This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/05/2021 at 07:56:36 (UTC).

Satanic Temple, Inc., The v. City of Belle Plaine, MN

Case Summary

On 02/04/2021 Satanic Temple, Inc , The filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against City of Belle Plaine, MN. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Minnesota District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Leo I. Brisbois and Wilhelmina M. Wright. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    0:21-CV-00336

  • Filing Date:

    02/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Leo I. Brisbois

Presiding Judge

Wilhelmina M. Wright

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Satanic Temple, Inc., The

Defendant

City of Belle Plaine, MN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Robert R Hopper

Attorney at Robert R. Hopper & Associates

333 South 7Th Street, Suite 2450

Minneapolis, MN 55402

Matthew A. Kezhaya

Attorney at Kezhaya Law PLC

1202 Ne Mcclain Road, 72712

Bentonville, AR 72712

Jason Scott Juran

Attorney at Robert R. Hopper, LLC

333 South Seventh Street, Suite 2450

Minneapolis, MN 55402

Defendant Attorneys

Monte A Mills

Attorney at Greene Espel PLLP

222 S 9Th St Ste 2200

Mpls, MN 55402

Katherine M. Swenson

Attorney at Greene Espel PLLP

222 S 9Th St Ste 2200

Mpls, MN 55402

 

Court Documents

28 #1

Exhibit(s) A

#28

27 #1

LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate

#27

#26

#25

#24

23 #1

LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate

#17

#8

#7

#6

#5

#3

#2

1 #2

Exhibit(s) 15-28 (pp. 105-152)

1 #1

Exhibit(s) 1-14 (pp. 1-104)

#1

26 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) Declaration of Dawn Meyer in Support of #10 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by City of Belle Plaine, MN. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A)(Swenson, Katherine) (Entered: 03/29/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) Reply to Response to Motion re #10 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by City of Belle Plaine, MN. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Swenson, Katherine) (Entered: 03/29/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re denying motion for sanctions; ordering fees shifting #17 Motion for Sanctions. (Kezhaya, Matthew) (Entered: 03/23/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re denying motion to dismiss #10 Motion to Dismiss/General. (Kezhaya, Matthew) (Entered: 03/23/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) RESPONSE in Opposition re #17 MOTION for Sanctions Defendant's Motion for Rule 11 Sanctions Against Plaintiff's Counsel filed by Satanic Temple, Inc., The.(Kezhaya, Matthew) (Entered: 03/23/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) RESPONSE in Opposition re #10 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Satanic Temple, Inc., The. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Kezhaya, Matthew) (Entered: 03/22/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by City of Belle Plaine, MN re #17 MOTION for Sanctions Defendant's Motion for Rule 11 Sanctions Against Plaintiff's Counsel, #19 Memorandum in Support of Motion, (Mills, Monte) (Entered: 03/15/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #17 MOTION for Sanctions Defendant's Motion for Rule 11 Sanctions Against Plaintiff's Counsel filed by City of Belle Plaine, MN.(Mills, Monte) (Entered: 03/15/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #17 Motion for Sanctions filed by City of Belle Plaine, MN.(Mills, Monte) (Entered: 03/15/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) MEMORANDUM in Support re #17 MOTION for Sanctions Defendant's Motion for Rule 11 Sanctions Against Plaintiff's Counsel filed by City of Belle Plaine, MN. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Mills, Monte) (Entered: 03/15/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by City of Belle Plaine, MN. (Mills, Monte) (Entered: 03/01/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • Docket(#9) (Text-Only) NOTICE - Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright's Practice Pointers are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's #website. All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these Practice Pointers, including Judge Wright's deviations from the Local Rules with respect to motion scheduling and briefing deadlines. (RJE) (Entered: 02/10/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Katherine M. Swenson on behalf of Belle Plaine, City of. (Swenson, Katherine) (Entered: 02/09/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Monte A Mills on behalf of Belle Plaine, City of. (Mills, Monte) (Entered: 02/09/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER OF REASSIGNMENT OF RELATED CASES. This case is reassigned to Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright for all further proceedings. Judge Michael J. Davis no longer assigned to case. NOTE: the new case number is 21-cv-00336 WMW/LIB. Please use this case number for all subsequent pleadings. Signed by Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright and Judge Michael J. Davis on 2/8/2021.(MTP) (Entered: 02/09/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to Belle Plaine, City of. (MMG) (Entered: 02/05/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • Docket(#4) TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Michael J. Davis per 3rd/4th Civil Rights list, referred to Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois. Please use case number 21-cv-336 MJD/LIB. (MMG) (Entered: 02/05/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) EXHIBIT Placeholder for CD with video clips re #1 Complaint, filed by Satanic Temple, The. (Kezhaya, Matthew) (Entered: 02/05/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Civil cover sheet re #1 Complaint, filed by Satanic Temple, The. (Kezhaya, Matthew) Modified text on 2/5/2021 (MMG). (Entered: 02/05/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against City of Belle Plaine, MN (filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMNDC-8464238) filed by Satanic Temple, Inc., The. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1-14 (pp. 1-104), #2 Exhibit(s) 15-28 (pp. 105-152)) (Kezhaya, Matthew) Modified text on 2/16/2021 (MMG). (Entered: 02/04/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where The Satanic Temple, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Monte A Mills

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Katherine M. Swenson