Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 01/11/2020 at 08:43:39 (UTC).

Satterwhite v. Coca-Cola Bottling Company United, Inc.

Case Summary

On 11/12/2019 Satterwhite filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Coca-Cola Bottling Company United, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Alabama Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Susan Russ Walker and William Keith Watkins. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-00868

  • Filing Date:

    11/12/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Alabama Middle District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Susan Russ Walker

Presiding Judge

William Keith Watkins

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Cynthia Satterwhite

Defendant

Coca-Cola Bottling Company United, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Adam Michael Porter

Attorney at Adam M. Porter LLC

2301 Morris Avenue; Suite 102

Birmingham, AL 35203

Defendant Attorneys

Patrick Drake Schach

Attorney at Littler Mendelson LLC

420 20Th Street N.; Suite 2300

Birmingham, AL 35203

Jay Daniel St. Clair

Attorney at Littler Mendelson, P.C.

420 20Th Street North, Suite 2300

Birmingham, AL 35203

 

Court Documents

#14

(#14) GENERAL BRIEFING ORDER setting out further briefing requirements. Signed by Honorable Judge William Keith Watkins on 12/19/2019. (amf, ) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

#13

(#13) UNIFORM SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/20/2021, in Montgomery, AL, before Honorable Judge William Keith Watkins; Jury Trial set for 7/19/2021, in Montgomery, AL, before Honorable Judge William Keith Watkins; Amended Pleadings due by 2/18/2020; Discovery due by 12/21/2020; Mediation Notice due by 12/26/2020; Dispositive and Daubert Motions due by 1/20/2021, as further set out in order. Signed by Honorable Judge William Keith Watkins on 12/18/2019. (Furnished: Calendar & WR) (amf, ) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

#12

(#12) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Porter, Adam) (Entered: 12/17/2019)

#11

(#11) Case Reassigned to Honorable Judge William Keith Watkins as Presiding Judge and Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker as Referral Judge; Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker no longer assigned to the case as Presiding Judge. (amf, ) (Entered: 12/16/2019)

#10

(#10) RULE 26(f) ORDER: it is ORDERED that the Rule 26(f) report containing the discovery plan shall be filed as soon as practicable, as further set out in order; Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 1/3/2020; DIRECTING counsel for the parties to complete the appropriate attached form so that the form is received by the Clerk on or before 12/20/2019. Signed by Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker on 12/13/2019. (amf, ) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for (defendant) Coca-Cola Bottling Company United, Inc. (djy, ) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

#8

(#8) Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Coca-Cola Bottling Company United, Inc.. (St. Clair, Jay) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

#7

(#7) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Coca-Cola Bottling Company United, Inc..(St. Clair, Jay) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

#6

(#6) Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons & #1 Complaint signed by Jennifer Lockwood for Coca-Cola Bottling Company United, Inc., served on 11/15/2019, answer due 12/6/2019. (amf, ) (Entered: 11/20/2019)

#5

(#5) Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Cynthia Satterwhite re #4 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement. (Porter, Adam) (Entered: 11/13/2019)

4 #1

Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Attachment

#4

(#4) Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Cynthia Satterwhite; Corporate Disclosures due by 11/25/2019. (Attachments: #1 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Attachment)(amf, ) (Entered: 11/13/2019)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for Cynthia Satterwhite. (amf, ) (Entered: 11/13/2019)

#2

(#2) Summons Issued as to Coca-Cola Bottling Company United, Inc.; mailed CMRRR with copy of #1 Complaint. (amf, ) (Entered: 11/13/2019)

1 #2

Filing Fee Receipt

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Coca-Cola Bottling Company United, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400.00, receipt number 4602055645), filed by Cynthia Satterwhite. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Filing Fee Receipt)(amf, ) (Entered: 11/13/2019)

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick Drake Schach on behalf of Coca-Cola Bottling Company United, Inc. (Schach, Patrick) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) GENERAL BRIEFING ORDER setting out further briefing requirements. Signed by Honorable Judge William Keith Watkins on 12/19/2019. (amf, ) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) UNIFORM SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/20/2021, in Montgomery, AL, before Honorable Judge William Keith Watkins; Jury Trial set for 7/19/2021, in Montgomery, AL, before Honorable Judge William Keith Watkins; Amended Pleadings due by 2/18/2020; Discovery due by 12/21/2020; Mediation Notice due by 12/26/2020; Dispositive and Daubert Motions due by 1/20/2021, as further set out in order. Signed by Honorable Judge William Keith Watkins on 12/18/2019. (Furnished: Calendar & WR) (amf, ) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Porter, Adam) (Entered: 12/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) Case Reassigned to Honorable Judge William Keith Watkins as Presiding Judge and Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker as Referral Judge; Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker no longer assigned to the case as Presiding Judge. (amf, ) (Entered: 12/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) RULE 26(f) ORDER: it is ORDERED that the Rule 26(f) report containing the discovery plan shall be filed as soon as practicable, as further set out in order; Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 1/3/2020; DIRECTING counsel for the parties to complete the appropriate attached form so that the form is received by the Clerk on or before 12/20/2019. Signed by Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker on 12/13/2019. (amf, ) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for (defendant) Coca-Cola Bottling Company United, Inc. (djy, ) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Coca-Cola Bottling Company United, Inc.. (St. Clair, Jay) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Coca-Cola Bottling Company United, Inc..(St. Clair, Jay) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons & #1 Complaint signed by Jennifer Lockwood for Coca-Cola Bottling Company United, Inc., served on 11/15/2019, answer due 12/6/2019. (amf, ) (Entered: 11/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Cynthia Satterwhite re #4 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement. (Porter, Adam) (Entered: 11/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Cynthia Satterwhite; Corporate Disclosures due by 11/25/2019. (Attachments: #1 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Attachment)(amf, ) (Entered: 11/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for Cynthia Satterwhite. (amf, ) (Entered: 11/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Summons Issued as to Coca-Cola Bottling Company United, Inc.; mailed CMRRR with copy of #1 Complaint. (amf, ) (Entered: 11/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Cynthia Satterwhite. (No PDF attached to this entry - See doc #1 for PDF) (amf, ) (Entered: 11/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Coca-Cola Bottling Company United, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400.00, receipt number 4602055645), filed by Cynthia Satterwhite. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Filing Fee Receipt)(amf, ) (Entered: 11/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where COCA-COLA BOTTLING COMPANY UNITED INC. is a litigant