This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/26/2022 at 07:57:11 (UTC).

Savannah Licensing LLC v. Comoto Holdings, Inc.

Case Summary

On 10/27/2022 Savannah Licensing LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Comoto Holdings, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Alan D Albright. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:22-CV-01132

  • Filing Date:

    10/27/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Alan D Albright

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Savannah Licensing LLC

Defendant

Comoto Holdings, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Howard L. Wernow

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Exhibit A-US8680992

1 #2

Exhibit B-'992 Amended Notice of Allowance

1 #3

Exhibit C-US9454777

1 #4

Exhibit D-'777 Amended Notice of Allowance

1 #5

Exhibit E-'992 Claim Chart

1 #6

Exhibit F-'777 Claim Chart

1 #7

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #8

Civil Cover Sheet Related Cases

#2

(#2) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Savannah Licensing LLC. (Wernow, Howard) (Entered: 10/27/2022)

#3

(#3) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Wernow, Howard) (Entered: 10/27/2022)

#4

(#4) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Savannah Licensing LLC. (Wernow, Howard) (Entered: 10/27/2022)

#5

(#5) Summons Issued as to Comoto Holdings, Inc.. (lad) (Entered: 10/28/2022)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Savannah Licensing LLC. Comoto Holdings, Inc. served on 11/2/2022, answer due 11/23/2022. (Wernow, Howard) (Entered: 11/03/2022)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Extension of Time to Answer by Savannah Licensing LLC re #1 Complaint, (Wernow, Howard) (Entered: 11/18/2022)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/18/2022
  • DocketReset Deadlines: Comoto Holdings, Inc. answer due 12/23/2022. (lad) (Entered: 11/18/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Extension of Time to Answer by Savannah Licensing LLC re #1 Complaint, (Wernow, Howard) (Entered: 11/18/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Savannah Licensing LLC. Comoto Holdings, Inc. served on 11/2/2022, answer due 11/23/2022. (Wernow, Howard) (Entered: 11/03/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to Comoto Holdings, Inc.. (lad) (Entered: 10/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Alan D Albright due to related cases. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (lad) (Entered: 10/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Savannah Licensing LLC. (Wernow, Howard) (Entered: 10/27/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Wernow, Howard) (Entered: 10/27/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Savannah Licensing LLC. (Wernow, Howard) (Entered: 10/27/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATXWDC-16687550), filed by Savannah Licensing LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-US8680992, #2 Exhibit B-'992 Amended Notice of Allowance, #3 Exhibit C-US9454777, #4 Exhibit D-'777 Amended Notice of Allowance, #5 Exhibit E-'992 Claim Chart, #6 Exhibit F-'777 Claim Chart, #7 Civil Cover Sheet, #8 Civil Cover Sheet Related Cases)(Wernow, Howard) (Entered: 10/27/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less