This case was last updated from PACER on 04/13/2021 at 11:29:56 (UTC).

Sato v. Puratos Corporation

Case Summary

On 02/12/2021 Sato filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against Puratos Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Wisconsin Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are William E Duffin and J P Stadtmueller. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-00173

  • Filing Date:

    02/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

William E Duffin

J P Stadtmueller

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Diane Sato

Defendant

Puratos Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Scott S Luzi

Attorney at Walcheske & Luzi LLC

15850 W Bluemound Rd - Ste 304

Brookfield, WI 53005

Matthew J Tobin

Attorney at Walcheske & Luzi LLC

15850 W Bluemound Rd - Ste 304

Brookfield, WI 53005

James A Walcheske

Attorney at Walcheske & Luzi LLC

15850 W Bluemound Rd - Ste 304

Brookfield, WI 53005

Defendant Attorneys

Lee Tankle

Attorney at Troutman Pepper

3000 Two Logan Sq, 18Th And Arch St

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Erin M Cook

Attorney at Godfrey & Kahn SC

833 E Michigan St - Ste 1800

Milwaukee, WI 53202-5615

Tracey E Diamond

Attorney at Troutman Pepper Hamilton Sanders LLP

301 Carnegie Center, 301 Carnegie Center - Ste 400

Princeton, NJ 08540

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Tracey E Diamond on behalf of Puratos Corporation. Attorney(s) appearing: Tracey E. Diamond (Diamond, Tracey)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Lee Tankle on behalf of Puratos Corporation. Attorney(s) appearing: Lee E. Tankle (Tankle, Lee)

#8

(#8) DISCLOSURE Statement by Puratos Corporation. (Cook, Erin)

#7

(#7) ANSWER to #1 Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Puratos Corporation.(Cook, Erin)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Erin M Cook on behalf of Puratos Corporation. Attorney(s) appearing: Erin M. Cook (Cook, Erin)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Diane Sato. Puratos Corporation served on 2/19/2021. (Luzi, Scott)

#4

RESTRICTED

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Scott S Luzi on behalf of Diane Sato. Attorney(s) appearing: Scott S. Luzi, James A. Walcheske, Matthew J. Tobin (Luzi, Scott)

#2

(#2) DISCLOSURE Statement by Diane Sato. (Luzi, Scott)

1 #3

Diane Sato Consent to Join Form

1 #2

Summons

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand; against Puratos Corporation by Diane Sato. ( Filing Fee PAID $402 receipt number AWIEDC-3733331) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Diane Sato Consent to Join Form)(Luzi, Scott)

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Tracey E Diamond on behalf of Puratos Corporation. Attorney(s) appearing: Tracey E. Diamond (Diamond, Tracey)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Lee Tankle on behalf of Puratos Corporation. Attorney(s) appearing: Lee E. Tankle (Tankle, Lee)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) DISCLOSURE Statement by Puratos Corporation. (Cook, Erin)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ANSWER to #1 Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Puratos Corporation.(Cook, Erin)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Erin M Cook on behalf of Puratos Corporation. Attorney(s) appearing: Erin M. Cook (Cook, Erin)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Diane Sato. Puratos Corporation served on 2/19/2021. (Luzi, Scott)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketCase reassigned to Judge J P Stadtmueller. Magistrate Judge William E Duffin no longer assigned to the case. (mlm)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketSummons Issued as to Puratos Corporation. (mlm)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Diane Sato. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Luzi, Scott)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • DocketNOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Magistrate Judge William E Duffin; Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Duffin to be filed within 21 days; the consent/refusal form is available #here. (jcl)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Scott S Luzi on behalf of Diane Sato. Attorney(s) appearing: Scott S. Luzi, James A. Walcheske, Matthew J. Tobin (Luzi, Scott)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) DISCLOSURE Statement by Diane Sato. (Luzi, Scott)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand; against Puratos Corporation by Diane Sato. ( Filing Fee PAID $402 receipt number AWIEDC-3733331) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Diane Sato Consent to Join Form)(Luzi, Scott)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Matthew J Tobin

Latest cases represented by Lawyer James A Walcheske

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Scott S Luzi