Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 03/08/2021 at 20:46:40 (UTC).

Saturn v. Austin Bergstrom International Airport et al

Case Summary

On 11/30/2020 Saturn filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Austin Bergstrom International Airport. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Lee Yeakel and Susan Hightower. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-01176

  • Filing Date:

    11/30/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Lee Yeakel

Referral Judge

Susan Hightower

 

Party Details

Defendants

Dell Medical Center at UT System

Washington Mutual Bank

City of Austin

Compaq-HP

Corslab Structures, Inc.

U.S. Air Force

Brenda E. Baxendale

Discover

American Express

Amir Restaurant Montreal QC Canada

CIA

Intel Corp.

Alex Clinton Weeden

Asenscion Seton N.W.

Ray Mondo Lopez

Kerr Holding Inc.

Starbucks North America

Ehab Khamis

Austin Peace Academy

Canada Patrol Border Agency

322 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Janice L. Ta

Attorney at Perkins Coie LLP

500 W 2Nd St 1900

Austin, TX 78701

Other Attorneys

Deborah G. Clark

Attorney at Clark & Clark

3624 North Hills Drive, Suite 205A

Austin, TX 78731

Ranelle M. Meroney

Attorney at Hawkins Parnell & Young, LLP

2705 Bee Caves Road, Suite 220

Austin, TX 78746

Michael D. Matthews, Jr.

Attorney at McDowell Hetherington LLP

1001 Fannin, Suite 2700

Houston, TX 77002

 

Court Documents

#18

(#18) NOTICE of Filing, State Court Pleadings by Johnny Saturn. (dm) (Entered: 03/03/2021)

#17

(#17) NOTICE of Filing, Exhibit E by Johnny Saturn. (dm) (Entered: 03/02/2021)

#16

(#16) Letter/Correspondence from Johnny Saturn. (dm) (Entered: 03/02/2021)

#15

(#15) Certified Mail Receipt of #14 Report and Recommendations. R&R also sent via regular first class mail. (dm) (Entered: 03/01/2021)

#14

(#14) REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #13 Motion to Dismiss filed by BAE Systems, #9 Motion to Dismiss filed by Intel Corp., #1 Complaint filed by Johnny Saturn, #5 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Target, #10 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by HEB.. Signed by Judge Susan Hightower. (dm) (Entered: 02/25/2021)

#13

(#13) MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint Under Rule 12(b)(6) by BAE Systems. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge Susan Hightower. (Matthews, Michael) (Entered: 02/24/2021)

#10

(#10) Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by HEB.. Motions referred to Judge Susan Hightower. (Meroney, Ranelle) (Entered: 02/19/2021)

9 #1

Proposed Order

#9

(#14) REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #13 Motion to Dismiss filed by BAE Systems, #9 Motion to Dismiss filed by Intel Corp., #1 Complaint filed by Johnny Saturn, #5 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Target, #10 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by HEB.. Signed by Judge Susan Hightower. (dm) (Entered: 02/25/2021)

5 #1

Proposed Order

4 #1

IFP

#4

(#4) ORDER that Plaintiff, within thirty (30) days of the filing of this Order, must submit either the filing fee of $402.00 or a completed application to proceed in forma pauperis.Signed by Judge Susan Hightower. (Attachments: #1 IFP)(cj) (Entered: 01/21/2021)

3 #1

Envelope

#3

(#11) ANSWER to #3 Amended Complaint by HEB.(Meroney, Ranelle) (Entered: 02/22/2021)

#2

(#2) Case Opening Letter mailed to Johnny Saturn. (dl) (Entered: 12/01/2020)

1 #2

Envelope

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#14) REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #13 Motion to Dismiss filed by BAE Systems, #9 Motion to Dismiss filed by Intel Corp., #1 Complaint filed by Johnny Saturn, #5 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Target, #10 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by HEB.. Signed by Judge Susan Hightower. (dm) (Entered: 02/25/2021)

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) NOTICE of Filing, State Court Pleadings by Johnny Saturn. (dm) (Entered: 03/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) NOTICE of Filing, Exhibit E by Johnny Saturn. (dm) (Entered: 03/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Letter/Correspondence from Johnny Saturn. (dm) (Entered: 03/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Certified Mail Receipt of #14 Report and Recommendations. R&R also sent via regular first class mail. (dm) (Entered: 03/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketCASE NO LONGER REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Susan Hightower. (dm) (Entered: 02/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #13 Motion to Dismiss filed by BAE Systems, #9 Motion to Dismiss filed by Intel Corp., #1 Complaint filed by Johnny Saturn, #5 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Target, #10 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by HEB.. Signed by Judge Susan Hightower. (dm) (Entered: 02/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint Under Rule 12(b)(6) by BAE Systems. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge Susan Hightower. (Matthews, Michael) (Entered: 02/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) DEFICIENCY NOTICE: re #11 Answer to Amended Complaint (dm) (Entered: 02/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ANSWER to #3 Amended Complaint by HEB.(Meroney, Ranelle) (Entered: 02/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by HEB.. Motions referred to Judge Susan Hightower. (Meroney, Ranelle) (Entered: 02/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 02/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Janice L. Ta on behalf of Intel Corp.. Attorney Janice L. Ta added to party Intel Corp.(pty:dft) (Ta, Janice) (Entered: 02/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ANSWER to #3 Amended Complaint by Target.(Clark, Deborah) (Entered: 01/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Target. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge Susan Hightower. (Clark, Deborah) (Entered: 01/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER that Plaintiff, within thirty (30) days of the filing of this Order, must submit either the filing fee of $402.00 or a completed application to proceed in forma pauperis.Signed by Judge Susan Hightower. (Attachments: #1 IFP)(cj) (Entered: 01/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) AMENDED COMPLAINT against A.M. Petroleum Inc., AECOM, AISD, AMD, APD, ARC Fare West, AT&T, AT&T & Cingular, Faeeka Mohammad Abdul-Wahead, Sana Ali Sankari Abdul-Wahead, FNU Abu-Shakra, Abu-Shshdeed, Shaza Tizani Ahdab, Ziad Ahmad, FNU Ahwagy, Air France Airlines, Airbus, Abdul-Rahman Al-Hallab, Algeria Embassy, Yahya Ali, Ali Mahmoud El Sankari Properties Fund and Next of Kenn, Amazon, American Express, Amir Restaurant Montreal QC Canada, Apple Technologies, Arab Bank, Asenscion Seton N.W., Austin Bergstrom International Airport, Austin Cab, Austin Community College, Austin Community College Police, Austin Energy, Austin Nursing Board, Austin Peace Academy, Australia Embassy DC, Ala Awsha, Ala Awshah(Brother), Ala Awshah, FNU Ayyoubeey, Azharmehr Immigration Law Firm, BAE Systems, BMW Germany, BMW North America, Bahran Embassy DC, Amine Bahssaley, Bangladeish Embassy DC, Bank of America, Bank of Lebanon, Sofiane Barache, Barnes & Noble, Brenda E. Baxendale, John T. Baxendale, Billionaire Hariri Next of Kenn, Blom Bank, Bobcat, Boeing, Broadcom, George W. Bush, CIA, California State Government, Canada Consulate DFW, Canada Embassy DC, Canada Patrol Border Agency, Canadian Airlines, Capitol One Bank, Caterpilar, Nasser Chammaa, Charles Maund Toyota, Chase Bank, China Embassy DC, Citi Bank, Citroen France, City of Austin, City of Montreal, City of New York, Debbie Clem, Colorado State Senate, Compaq-HP, Consulate of Lebanon(Los Angeles, CA.), Consulate of Lebanon(Houston, TX), Consulate of Lebanon(Detroit, Michigan), Consulate of Lebanon(New York, NY), Corslab Structures, Inc., Costco, Covenant Church, Loren Croom, DCCCD, DHS, DPS, Noureddine Dammoua, Dell, Dell Medical Center at UT System, Department of Ancient Building, Sue Peggy Dingley, Discover, Divine Defense, EMachine, Mohammad EeAaley, Egyptian Embassy DC, Nazeeh Eikkeiry, Wahib El Ali, Mohammad Samir El Jeisseir, Saad El Moor, Embassy of Lebanon DC, Emirates Airlines, Ex-Amli Apartment, F1, FBI, Jeorje Faddoul, FedEx, Ferrari, Richard Ferraro, Firestone, France Embassy DC, Frankfort International Airport, Gamma Stores, Gas Fam Market, Germany Embassy DC, Ghani Kanawati and Syrian Gangs, Google, Northtrop Graham, HEB, Amani Khamiss Hadidi, Ibrahim Hadidi, Hamid Tizani Gangs(Los Angeles, CA), Hamid Tizani Gangs, Mohammad Hassoun, Home Depot, Honda Japan, Honda North America, Hook'em Tires, Houston Harbor, Eliyasss Hrawee, IBM, IRS, India Embassy DC, Indiana State Senate, Intel Corp., International Criminal Court, International Tribunal Court Specialized for Lebanon, Interpol, Israeli Embassy DC, Italy Embassy DC, Japan Embassy DC, John Deere, Kenton Dee Johnson, Jordanian Embassy DC, Kamal Joumblat, Alaa Mohammad Joumouaa, Eemaad Mohammad Joumouaa, Khodor Mohammad Joumouaa, Arwa Mohammad Joumouah, KLM Airlines, Mohammad Abdullatif Kabbarah, Ahmad Karameih, Katar Airlines, Kerr Holding Inc., Keystone Apartments, Ehab Khamis, Alia Khamiss, Rashid Koubbani, LCRA, FNU LNU, Nnshshouee LNU(Wife of Walid Tizani, Lawyer N. Lebanon), LaMirage Apartment Management HQ NC, Elie Lahhoud, Lebanese Embassy(Canada), Lebanese Embassy(Geneva), Lebanese Embassy(Mexico), Lebanon Department of Defense, Lebanon Parliament, Lebanon Presidential Castle and Current President, Lebanon Prime Minister & Ministry, Libya Embassy, Lifetime Fitness, Lockheed Martin, Lone Star Cab, Michael Robert Long, Ray Mondo Lopez, Lufthanza Airlines, MEA Airlines, Kasseim Mahfouz, Tarek Mallah, Malone Wheeler Inc., Mawarad Bank, Maxwell Nissan, Brianna McKiney, Justin McKiney, Mcdonald (1&2), Najib Mekati, Mercedes North America, Mexico Consulate, Mexico Embassy DC, Microsoft, Mitsubishy, Jeffrey Mohamma, Adam Mohammad, FNU Mohammad, Morrocco Embassy, Moscow State University, Motel 6, Mother Window Tint, Motorolla, Municipality of Tripoli of Lebanon, Elon Musk, NASA, NI, NSA, Casey Nabona, Najwa Nasher, Nashida Baroud Tizani Gangs, Nelnet International, Netherland Embassy DC, Kristian Night, Nissan HQ, Nissan North America, North Carolina Secretary of State, North West Airlines, Nottingham University UK, Barack Obama, Amy A. Oliver, Stephen K. Oliver, Pakistan Embassy DC, Passadena County, Passadina County, Perfect10 Cabaret, Pheonicia, Porsh, Dassault Rafale, Rafik Hariri International Airport, Randalls Safeway, Red Cross Montreal QC. Ca., Russia Embassy DC, Russian Airlines, Ghazi Musbah Sablouh, Musbah Mohammad Ghazi Sablouh, Youssrah Mohammad Ghazi Sablouh Shahhal, Nazik Ali Sankari Sabouh, Moh Saf, Safa Trading Establishments Inc., Jeorje Salemeih, Sallie Mae, Sam's Club, Samsung, Sami Mustafa Sankar, Farouk Tarek Sankari, Hadwat Ahmad Sankari, Jad Tarek Sankari, Jamal Farouk Sankari, Jean Ellis Sankari, Mohammad Ahmad Sankari, Nazik Ahmad Sankari, Omar Farouk Sankari, Osthman Mustafa Sankari, Riad Sankari, Talal Sankari, Toufik Sankari, Youssrah Tarek Sankari, Ziad Tarek Sankari, Sanyo, Saudi Airlines, Saudi Consulate DFW, Saudi Embassy DC, Sharon Schatz, Malik Shaar, Abdullah Shahhal, Bourshrah Walid Shahhal, Mohammad Walid Shahhal, Walid Shahhal, Bashsh-A'R Shar'a, Sharani Builder, Sheriff, Jennifer Simmank, Simon Mall, Social Security Administration, Solidere Company, Southwest Airlines, SpaceX, Spain Embassy DC, FNU Spears, Spectrum, St. Michael Church, Starbucks, Starbucks North America, Syrian Embassy, T-Mobile, TI., TXDOT, Mohammad Tabbouleih, Hadi Talah, Target, Texas National Guards, Texas Secretary of State, Texas State University, The State of Texas, Tiger Mart Store, Arwa Nidal Tizani, Bassel Tizani, Maissa Tizani, Moattasseim M.K. Tizani, Nahla Abdul-Hamid Ayy Tizani, Nissreen Tizani, Taha Tizani, Yassmein Tizani, Toshiba, Town North Nissan, Toyota North America, Travis County, Travis County Court, Turkey Embassy DC, U.N. NY, U.S. Air Force, U.S. Army HQ., U.S. Bank, U.S. Custom Border TX, TN, CA, GA, NY, WI IL DC, U.S. Defense, U.S. Department of Education DC, U.S. Department of State, U.S. Department of Transportation, U.S. Government, U.S. Marines Corps., HQ, U.S. Marshal, U.S. Navy, U.S. Secretary of State, U.S. Western District Court, UAE Embassy DC, UN Geneva, UN NY, US NCIS, USCIS, UT Austin Police, UT System Austin TX, UTD, Uber Technologies Inc., University of Texas at Austin, University of Wisconsin, Salazor Vallalpando, Vauxhall UK, Veihrad Transportation, Verison, Wachovia, Washington Mutual Bank, Alex Clinton Weeden, Wells Fargo, Wells Fargo, Uwe I Wendel, Eimad Yassini, Yellow Cab Manhattan NY Compnay amending #1 Complaint., filed by Johnny Saturn. (1) Envelope (dm). (Entered: 12/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Case Opening Letter mailed to Johnny Saturn. (dl) (Entered: 12/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • DocketCASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Susan Hightower. (dl) (Entered: 12/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • DocketIf ordered by the court, all referrals and consents in this case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Hightower. (dl) (Entered: 12/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Lee Yeakel. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (dl) (Entered: 12/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT, filed by Johnny Saturn. ($402 Filing Fee is DUE)#1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Envelope) (dl). (Entered: 12/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CIA is a litigant

Latest cases where DISCOVER is a litigant

Latest cases where Coreslab Structures (Miami), Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where AMERICAN EXPRESS AMEX BANK is a litigant