This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/08/2022 at 09:17:01 (UTC).

Sarwar v. The Hoxton (Williamsburg) LLC

Case Summary

On 06/28/2021 Sarwar filed a Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination lawsuit against The Hoxton Williamsburg LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Eastern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Joan M. Azrack and Steven Tiscione. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-03622

  • Filing Date:

    06/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Joan M. Azrack

Referral Judge

Steven Tiscione

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Saim Sarwar

Defendant

The Hoxton (Williamsburg) LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Peter E. Sverd

Attorney at Law Offices of Peter Sverd, PLLC

225 Broadway, Suite 613

New York, NY 10007

Defendant Attorney

Amanda L. Van Hoose Garofalo

Attorney at Baker & Hostetler LLP

45 Rockefeller Plaza

New York, NY 10111

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Case closed. Ordered by Judge Joan M. Azrack on 11/16/2021. (Florio, Lisa) (Entered: 11/16/2021)

#11

(#11) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Saim Sarwar (Sverd, Peter) (Entered: 11/15/2021)

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Settlement of the matter and request opportunity to restore to active status if the settlement is not consummated by Saim Sarwar (Sverd, Peter) (Entered: 10/29/2021)

#9

(#9) Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by The Hoxton (Williamsburg) LLC. (Van Hoose Garofalo, Amanda) (Entered: 10/22/2021)

#8

(#8) SCHEDULING ORDER: A telephone conference will be held at 10:30 a.m. on November 15, 2021 before the undersigned. The individual Plaintiff client and a principal with full settlement authority for the Defendant must participate in the conference with all counsel. The parties shall connect to the conference through dial-in number 888-557-8511 with access code 3152145. By Ex parte settlement positions are to be filed through ECF by November 10th. If the parties fail to settle during the conference, a discovery schedule will be set by the Court. THE PARTIES ARE REMINDED that audio or video recording of proceedings by any party other than the Court, is strictly prohibited by Local Civil Rule 1.8. Violation of this rule may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed appropriate by the Court. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione on 10/14/2021. (Vasquez, Lea) (Entered: 10/14/2021)

#7

(#7) Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by The Hoxton (Williamsburg) LLC. (Van Hoose Garofalo, Amanda) (Entered: 09/28/2021)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Amanda L. Van Hoose Garofalo on behalf of The Hoxton (Williamsburg) LLC (aty to be noticed) (Van Hoose Garofalo, Amanda) (Entered: 09/28/2021)

#5

#4

#3

2 #1

Additional Corrections

2 #2

Main Document

#2

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Proposed Summons Proposed Summons

#1

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Case closed. Ordered by Judge Joan M. Azrack on 11/16/2021. (Florio, Lisa) (Entered: 11/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Saim Sarwar (Sverd, Peter) (Entered: 11/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • DocketORDER STAYING CASE pending resolution. Counsel for the plaintiff shall file the stipulation of discontinuance or a status report on settlement by 12/1/2021. Ordered by Judge Joan M. Azrack on 11/2/2021. (Posillico, Lauren) (Entered: 11/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Settlement of the matter and request opportunity to restore to active status if the settlement is not consummated by Saim Sarwar (Sverd, Peter) (Entered: 10/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #9 Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, The Hoxton (Williamsburg) LLC answer due 11/12/2021. Defendant shall answer or file the stipulation of dismissal by November 12, 2021. If a stipulation of dismissal is not filed, the conference scheduled for November 15th before the undersigned will proceed as scheduled. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione on 10/22/2021. (Vasquez, Lea) (Entered: 10/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by The Hoxton (Williamsburg) LLC. (Van Hoose Garofalo, Amanda) (Entered: 10/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SCHEDULING ORDER: A telephone conference will be held at 10:30 a.m. on November 15, 2021 before the undersigned. The individual Plaintiff client and a principal with full settlement authority for the Defendant must participate in the conference with all counsel. The parties shall connect to the conference through dial-in number 888-557-8511 with access code 3152145. By Ex parte settlement positions are to be filed through ECF by November 10th. If the parties fail to settle during the conference, a discovery schedule will be set by the Court. THE PARTIES ARE REMINDED that audio or video recording of proceedings by any party other than the Court, is strictly prohibited by Local Civil Rule 1.8. Violation of this rule may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed appropriate by the Court. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione on 10/14/2021. (Vasquez, Lea) (Entered: 10/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #7 Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint. The Hoxton (Williamsburg) LLC answer due 10/25/2021. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione on 9/28/2021. (Vasquez, Lea) (Entered: 09/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by The Hoxton (Williamsburg) LLC. (Van Hoose Garofalo, Amanda) (Entered: 09/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Amanda L. Van Hoose Garofalo on behalf of The Hoxton (Williamsburg) LLC (aty to be noticed) (Van Hoose Garofalo, Amanda) (Entered: 09/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Saim Sarwar. The Hoxton (Williamsburg) LLC served on 7/13/2021, answer due 8/3/2021. (Sverd, Peter) (Entered: 07/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to The Hoxton (Williamsburg) LLC. (Rodin, Deanna) (Entered: 06/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Rodin, Deanna) (Entered: 06/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Joan M. Azrack and Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Rodin, Deanna) (Entered: 06/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/29/2021: #1 Additional Corrections) (Rodin, Deanna). (Entered: 06/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Saim Sarwar against The Hoxton (Williamsburg) LLC filing fee $402, receipt number ANYEDC-14605769, Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes, filed by Saim Sarwar. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Sverd, Peter) Modified on 6/29/2021 (Rodin, Deanna). (Entered: 06/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Peter Erik Sverd