This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/07/2019 at 07:21:14 (UTC).

Sasser et al v. Fowler Foods Inc et al

Case Summary

On 07/09/2019 Sasser filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against Fowler Foods Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arkansas Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are D. P. Marshall Jr. and James M. Moody Jr.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-00195

  • Filing Date:

    07/09/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

  • Courthouse:

    Arkansas Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

D. P. Marshall Jr.

James M. Moody Jr.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Monique Hopkins

Kaleb Vickers

Samara Johnson

Lawrence Day

Natasha Martin

David Wilson

Monica Bittle

Victoria Ensley

Kimberly Sasser

James Cooke

Michael Hill

Roshawn Craven

Roger Burton

Dustin Shores

Larry Joseph

Tiran Trotter

Esmeralda Betancourt

Darius Jordan

Defendants

Southwest Arkansas Foods Inc

Fowler Foods Inc

11 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Stephen Rauls

Attorney at Sanford Law Firm

One Financial Center, 650 South Shackleford, Suite 411

Little Rock, AR 72211

Joshua Sanford

Attorney at Sanford Law Firm

One Financial Center, 650 South Shackleford, Suite 411

Little Rock, AR 72211

Sean Short

Attorney at Sanford Law Firm

One Financial Center, 650 South Shackleford, Suite 411

Little Rock, AR 72211

 

Court Documents

#3

(#3) ORDER of Recusal. The Clerk must reassign this case at random by chip exchange. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 7/15/2019. (jak) (Entered: 07/15/2019)

#2

(#2) FIRST AMENDED AND SUBSTITUTED COMPLAINT against Chris Fowler, Fowler Foods Inc, Southwest Arkansas Foods Inc filed by all Plaintiffs.(fjg) (Entered: 07/10/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by All Plaintiffs. Summons issued and returned to counsel. (Fee of $400 paid. Receipt Number LIT072961.) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jbh) (Entered: 07/09/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT. Based on #3 Order, the Clerk's office has reassigned the case to Judge James M. Moody Jr. (jak) (Entered: 07/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ORDER of Recusal. The Clerk must reassign this case at random by chip exchange. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 7/15/2019. (jak) (Entered: 07/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) FIRST AMENDED AND SUBSTITUTED COMPLAINT against Chris Fowler, Fowler Foods Inc, Southwest Arkansas Foods Inc filed by all Plaintiffs.(fjg) (Entered: 07/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by All Plaintiffs. Summons issued and returned to counsel. (Fee of $400 paid. Receipt Number LIT072961.) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jbh) (Entered: 07/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Fowler Foods Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Stephen Rauls

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Sean Short

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Joshua Sanford