This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/28/2023 at 10:03:35 (UTC).

Savannah Licensing LLC v. Optum, Inc.

Case Summary

On 11/29/2022 Savannah Licensing LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Optum, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Eastern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Amos L. Mazzant, III. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:22-CV-01014

  • Filing Date:

    11/29/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Amos L. Mazzant, III

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Savannah Licensing LLC

Defendant

Optum, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Howard Leigh Wernow

Attorney at Sand, Sebolt, & Wernow Co., LPA

Aegis Tower - Suite 1100, 4940 Munson St.

Canton, OH 44718

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Exhibit A-US8680992

1 #2

Exhibit B-'992 Amended Notice of Allowance

1 #3

Exhibit C-US9454777

1 #4

Exhibit D-'777 Amended Notice of Allowance

1 #5

Exhibit E-'992 Claim Chart

1 #6

Exhibit F-'777 Claim Chart

1 #7

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Savannah Licensing LLC (Wernow, Howard) (Entered: 11/29/2022)

#3

(#3) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Wernow, Howard) (Entered: 11/29/2022)

#4

(#4) SUMMONS Issued as to Optum, Inc. (mcg) (Entered: 11/29/2022)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Savannah Licensing LLC. Optum, Inc. served on 12/5/2022, answer due 12/26/2022. (Wernow, Howard) (Entered: 12/05/2022)

#6

(#6) Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Savannah Licensing LLC.( Wernow, Howard) (Main Document 6 replaced on 12/28/2022 with flattened image) (mcg). (Entered: 12/27/2022)

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/28/2022
  • DocketDefendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Optum, Inc. to 2/9/2023. 45 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.(mcg) (Entered: 12/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Savannah Licensing LLC.( Wernow, Howard) (Main Document 6 replaced on 12/28/2022 with flattened image) (mcg). (Entered: 12/27/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Savannah Licensing LLC. Optum, Inc. served on 12/5/2022, answer due 12/26/2022. (Wernow, Howard) (Entered: 12/05/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS Issued as to Optum, Inc. (mcg) (Entered: 11/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • DocketIn accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (mcg) (Entered: 11/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • DocketCase Assigned to District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III. (mcg) (Entered: 11/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Wernow, Howard) (Entered: 11/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Savannah Licensing LLC (Wernow, Howard) (Entered: 11/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Optum, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATXEDC-9245969.), filed by Savannah Licensing LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-US8680992, #2 Exhibit B-'992 Amended Notice of Allowance, #3 Exhibit C-US9454777, #4 Exhibit D-'777 Amended Notice of Allowance, #5 Exhibit E-'992 Claim Chart, #6 Exhibit F-'777 Claim Chart, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(Wernow, Howard) (Attachment 7 replaced on 11/29/2022 with flattened civil cover sheet) (mcg). (Entered: 11/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less