This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/10/2021 at 09:49:42 (UTC).

Sarwar v. Rameshwar LLC

Case Summary

On 07/12/2021 Sarwar filed a Civil Right - Housing/Accommodation Discrimination lawsuit against Rameshwar LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Eastern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Kiyo A. Matsumoto and James R. Cho. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-03905

  • Filing Date:

    07/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Housing/Accommodation Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Kiyo A. Matsumoto

Referral Judge

James R. Cho

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Saim Sarwar

Defendant

Rameshwar LLC doing business as Brooklyn Motor Inn

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Peter E. Sverd

Attorney at Law Offices of Peter Sverd, PLLC

225 Broadway, Suite 613

New York, NY 10007

 

Court Documents

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Saim Sarwar. Rameshwar LLC served on 7/13/2021, answer due 8/3/2021. (Sverd, Peter) (Entered: 07/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 07/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to Rameshwar LLC. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 07/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Kiyo A. Matsumoto and Magistrate Judge James R. Cho. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 07/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Civil Cover Sheet.. Re #1 Complaint, by Saim Sarwar (Sverd, Peter) (Entered: 07/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 07/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT of Saim Sarwar against Rameshwar LLC dba Brooklyn Motor Inn filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-14645972 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes,, filed by Saim Sarwar. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons Proposed Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) (Sverd, Peter) (Entered: 07/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Peter Erik Sverd