This case was last updated from PACER on 03/09/2020 at 08:33:00 (UTC).

Sarmiento v. Texas Department of Criminal Justice

Case Summary

On 01/09/2020 Sarmiento filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against Texas Department of Criminal Justice. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Fred Biery. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:20-CV-00044

  • Filing Date:

    01/09/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Fred Biery

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Reynaldo Ricardo Sarmiento

San Antonio, TX 78207

Respondent

Texas Department of Criminal Justice

 

Court Documents

1 #2

Copy of envelope

#1

(#1) Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Reynaldo Ricardo Sarmiento. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Copy of envelope)(nm) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

#5

(#5) JUDGMENT - ORDERED that the petition for writ of habeas corpus pursuant to28 U.S.C. 2254 (ECF No. 1) filed by petitioner Reynaldo Ricardo Sarmiento is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Fred Biery. (rg) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

#3

(#3) Case Opening Letter to Reynaldo Ricardo Sarmiento. (nm) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

#2

(#2) MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis by Reynaldo Ricardo Sarmiento. (nm) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

#4

(#4) ORDER OF DISMISSAL re #1 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Reynaldo Ricardo Sarmiento is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE for failure to exhaust state remedies; this Court DENIES petitioner a certificate of appealability. Signed by Judge Fred Biery. (rg) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) JUDGMENT - ORDERED that the petition for writ of habeas corpus pursuant to28 U.S.C. 2254 (ECF No. 1) filed by petitioner Reynaldo Ricardo Sarmiento is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Fred Biery. (rg) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER OF DISMISSAL re #1 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Reynaldo Ricardo Sarmiento is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE for failure to exhaust state remedies; this Court DENIES petitioner a certificate of appealability. Signed by Judge Fred Biery. (rg) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketText Order GRANTING #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis entered by Judge Fred Biery. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jg5) (Entered: 01/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Case Opening Letter to Reynaldo Ricardo Sarmiento. (nm) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis by Reynaldo Ricardo Sarmiento. (nm) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Reynaldo Ricardo Sarmiento. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Copy of envelope)(nm) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Chestney. (nm) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • THIS CASE HAS BEEN RANDOMLY ASSIGNED TO JUDGE FRED BIERY. (nm) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.