This case was last updated from PACER on 09/07/2021 at 07:37:14 (UTC).

Sasaki v. United Airlines, Inc.

Case Summary

On 07/09/2021 Sasaki filed a Personal Injury - Airplane lawsuit against United Airlines, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Thomas M. Durkin. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-03664

  • Filing Date:

    07/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Airplane

  • Courthouse:

    Illinois Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Thomas M. Durkin

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Takeshi Sasaki

Defendant

United Airlines, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

A Ilyas Akbari

Attorney at Wilshire Law Firm PLC

3055 Wilshire Blvd, 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90010

Elissa Best

Attorney at Wilshire Law Firm, PLC

3055 Wilshire Blvd., 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90010

Michael Sean Krzak

Attorney at Krzak Rundio Law Group, LLC

30 N. Lasalle, Suite 4020

Chicago, IL 60602

Defendant Attorneys

Michael Gerard McQuillen

Attorney at Adler, Murphy & McQuillen

20 S. Clark Street, 2500

Chicago, IL 60603

Paula LoMonaco Wegman

Attorney at Adler, Murphy & McQuillen LLP

20 S. Clark Street, Suite 2500

Chicago, IL 60603-1804

Nicholas Ajello

Attorney at Adler Murphy & McQuillen LLP

20 S. Clark Street, 2500

Chicago, IL 60603

 

Court Documents

#14

(#14) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: Motion to appear pro hac vice #12 is granted. Attorney Elissa Best for Takeshi Sasaki added. Mailed notice. (ecw, ) (Entered: 08/31/2021)

#13

(#13) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Takeshi Sasaki by Elissa Best (Best, Elissa) (Entered: 08/31/2021)

#12

(#12) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-18621397. (Best, Elissa) (Entered: 08/31/2021)

#11

(#11) Disclosure of Corporate Affiliates STATEMENT by United Airlines, Inc. (Ajello, Nicholas) (Entered: 08/09/2021)

#10

(#10) United Airlines, Inc.'s ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by United Airlines, Inc.(Ajello, Nicholas) (Entered: 08/09/2021)

#9

(#9) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant United Airlines, Inc. by Nicholas Ajello (Ajello, Nicholas) (Entered: 07/21/2021)

#8

(#8) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant United Airlines, Inc. by Michael Gerard McQuillen (McQuillen, Michael) (Entered: 07/20/2021)

#7

(#7) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant United Airlines, Inc. by Paula LoMonaco Wegman (Wegman, Paula) (Entered: 07/20/2021)

#6

(#6) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: By 9/20/2021, the parties are to file a joint status report. The parties may refer to the format detailed on the Court's website under New and Reassigned cases. Mailed notice. (ecw, ) (Entered: 07/15/2021)

#5

(#5) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Takeshi Sasaki by Michael Sean Krzak (Krzak, Michael) (Entered: 07/14/2021)

#4

(#4) DESIGNATION of A Ilyas Akbari as U.S. Attorney for Plaintiff Takeshi Sasaki (Akbari, A Ilyas) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

#3

(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Takeshi Sasaki by A Ilyas Akbari (Akbari, A Ilyas) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

#2

(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Akbari, A Ilyas) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Takeshi Sasaki; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-18441183.(Akbari, A Ilyas) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: Motion to appear pro hac vice #12 is granted. Attorney Elissa Best for Takeshi Sasaki added. Mailed notice. (ecw, ) (Entered: 08/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Takeshi Sasaki by Elissa Best (Best, Elissa) (Entered: 08/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-18621397. (Best, Elissa) (Entered: 08/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Disclosure of Corporate Affiliates STATEMENT by United Airlines, Inc. (Ajello, Nicholas) (Entered: 08/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) United Airlines, Inc.'s ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by United Airlines, Inc.(Ajello, Nicholas) (Entered: 08/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant United Airlines, Inc. by Nicholas Ajello (Ajello, Nicholas) (Entered: 07/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant United Airlines, Inc. by Michael Gerard McQuillen (McQuillen, Michael) (Entered: 07/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant United Airlines, Inc. by Paula LoMonaco Wegman (Wegman, Paula) (Entered: 07/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: By 9/20/2021, the parties are to file a joint status report. The parties may refer to the format detailed on the Court's website under New and Reassigned cases. Mailed notice. (ecw, ) (Entered: 07/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS Issued as to Defendant United Airlines, Inc. (daj, ) (Entered: 07/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Takeshi Sasaki by Michael Sean Krzak (Krzak, Michael) (Entered: 07/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Susan E. Cox. Case assignment: Random assignment. (kl, ) (Entered: 07/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) DESIGNATION of A Ilyas Akbari as U.S. Attorney for Plaintiff Takeshi Sasaki (Akbari, A Ilyas) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Takeshi Sasaki by A Ilyas Akbari (Akbari, A Ilyas) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Akbari, A Ilyas) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Takeshi Sasaki; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-18441183.(Akbari, A Ilyas) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where United Airlines, Inc is a litigant