged, “As a result of Defendant’s infringement of the ‘992 Patent, Plaintiff has suffered monetary damages and is entitled to a monetary judgment in an amount adequate to compensate for Defendant’s past infringement, together with interests and costs.”

Similar allegations have been made by the plaintiff with respect to other patents-in-suit.

Plaintiff presented two claims for relief from alleged infringement of the patents-in-suit.

In the prayer for relief, the plaintiff requested declaratory and injunctive relief along with an award of damages and an accounting of all infringing sales and damages.

This is a summary of a legal complaint. All statements, claims, and allegations listed herein reflect the position of the plaintiff only and do not represent the position of UniCourt. Additionally, this case summary may not reflect the current position of the parties to this litigation or the current status of this case. To view the latest case updates and court documents, please sign up for a UniCourt account.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:22-CV-02148

  • Filing Date:

    11/29/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John R. Adams

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Savannah Licensing LLC

Defendant

Taco Bell Corp.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Howard L. Wernow

Attorney at Sand, Sebolt & Wernow

1100 Aegis Tower, 4940 Munson Street, Nw

Canton, OH 44718

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) Marginal Entry Order of Case Dismissal without prejudice upon notice of voluntary dismissal by the plainitff. Judge John R. Adams on 1/26/23. (K,C) (Entered: 01/27/2023)

#8

(#8) Notice of Dismissal Under FRCP 41(a)(1) without Prejudice filed by Savannah Licensing LLC. (Wernow, Howard) (Entered: 01/26/2023)

#7

(#7) Stipulation & Order permitting the extension of time for Defendant to answer. Answer is due 2/17/22. All future requests for extension of time shall be made through motion practice. Judge John R. Adams on 1/4/23. (K,C) (Entered: 01/06/2023)

#6

(#6) Proposed Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint filed by Savannah Licensing LLC. (Wernow, Howard) (Entered: 01/03/2023)

#5

(#5) Return of Service by Clerk by certified mail executed upon Taco Bell Corp. on 12/12/2022, no delivery date on green card, date obtained from U.S. Postal Service website, filed on behalf of Savannah Licensing LLC. Related document(s) #4 (B,DL) (Entered: 12/19/2022)

4 #1

Magistrate Consent Form

#4

(#4) Original Summons issued to counsel for service upon Taco Bell Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (P,G) (Entered: 11/30/2022)

#3

(#3) Report on the Filing of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark (AO120) filed by Savannah Licensing LLC. (Wernow, Howard) (Entered: 11/29/2022)

#2

(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Savannah Licensing LLC. (Wernow, Howard) (Entered: 11/29/2022)

1 #8

Summons

1 #7

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #6

Exhibit Exhibit F-'777 Claim Chart

1 #5

Exhibit E-'992 Claim Chart

1 #4

Exhibit D-'777 Amended Notice of Allowance

1 #3

Exhibit C-US9454777

1 #2

Exhibit B-'992 Amended Notice of Allowance

1 #1

Exhibit A-US8680992

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Marginal Entry Order of Case Dismissal without prejudice upon notice of voluntary dismissal by the plainitff. Judge John R. Adams on 1/26/23. (K,C) (Entered: 01/27/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Notice of Dismissal Under FRCP 41(a)(1) without Prejudice filed by Savannah Licensing LLC. (Wernow, Howard) (Entered: 01/26/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Stipulation & Order permitting the extension of time for Defendant to answer. Answer is due 2/17/22. All future requests for extension of time shall be made through motion practice. Judge John R. Adams on 1/4/23. (K,C) (Entered: 01/06/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Proposed Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint filed by Savannah Licensing LLC. (Wernow, Howard) (Entered: 01/03/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Return of Service by Clerk by certified mail executed upon Taco Bell Corp. on 12/12/2022, no delivery date on green card, date obtained from U.S. Postal Service website, filed on behalf of Savannah Licensing LLC. Related document(s) #4 (B,DL) (Entered: 12/19/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2022
  • DocketService by Clerk. Summons and Complaint addressed to Taco Bell Corp. placed in U.S. Mail. Type of service: Certified Mail mail. Receipt # 7020 0090 0001 4429 2329. (P,G) (Entered: 12/09/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • DocketThis action has been identified as a Patent Case that is subject to the Local Patent Rules. Link to #Local Patent Rules. (P,G) (Entered: 11/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Original Summons issued to counsel for service upon Taco Bell Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (P,G) (Entered: 11/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • DocketRandom Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Henderson. (P,G) (Entered: 11/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • DocketJudge John R. Adams assigned to case. (P,G) (Entered: 11/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Report on the Filing of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark (AO120) filed by Savannah Licensing LLC. (Wernow, Howard) (Entered: 11/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Savannah Licensing LLC. (Wernow, Howard) (Entered: 11/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Complaint with jury demand against Taco Bell Corp.. Filing fee paid $ 402, Receipt number AOHNDC-11731491. Plaintiff has indicated that case may be related to pending civil action 5:22-cv-02146. Filed by Savannah Licensing LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-US8680992, #2 Exhibit B-'992 Amended Notice of Allowance, #3 Exhibit C-US9454777, #4 Exhibit D-'777 Amended Notice of Allowance, #5 Exhibit E-'992 Claim Chart, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F-'777 Claim Chart, #7 Civil Cover Sheet, #8 Summons) (Wernow, Howard) (Entered: 11/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less