This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/24/2021 at 09:00:42 (UTC).

SAUNDERS et al v. SAPPI NORTH AMERICA INC et al

Case Summary

On 08/25/2021 SAUNDERS filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against SAPPI NORTH AMERICA INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Maine District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are NANCY TORRESEN and JOHN H. RICH III. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00245

  • Filing Date:

    08/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

NANCY TORRESEN

Referral Judge

JOHN H. RICH III

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

NATHAN SAUNDERS

JUDY HOOK

Defendants

SAPPI NORTH AMERICA INC

SD WARREN COMPANY

SAPPI LTD

SCOTT PAPER COMPANY

KIMBERLY-CLARK CORPORATION

UPM KYMMENE INC

NORTHERN SC PAPER CORPORATION

PERRY VIDEX LLC

INFINITY ASSET SOLUTIONS

NEW MILL CAPITAL LLC

GO LAB INC

HUHTAMAKI OYJ

HUHTAMAKI INC

INTERNATIONAL PAPER COMPANY

VERSO CORPORATION

PIXELLE SPECIALTY SOLUTIONS

PINE TREE WASTE INC doing business as CENTRAL MAINE DISPOSAL

VIDEX MACHINERY CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

BRIAN H. MAHANY

Attorney at MAHANY LAW

8112 West Bluemound, Suite 101

Wauwatosa, WI 53213

ADAM J. GOMEZ

Attorney at GRANT & EISENHOFER PA

123 S. Justison Street, 7Th Floor

Wilmington, DE 19801

ADAM L. STOLTZ

Attorney at GRANT & EISENHOFER PA

123 S. Justison Street

Wilmington, DE 19801

ELIZABETH GRAHAM

Attorney at GRANT & EISENHOFER PA

123 S. Justison Street

Wilmington, DE 19801

Defendant Attorneys

JOHN J. AROMANDO

Attorney at PIERCE ATWOOD LLP

254 Commercial Street

Portland, ME 04101

SARA A. MURPHY

Attorney at PIERCE ATWOOD LLP

254 Commercial Street

Portland, ME 04101

NOLAN L. REICHL

Attorney at PIERCE ATWOOD LLP

254 Commercial Street

Portland, ME 04101

KATHRYN E. HOPKINS

Attorney at TROUTMAN PEPPER HAMILTON SANDERS

600 Peachtree St., Suite. 3000

Atlanta, GA 30308-2216

LINDSEY MANN

Attorney at TROUTMAN PEPPER HAMILTON SANDERS LLP

600 Peachtree Street Ne, Suite 3000

Atlanta, GA 30308

DAVID P. GINZER

Attorney at RICHARDSON, WHITMAN, LARGE & BADGER

465 Congress Street, P.O. Box 9545

Portland, ME 04112-9545

CHRISTOPHER KELLEHER

Attorney at TROUTMAN PEPPER HAMILTON SANDERS

600 Peachtreet St., Suite 3000

Atlanta, GA 30308

DAVID P. ROSS

Attorney at TROUTMAN PEPPER

401 9Th Street Nw, Suite 1000

Washington, DC 20004

ROY T. PIERCE

Attorney at JENSEN BAIRD

10 Free Street, P.O. Box 4510

Portland, ME 04101

SETH W. BREWSTER

Attorney at EATON PEABODY

100 Middle Street, West Tower, Second Floor

Portland, ME 04112-5235

ALFRED JOSEPH FALZONE, III

Attorney at EATON PEABODY

100 Middle Street, Po Box 15235

Portland, ME 04112-5235

DAVID BRENTON DWERLKOTTE

Attorney at SHOOK, HARDY & BACON LLP

2555 Grand Boulevard

Kansas City, MO 64108

22 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#73

#72

#71

#70

#69

#68

50 #2

Exhibit Exhibit A to Declaration of Brian H. Mahany

50 #1

Affidavit Declaration of Brian H. Mahany

#50

#4

#3

#2

1 #5

Exhibit E- Service of Process for S.D. Warren Company

1 #4

Exhibit D- Summons to S.D. Warren Company

1 #3

Exhibit C- Service of Process for Sappi North America Inc

1 #2

Exhibit B- Summons to Sappi North America Inc

1 #1

Exhibit A- First Amended Complaint

#1

95 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#73) ANSWER to First Amended Complaint by NEW MILL CAPITAL LLC .(PIERCE, ROY) Modified on 10/18/2021 to clean up text (slg). (Entered: 10/18/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#72) NOTICE of Interested Parties by NEW MILL CAPITAL LLC (PIERCE, ROY) Modified on 10/18/2021 to clean up text (slg). (Entered: 10/18/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#71) NOTICE of Appearance by ROY T. PIERCE on behalf of NEW MILL CAPITAL LLC (PIERCE, ROY) Modified on 10/18/2021 to clean up text (slg). (Entered: 10/18/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#70) RESPONSE in Opposition re #50 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by NORTHERN SC PAPER CORPORATION and UPM KYMMENE INC. Reply due by 10/29/2021. (WOODCOCK, JOHN) Modified on 10/18/2021 to add UPM KYMMENE INC as a filer (slg). (Entered: 10/15/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#69) RESPONSE in Opposition re #50 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by KIMBERLY-CLARK CORPORATION. Reply due by 10/29/2021. (GINZER, DAVID) (Entered: 10/15/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#68) RESPONSE in Opposition re #50 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by PIXELLE SPECIALTY SOLUTIONS, VERSO CORPORATION. Reply due by 10/29/2021. (KELLY, NANCY) (Entered: 10/15/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#67) RESPONSE in Opposition re #50 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by GO LAB INC. Reply due by 10/29/2021. (BREWSTER, SETH) (Entered: 10/15/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#66) RESPONSE in Opposition re #50 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by PINE TREE WASTE INC. Reply due by 10/29/2021. (RUPRECHT, CLIFFORD) (Entered: 10/15/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#65) RESPONSE in Opposition re #50 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by INFINITY ASSET SOLUTIONS, PERRY VIDEX LLC. Reply due by 10/29/2021. (PIERCE, ROY) (Entered: 10/15/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#64) RESPONSE in Opposition re #50 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by INTERNATIONAL PAPER COMPANY. Reply due by 10/29/2021. (GAYTHWAITE, MARTHA) (Entered: 10/15/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
66 More Docket Entries
  • 08/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by NOLAN L. REICHL on behalf of SAPPI NORTH AMERICA INC (REICHL, NOLAN) (Entered: 08/27/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by SARA A. MURPHY on behalf of SAPPI NORTH AMERICA INC (MURPHY, SARA) (Entered: 08/26/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketFiling Fee Paid via Credit Card ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AMEDC-2540476.), filed by SAPPI NORTH AMERICA INC.(AROMANDO, JOHN) (Entered: 08/26/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketSet Deadlines: Maine has transitioned to the NextGen ECF filing system; therefore, to complete the admissions process, Attorney M. ELIZABETH GRAHAM must register for a PACER account and request the appropriate e-filing rights in the District of Maine via PACER at www.pacer.uscourts.gov by 9/2/2021. NOTE: Counsel appearing Pro Hac Vice MUST click on the PRO HAC VICE link when requesting e-filing rights via PACER. For more details on NextGen/PACER go to our website at www.med.uscourts.gov. Pro Hac Vice Certificate due by 9/2/2021. The Certification for Admission Pro Hac Vice form can be downloaded from our website at #http://www.med.uscourts.gov/forms. (jgd) (Entered: 08/26/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketSet Answer Deadline for SD WARREN COMPANY: Answer due by 9/14/2021 per Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 81(c). (jgd) (Entered: 08/26/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketSet Answer Deadline for SAPPI NORTH AMERICA INC: Answer due by 9/15/2021 per Federal Rule of Civil procedure 81(c). (jgd) (Entered: 08/26/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) PROCEDURAL ORDER RE: REMOVAL: State Court Record due by 9/9/2021. By DEPUTY CLERK: J. Driscoll. (jgd) (Entered: 08/26/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Interested Parties by SAPPI NORTH AMERICA INC. (jgd) (Entered: 08/26/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET. (jgd) (Entered: 08/26/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL with State Court Pleadings First Amended Complaint, Summons to Sappi North America Inc, Service of Process for Sappi North America Inc, Summons to S.D. Warren and Service of Process for S.D. Warren from Somerset County Superior Court, case number 2021-19. PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by SAPPI NORTH AMERICA INC. (Service of Process Deadline 11/23/2021) Fee due by 8/30/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- First Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit B- Summons to Sappi North America Inc, #3 Exhibit C- Service of Process for Sappi North America Inc, #4 Exhibit D- Summons to S.D. Warren Company, #5 Exhibit E- Service of Process for S.D. Warren Company)(jgd) (Entered: 08/26/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NEW MILL CAPITAL HOLDINGS, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where UPM-KYMMENE CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where Verso Corporation is a litigant