This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/28/2023 at 08:20:22 (UTC).

Savannah Licensing LLC v. Quest Software Inc.

Case Summary

On 11/29/2022 Savannah Licensing LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Quest Software Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Ohio Southern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Michael H. Watson and Elizabeth Preston Deavers. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-04202

  • Filing Date:

    11/29/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Michael H. Watson

Referral Judge

Elizabeth Preston Deavers

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Savannah Licensing LLC

Defendant

Quest Software Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Howard L. Wernow

Andrew Scott Curfman

 

Court Documents

10 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#10

(#10) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, New date requested 2/23/2023. by Plaintiff Savannah Licensing LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Curfman, Andrew) (Entered: 01/06/2023)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Scott Curfman for Plaintiff Savannah Licensing LLC (Curfman, Andrew) (Entered: 01/06/2023)

#8

(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Quest Software Inc. c/o Corporation Service Co.-Riverside Dr., served on 12/19/2022. Answer due 1/9/2023. (vb) (Entered: 12/28/2022)

#7

(#7) NOTICE by Plaintiff Savannah Licensing LLC re #1 Complaint, of Report on the Filing of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark (Wernow, Howard) (Entered: 12/13/2022)

#6

(#6) CERTIFICATE of Mailing by the Clerk: A copy of the complaint and issued summons was sent to the named defendant via certified mail. Quest Software Inc. (2336) (tla) (Entered: 12/13/2022)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Issued as to Quest Software Inc.. (tla) (Entered: 12/07/2022)

4 #8

Summons Form

4 #7

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #8

Summons Form

1 #7

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #6

Exhibit F-'777 Claim Chart

1 #5

Exhibit E-'992 Claim Chart

1 #4

Exhibit D-'777 Amended Notice of Allowance

1 #3

Exhibit C-US9454777

1 #2

Exhibit B-'992 Amended Notice of Allowance

1 #1

Exhibit A-US8680992

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Quest Software Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402 paid - receipt number: AOHSDC-9158598), filed by Savannah Licensing LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-US8680992, #2 Exhibit B-'992 Amended Notice of Allowance, #3 Exhibit C-US9454777, #4 Exhibit D-'777 Amended Notice of Allowance, #5 Exhibit E-'992 Claim Chart, #6 Exhibit F-'777 Claim Chart, #7 Civil Cover Sheet, #8 Summons Form) (Wernow, Howard) (Entered: 11/29/2022)

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTATION ORDER granting #10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to #1 Complaint as to Quest Software Inc. Answer due 2/23/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 1/9/2023. (EPD) (Entered: 01/09/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, New date requested 2/23/2023. by Plaintiff Savannah Licensing LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Curfman, Andrew) (Entered: 01/06/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Scott Curfman for Plaintiff Savannah Licensing LLC (Curfman, Andrew) (Entered: 01/06/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Quest Software Inc. c/o Corporation Service Co.-Riverside Dr., served on 12/19/2022. Answer due 1/9/2023. (vb) (Entered: 12/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE by Plaintiff Savannah Licensing LLC re #1 Complaint, of Report on the Filing of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark (Wernow, Howard) (Entered: 12/13/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CERTIFICATE of Mailing by the Clerk: A copy of the complaint and issued summons was sent to the named defendant via certified mail. Quest Software Inc. (2336) (tla) (Entered: 12/13/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Issued as to Quest Software Inc.. (tla) (Entered: 12/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) AMENDED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Savannah Licensing LLC. . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-US8680992, #2 Exhibit B-'992 Amended Notice of Allowance, #3 Exhibit C-US9454777, #4 Exhibit D-'777 Amended Notice of Allowance, #5 Exhibit E-'992 Claim Chart, #6 Exhibit F-'777 Claim Chart, #7 Civil Cover Sheet, #8 Summons Form) (Wernow, Howard) (Entered: 11/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Clerk's Notice of Non-Compliance Local Rule 5.1 (c) re #1 Complaint filed by Savannah Licensing LLC. Non-Compliance Deadline due by 12/1/2022. (kk2) (Entered: 11/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff Savannah Licensing LLC. (Wernow, Howard) (Entered: 11/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Quest Software Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402 paid - receipt number: AOHSDC-9158598), filed by Savannah Licensing LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-US8680992, #2 Exhibit B-'992 Amended Notice of Allowance, #3 Exhibit C-US9454777, #4 Exhibit D-'777 Amended Notice of Allowance, #5 Exhibit E-'992 Claim Chart, #6 Exhibit F-'777 Claim Chart, #7 Civil Cover Sheet, #8 Summons Form) (Wernow, Howard) (Entered: 11/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less