This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/02/2022 at 08:25:31 (UTC).

Sarson v. Lindell Loft LLC et al

Case Summary

On 05/03/2022 Sarson filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Lindell Loft LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Missouri Eastern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is John A. Ross. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:22-CV-00493

  • Filing Date:

    05/03/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John A. Ross

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Kara N. Sarson

Defendants

Lindell Loft LLC

Coronado Place & Towers

Cardinal Group Management Midwest LLC

Securitas Security Services USA, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Richard K. Dowd

Attorney at DOWD AND DOWD PC

211 N. Broadway, Suite 4050

St. Louis, MO 63102

Alex Lumaghi

Attorney at DOWD AND DOWD PC

211 N. Broadway, Suite 4050

St. Louis, MO 63102

Defendant Attorneys

David R. Buchanan

Attorney at BROWN AND JAMES PC - Kansas City

2345 Grand Blvd., Suite 2100

Kansas City, MO 64108

John A. Mazzei

Attorney at BROWN AND JAMES PC - St Louis

800 Market St., Suite 1100

St. Louis, MO 63101

Matthew B. Champlin

Attorney at HEPLER BROOM LLC - Edwardsville

130 N. Main Street, P.O. Box 510

Edwardsville, IL 62025-0510

Benjamin W. Powell

Attorney at HEPLER BROOM LLC - Edwardsville

130 N. Main Street, P.O. Box 510

Edwardsville, IL 62025-0510

Emilee Bramstedt

Attorney at HEPLER BROOM LLC - Edwardsville

130 N. Main Street, P.O. Box 510

Edwardsville, IL 62025-0510

 

Court Documents

#23

(#23) CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: This case is assigned to Track: Track 2 (Standard). IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the following schedule shall apply in this case, and will be modified only upon a showing of exceptional circumstances: (SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS.) (Motion to Join Parties due by 10/1/2022. Discovery Completion due by 2/15/2023. ADR Future Reference 2/1/2023. Dispositive Motions due by 3/20/2023. Jury Trial set for 10/16/2023 09:00 AM in Courtroom 12N - St. Louis before District Judge John A. Ross. Pretrial Conference set for 10/12/2023 01:30 PM in Courtroom 12N - St. Louis before District Judge John A. Ross.) Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 6/8/2022. (LNJ) Modified on 6/9/2022; corrected dispositive motion ddl (JAB). (Entered: 06/08/2022)

#22

(#22) JOINT SCHEDULING PLAN by Plaintiff Kara N. Sarson. Joint Proposed Scheduling Plan. (Dowd, Richard) (Entered: 06/08/2022)

#21

(#21) ENTRY of Appearance by Alex Lumaghi for Plaintiff Kara N. Sarson. (Lumaghi, Alex) (Entered: 06/08/2022)

#19

(#19) MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney ;attorney/firm Benjamin W. Powell by Defendant Securitas Security Services USA, Inc.. (Powell, Benjamin) (Entered: 05/11/2022)

#18

(#18) ENTRY of Appearance by Emilee Bramstedt for Defendant Securitas Security Services USA, Inc.. (Bramstedt, Emilee) (Entered: 05/11/2022)

#17

(#17) ENTRY of Appearance by Matthew B. Champlin for Defendant Securitas Security Services USA, Inc.. (Champlin, Matthew) (Entered: 05/11/2022)

#16

(#16) ORDER REQUIRING JOINT PROPOSED SCHEDULING PLAN: IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that: 1. Scheduling Conference: Upon review of the joint proposed scheduling plan described in paragraph 3 below, the Court will consider whether a Scheduling Conference is necessary or advisable prior to the issuance of a Case Management Order. If counsel believe that a conference would be beneficial to the parties, they shall so notify the Court and one will be promptly set. (Joint Scheduling Plan due by 6/9/2022.) Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 5/9/22. (JAB) (Entered: 05/09/2022)

#15

(#15) ANSWER to Complaint Second Amended Petition by Securitas Security Services USA, Inc..(Powell, Benjamin) (Entered: 05/06/2022)

#14

(#14) DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Cardinal Group Management Midwest LLC.. (Mazzei, John) (Entered: 05/06/2022)

1 #9

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #8

Original Filing Form

1 #7

Exhibit G - Answers to Interrogatories

1 #6

Exhibit F - Talbott affidavit

1 #5

Exhibit E - Cardinal Group affidavit

1 #4

Exhibit D - Dwyer-Lindell Loft affidavit

1 #3

Exhibit C - State Court File

1 #2

Exhibit B - Second Amd Petition

1 #1

Exhibit A - Petition

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: This case is assigned to Track: Track 2 (Standard). IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the following schedule shall apply in this case, and will be modified only upon a showing of exceptional circumstances: (SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS.) (Motion to Join Parties due by 10/1/2022. Discovery Completion due by 2/15/2023. ADR Future Reference 2/1/2023. Dispositive Motions due by 3/20/2023. Jury Trial set for 10/16/2023 09:00 AM in Courtroom 12N - St. Louis before District Judge John A. Ross. Pretrial Conference set for 10/12/2023 01:30 PM in Courtroom 12N - St. Louis before District Judge John A. Ross.) Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 6/8/2022. (LNJ) Modified on 6/9/2022; corrected dispositive motion ddl (JAB). (Entered: 06/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) JOINT SCHEDULING PLAN by Plaintiff Kara N. Sarson. Joint Proposed Scheduling Plan. (Dowd, Richard) (Entered: 06/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) ENTRY of Appearance by Alex Lumaghi for Plaintiff Kara N. Sarson. (Lumaghi, Alex) (Entered: 06/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) Docket Text ORDER: Re: #19 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney ;attorney/firm Benjamin W. Powell by Defendant Securitas Security Services USA, Inc.. (Powell, Benjamin) ; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 5/11/22. (JAB) (Entered: 05/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney ;attorney/firm Benjamin W. Powell by Defendant Securitas Security Services USA, Inc.. (Powell, Benjamin) (Entered: 05/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) ENTRY of Appearance by Emilee Bramstedt for Defendant Securitas Security Services USA, Inc.. (Bramstedt, Emilee) (Entered: 05/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) ENTRY of Appearance by Matthew B. Champlin for Defendant Securitas Security Services USA, Inc.. (Champlin, Matthew) (Entered: 05/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ORDER REQUIRING JOINT PROPOSED SCHEDULING PLAN: IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that: 1. Scheduling Conference: Upon review of the joint proposed scheduling plan described in paragraph 3 below, the Court will consider whether a Scheduling Conference is necessary or advisable prior to the issuance of a Case Management Order. If counsel believe that a conference would be beneficial to the parties, they shall so notify the Court and one will be promptly set. (Joint Scheduling Plan due by 6/9/2022.) Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 5/9/22. (JAB) (Entered: 05/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ANSWER to Complaint Second Amended Petition by Securitas Security Services USA, Inc..(Powell, Benjamin) (Entered: 05/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Cardinal Group Management Midwest LLC.. (Mazzei, John) (Entered: 05/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 05/03/2022
  • Docket***REMARK: Attorney for defendant Securitas Security Services USA, Inc. contacted by Clerk's Office and directed to file Notice of Filing Notice of Removal to plaintiff. (JWD) (Entered: 05/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) #6 Second Amended Petition (Removal/Transfer) filed by Defendant Lindell Loft LLC. (JWD) (Entered: 05/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) #6 Second Amended Petition (Removal/Transfer) filed by Defendant Cardinal Group Management Midwest LLC. (JWD) (Entered: 05/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Second Amended Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: Circuit Court of the City of St. Louis, filed by Kara N. Sarson.(JWD) (Entered: 05/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • Docket***REMARK: First Amended State Court Petition was not included in the state court file attached to the Notice of Removal. (JWD) (Entered: 05/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: Circuit Court of the City of St. Louis, filed by Kara N. Sarson.(JWD) (Entered: 05/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Securitas Security Services USA, Inc.. Parent companies: Securitas Services, Inc., Subsidiaries: none, Publicly held company: none,. (Powell, Benjamin) (Entered: 05/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Defendant Securitas Security Services USA, Inc.. (Powell, Benjamin) (Entered: 05/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ENTRY of Appearance by Benjamin W. Powell for Defendant Securitas Security Services USA, Inc.. (Powell, Benjamin) (Entered: 05/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from City of St. Louis, case number 1922-CC12132, with receipt number AMOEDC-9271978, in the amount of $402 Jury Demand,, filed by Securitas Security Services USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Petition, #2 Exhibit B - Second Amd Petition, #3 Exhibit C - State Court File, #4 Exhibit D - Dwyer-Lindell Loft affidavit, #5 Exhibit E - Cardinal Group affidavit, #6 Exhibit F - Talbott affidavit, #7 Exhibit G - Answers to Interrogatories, #8 Original Filing Form, #9 Civil Cover Sheet)(Powell, Benjamin) (Entered: 05/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Cardinal Group Management, LLC dba The Proper is a litigant

Latest cases where SECURITAS SECURITY SERVICES USA INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Richard K. Dowd

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Alex Lumaghi