This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/03/2022 at 07:43:06 (UTC).

Sartorius Bioanalytical Instruments, Inc. v. Gator Bio, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 03/04/2022 Sartorius Bioanalytical Instruments, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Gator Bio, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Edward J. Davila and Susan van Keulen. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:22-CV-01417

  • Filing Date:

    03/04/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Edward J. Davila

Referral Judge

Susan van Keulen

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Sartorius Bioanalytical Instruments, Inc.

Defendants

Gator Bio, Inc.

Hong Tan

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Stuart George Gross

Travis Smith

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) Proposed Summons. (Gross, Stuart) (Filed on 3/4/2022) (Entered: 03/04/2022)

#3

(#3) REPORT on the filing of an action regarding Patent Infringement (cc: form mailed to register). (Gross, Stuart) (Filed on 3/4/2022) Modified on 3/10/2022 (gba, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 03/04/2022)

#4

(#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement and Certification of Interested Entities or Persons by Sartorius Bioanalytical Instruments, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Sartorius AG, Other Affiliate Sartorius North America Inc., Other Affiliate Sartorius Lab Holding GmbH for Sartorius Bioanalytical Instruments, Inc.. (Gross, Stuart) (Filed on 3/4/2022) Modified on 3/10/2022 (gba, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 03/04/2022)

#6

(#6) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 5/31/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/7/2022 01:30 PM in Oakland, - To be determined. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/10/2022) (Entered: 03/10/2022)

#7

(#7) Summons Issued as to Gator Bio, Inc., Hong Tan. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/10/2022) (Entered: 03/10/2022)

#8

(#8) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Sartorius Bioanalytical Instruments, Inc... (Gross, Stuart) (Filed on 3/16/2022) (Entered: 03/16/2022)

10 #10

Main Document

10 #1

Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/18/2022
  • Docket(#11) CLERKS NOTICE RESETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOLLOWING REASSIGNMENT. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/9/2022 at 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 4, 5th Floor before the Hon. Edward J. Davila. Joint Case Management Statement due by 5/27/2022. The Court does not issue a revised Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ejdorders.. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (crr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2022) (Entered: 03/18/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Edward J. Davila for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore no longer assigned to case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by the Clerk on 3/17/2022. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(anj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2022) (Entered: 03/17/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • Docket(#9) CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (wft, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2022) (Entered: 03/16/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Sartorius Bioanalytical Instruments, Inc... (Gross, Stuart) (Filed on 3/16/2022) (Entered: 03/16/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Summons Issued as to Gator Bio, Inc., Hong Tan. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/10/2022) (Entered: 03/10/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 5/31/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/7/2022 01:30 PM in Oakland, - To be determined. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/10/2022) (Entered: 03/10/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • Docket(#5) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 3/18/2022. (jlg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2022) (Entered: 03/04/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement and Certification of Interested Entities or Persons by Sartorius Bioanalytical Instruments, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Sartorius AG, Other Affiliate Sartorius North America Inc., Other Affiliate Sartorius Lab Holding GmbH for Sartorius Bioanalytical Instruments, Inc.. (Gross, Stuart) (Filed on 3/4/2022) Modified on 3/10/2022 (gba, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 03/04/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) REPORT on the filing of an action regarding Patent Infringement (cc: form mailed to register). (Gross, Stuart) (Filed on 3/4/2022) Modified on 3/10/2022 (gba, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 03/04/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Proposed Summons. (Gross, Stuart) (Filed on 3/4/2022) (Entered: 03/04/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT; Jury Demand against Gator Bio, Inc., Hong Tan (Filing fee $ 402.00, receipt number ACANDC-16964115.). Filed by Sartorius Bioanalytical Instruments, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Gross, Stuart) (Filed on 3/4/2022) Modified on 3/10/2022 (gba, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 03/04/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less