This case was last updated from PACER on 03/15/2021 at 09:35:42 (UTC).

Sarwar v. Oakes Oramel Inn LLC

Case Summary

On 01/14/2021 Sarwar filed a Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination lawsuit against Oakes Oramel Inn LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are John L. Sinatra, Jr. and Michael J. Roemer. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00059

  • Filing Date:

    01/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John L. Sinatra, Jr.

Referral Judge

Michael J. Roemer

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Saim Sarwar

Defendant

Oakes Oramel Inn LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Tristan Wade Gillespie

Attorney at The Gillespie Law Firm, LLC

5150 Cottage Farm Rd.

Johns Creek, GA 30022

 

Court Documents

9 #1

Certificate of Service

#9

(#9) MOTION to Strike #7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Saim Sarwar. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Gillespie, Tristan) (Entered: 02/22/2021)

#7

(#7) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Oakes Oramel Inn LLC. (JLV) (Entered: 02/19/2021)

6 #3

Memorandum in Support

6 #2

Affidavit

6 #1

Certificate of Service

#6

(#6) MOTION for Default Judgment as to Oakes Oramel Inn LLC by Saim Sarwar. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Affidavit, #3 Memorandum in Support)(Gillespie, Tristan) (Entered: 02/19/2021)

#5

(#5) Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Oakes Oramel Inn LLC. Copy mailed to Defendant at 8815 Reynolds Rd., Franklinville, NY 14737. (CGJ) (Entered: 02/19/2021)

4 #1

Affidavit

#4

(#4) REQUEST for Clerk's Entry of Default by Saim Sarwar against Oakes Oramel Inn LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Certificate of Service)(Gillespie, Tristan) (Entered: 02/18/2021)

#3

(#3) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Saim Sarwar. Oakes Oramel Inn LLC served on 1/27/2021, answer due 2/17/2021. (Gillespie, Tristan) (Entered: 02/10/2021)

#2

(#2) Summons Issued as to Oakes Oramel Inn LLC. (JD) (Entered: 01/14/2021)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Summons

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against OAKES ORAMEL INN LLC $ 402 receipt number 0209-4112029, filed by Saim Sarwar. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Gillespie, Tristan) (Entered: 01/14/2021)

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) TEXT ORDER denying #9 Motion to Strike defendant's motion for extension of time to file answer. The letter request of Greg Oakes, a non-attorney individual, seeking additional time to obtain legal advice #7 is granted as follows: Defendant Oakes Oramel Inn LLC is a business entity and therefore must be represented by a licensed attorney. See Lattanzio v. COMTA, 481 F.3d 137, 139-40 (2d Cir. 2007) ("28 U.S.C. 1654... does not allow corporations, partnerships, or associations to appear in federal court otherwise than through a licensed attorney."). Accordingly, defendant shall retain counsel by 4/2/2021 and file an answer or otherwise move through counsel on or before 4/30/2021. Failure to timely respond may result in the entry of default judgment. SO ORDERED. Issued by Hon. Michael J. Roemer on 3/10/2021. (RAZ) TEXT ORDER/NEF mailed to defendant at 8815 Reynolds Rd., Franklinville, NY 14737. (Entered: 03/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketATTENTION CORPORATION PLAINTIFFS/DEFENDANTS: All Corporate Disclosure Statements pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.7.1(b) are to be filed within seven(7) days of this notice. (MD) (Entered: 02/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION to Strike #7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Saim Sarwar. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Gillespie, Tristan) (Entered: 02/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • Docket(#8) TEXT REFERRAL ORDER (DISPOSITIVE) - Hon. Michael J. Roemer, United States Magistrate Judge, is hereby designated to act in this case as follows: Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B), all pre-trial matters in this case are referred to the above-named United States Magistrate Judge, including but not limited to: (1) conduct of a scheduling conference and entry of a scheduling order pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16, (2) hearing and disposition of all non-dispositive motions or applications, (3) supervision of discovery, and (4) supervision of all procedural matters involving the aforementioned or involving the preparation of the case or any matter therein for consideration by the District Judge. The Magistrate Judge shall also hear and report upon dispositive motions for the consideration of the District Judge pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(B) and (C). All motions or applications shall be filed with the Clerk and made returnable before the Magistrate Judge. The parties are encouraged to consider the provisions of 28 U.S.C. 636(c) governing consent to either partial or complete disposition of the case, including trial if necessary, by the Magistrate Judge. Consent forms are available from the office of the Magistrate Judge or the office of the Clerk of Court. IT IS SO ORDERED. Issued by Hon. John L. Sinatra, Jr. on 2/22/2021. (KLH) (Entered: 02/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Oakes Oramel Inn LLC. (JLV) (Entered: 02/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION for Default Judgment as to Oakes Oramel Inn LLC by Saim Sarwar. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Affidavit, #3 Memorandum in Support)(Gillespie, Tristan) (Entered: 02/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Oakes Oramel Inn LLC. Copy mailed to Defendant at 8815 Reynolds Rd., Franklinville, NY 14737. (CGJ) (Entered: 02/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) REQUEST for Clerk's Entry of Default by Saim Sarwar against Oakes Oramel Inn LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Certificate of Service)(Gillespie, Tristan) (Entered: 02/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Saim Sarwar. Oakes Oramel Inn LLC served on 1/27/2021, answer due 2/17/2021. (Gillespie, Tristan) (Entered: 02/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to Oakes Oramel Inn LLC. (JD) (Entered: 01/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketNotice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at #http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (JD) (Entered: 01/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketAUTOMATIC REFERRAL to Mediation The ADR Plan is available for download at #http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution.(JD) (Entered: 01/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketCase Assigned to Hon. John L. Sinatra, Jr. Notification to Chambers of on-line civil case opening. (JD) (Entered: 01/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against OAKES ORAMEL INN LLC $ 402 receipt number 0209-4112029, filed by Saim Sarwar. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Gillespie, Tristan) (Entered: 01/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Tristan Wade Gillespie