This case was last updated from PACER on 03/06/2020 at 07:38:53 (UTC).

SAUNDERS v. RALEIGH COUNTY et al

Case Summary

On 01/06/2020 SAUNDERS filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against RALEIGH COUNTY. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is William S. Stickman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-00016

  • Filing Date:

    01/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pennsylvania Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

William S. Stickman

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RAYCO SAUNDERS

Pittsburgh, PA 15235

Defendants

CHARLES R. HUMPHREY

THEE HONORABLE ADAM DIMLICH

CITY OF BECKLEY

BRIAN PARSONS APA

SCOTT E, JOHNSON

KRISTEN KELLER PA

DONNIE R. WHITE

RALEIGH COUNTY

TOMI S. PECK

TA BOWERS

SOUTHERN REGIONAL JAIL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Thomas E. Buck

Attorney at Bailey & Wyant, P.L.L.C.

1219 Chapline Street

Wheeling, WV 26003

Edward A. Miller

Attorney at Steptoe & Johnson PLLC

11 Grandview Circle, Suite 200

Canonsburg, PA 15317

Kerri A. Shimborske

Attorney at Zimmer Kunz

132 South Main Street, Suite 400

Greensburg, PA 15601

Robert E. Ryan

Attorney at Steptoe & Johnson PLLC

1085 Van Voorhis Road, Suite 400

Morgantown, WV 26505

 

Court Documents

#5

(#17) REPLY to Response to Motion re #7 Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction, #5 Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction,, Motion to Transfer Case, #14 Motion to Dismiss DEFENDANTS SOUTHERN REGIONAL JAIL, SCOTT E. JOHNSON, ADAM DIMLICH, TOMI S. PECK, AND CHARLES R. HUMPHREY'S OMNIBUS RESPONSE TO CODEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS filed by CHARLES R. HUMPHREY, SCOTT E, JOHNSON, TOMI S. PECK, SOUTHERN REGIONAL JAIL, THEE HONORABLE ADAM DIMLICH. (Buck, Thomas) (Entered: 03/03/2020)

18 #2

Exhibit M

19 #1

Exhibit A

1 #14

Exhibit K

#18

(#18) BRIEF in Opposition re #7 Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction, #5 Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction, Motion to Transfer Case, #10 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, Motion to Dismiss Case as Frivolous, Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction, Motion to Transfer Case, #14 Motion to Dismiss filed by RAYCO SAUNDERS. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit M, #3 Exhibit N) (cel) (Entered: 03/04/2020)

1 #2

Complaint

#10

CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #10 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, Motion to Dismiss Case as Frivolous, Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction. ERROR: Proposed Order was not attached. CORRECTION: Attorney is advised to file a proposed order by using the Proposed Order event and linking it to the document in question. (cjo) (Entered: 02/14/2020)

1 #3

Proposed Order

1 #7

Exhibit D

18 #1

Proposed Order

#7

(#17) REPLY to Response to Motion re #7 Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction, #5 Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction,, Motion to Transfer Case, #14 Motion to Dismiss DEFENDANTS SOUTHERN REGIONAL JAIL, SCOTT E. JOHNSON, ADAM DIMLICH, TOMI S. PECK, AND CHARLES R. HUMPHREY'S OMNIBUS RESPONSE TO CODEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS filed by CHARLES R. HUMPHREY, SCOTT E, JOHNSON, TOMI S. PECK, SOUTHERN REGIONAL JAIL, THEE HONORABLE ADAM DIMLICH. (Buck, Thomas) (Entered: 03/03/2020)

18 #3

Exhibit N

#19

(#19) MOTION for Preliminary Injunction TO ENJOIN PLAINTIFF FROM FILING LIENS AGAINST PARTIES, COUNSEL, OR JUDGES IN RELATION TO THIS LAWSUIT by CHARLES R. HUMPHREY, SCOTT E, JOHNSON, TOMI S. PECK, SOUTHERN REGIONAL JAIL, THEE HONORABLE ADAM DIMLICH. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Buck, Thomas) (Entered: 03/04/2020)

1 #12

Exhibit I

1 #15

Exhibit L

#1

(#2) ORDER GRANTING #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Clerk of Court is directed to file the complaint. Signed by Judge William S. Stickman on 01/07/20. A copy of this Order will be mailed to Plaintiff this day, 01/07/20. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (eca) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

1 #13

Exhibit J

1 #6

Exhibit C

66 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) SCHEDULING ORDER. Response to #19 Motion to Enjoin Plaintiff from Filing Liens due by 3/20/2020. Signed by Judge William S. Stickman on 03/05/20. A copy of this Order will be mailed to Plaintiff this day, 03/05/20. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (eca) (Entered: 03/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) MOTION for Preliminary Injunction TO ENJOIN PLAINTIFF FROM FILING LIENS AGAINST PARTIES, COUNSEL, OR JUDGES IN RELATION TO THIS LAWSUIT by CHARLES R. HUMPHREY, SCOTT E, JOHNSON, TOMI S. PECK, SOUTHERN REGIONAL JAIL, THEE HONORABLE ADAM DIMLICH. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Buck, Thomas) (Entered: 03/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) BRIEF in Opposition re #7 Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction, #5 Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction, Motion to Transfer Case, #10 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, Motion to Dismiss Case as Frivolous, Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction, Motion to Transfer Case, #14 Motion to Dismiss filed by RAYCO SAUNDERS. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit M, #3 Exhibit N) (cel) (Entered: 03/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) REPLY to Response to Motion re #7 Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction, #5 Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction,, Motion to Transfer Case, #14 Motion to Dismiss DEFENDANTS SOUTHERN REGIONAL JAIL, SCOTT E. JOHNSON, ADAM DIMLICH, TOMI S. PECK, AND CHARLES R. HUMPHREY'S OMNIBUS RESPONSE TO CODEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS filed by CHARLES R. HUMPHREY, SCOTT E, JOHNSON, TOMI S. PECK, SOUTHERN REGIONAL JAIL, THEE HONORABLE ADAM DIMLICH. (Buck, Thomas) (Entered: 03/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE. Response to #14 Motion to Dismiss due by 3/9/2020; Reply due by 3/16/2020. Page limitations outlined herein. Signed by Judge William S. Stickman on 02/20/20. A copy of this Order will be mailed to Plaintiff this day, 02/20/20. (eca) (Entered: 02/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF #14 Motion to Dismiss filed by TA BOWERS and DONNIE R. WHITE. (Ryan, Robert) Modified text on 2/20/2020. (eca) (Entered: 02/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) MOTION to Dismiss by TA BOWERS, DONNIE R. WHITE. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Order for Motion to Dismiss) (Ryan, Robert) (Entered: 02/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Proposed Order re #10 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, Motion to Dismiss Case as Frivolous, Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction, by CHARLES R. HUMPHREY, SCOTT E, JOHNSON, TOMI S. PECK, SOUTHERN REGIONAL JAIL, THEE HONORABLE ADAM DIMLICH. (Buck, Thomas) (Entered: 02/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE re #10 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, Motion to Dismiss Case as Frivolous, Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction: Response due by 3/9/2020; Reply due by 3/16/2020. Signed by Judge William S. Stickman on 02/14/2020. (rgm) (Entered: 02/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #10 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, Motion to Dismiss Case as Frivolous, Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction. ERROR: Proposed Order was not attached. CORRECTION: Attorney is advised to file a proposed order by using the Proposed Order event and linking it to the document in question. (cjo) (Entered: 02/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , MOTION to Dismiss Case as Frivolous , MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction re #3 Complaint by CHARLES R. HUMPHREY, SCOTT E, JOHNSON, TOMI S. PECK, SOUTHERN REGIONAL JAIL, THEE HONORABLE ADAM DIMLICH. (Buck, Thomas) Modified text on 2/14/2020. (cjo). Added MOTION to Transfer Case on 2/20/2020 (cjo) Modified text on 2/20/2020 Removed M/Transfer Case as it was put on wrong docket entry. (cjo) (Entered: 02/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE re #7 Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction, #5 Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction: Plaintiff's response and brief in opposition, not to exceed 20 pages, due by 3/4/2020; Defendants' reply briefs, not to exceed 15 pages, due by 3/11/2020. Signed by Judge William S. Stickman on 02/12/2020. (rgm) (Entered: 02/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) BRIEF in Support re #7 Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction filed by CITY OF BECKLEY. (Miller, Edward) (Entered: 02/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction re #3 Complaint by CITY OF BECKLEY. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Miller, Edward) Modified text on 2/12/2020. (cjo) (Entered: 02/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) BRIEF in Support re #5 Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction filed by KRISTEN KELLER PA, BRIAN PARSONS APA, RALEIGH COUNTY. (Shimborske, Kerri) (Entered: 02/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction re #3 Complaint by KRISTEN KELLER PA, BRIAN PARSONS APA, RALEIGH COUNTY. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certification) (Shimborske, Kerri) Modified text on 2/12/2020. (cjo). Added MOTION to Transfer Case on 2/20/2020 (cjo) (Entered: 02/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Kerri A. Shimborske on behalf of KRISTEN KELLER PA, BRIAN PARSONS APA, RALEIGH COUNTY. (Shimborske, Kerri) (Entered: 02/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) COMPLAINT against TA BOWERS, CITY OF BECKLEY, CHARLES R. HUMPHREY, SCOTT E, JOHNSON, KRISTEN KELLER PA, BRIAN PARSONS APA, TOMI S. PECK, RALEIGH COUNTY, SOUTHERN REGIONAL JAIL, THEE HONORABLE ADAM DIMLICH, DONNIE R. WHITE ), filed by RAYCO SAUNDERS. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L) (cjo) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ORDER GRANTING #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Clerk of Court is directed to file the complaint. Signed by Judge William S. Stickman on 01/07/20. A copy of this Order will be mailed to Plaintiff this day, 01/07/20. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (eca) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by RAYCO SAUNDERS. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Complaint, #3 Proposed Order, #4 Exhibit A, #5 Exhibit B, #6 Exhibit C, #7 Exhibit D, #8 Exhibit E, #9 Exhibit F, #10 Exhibit G, #11 Exhibit H, #12 Exhibit I, #13 Exhibit J, #14 Exhibit K, #15 Exhibit L) (cjo) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.