This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/01/2022 at 06:32:18 (UTC).

Sarkissian v. Kaiser Foundation Hospitals et al

Case Summary

On 03/17/2022 Sarkissian filed a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability lawsuit against Kaiser Foundation Hospitals. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Ohio Southern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Edmund A. Sargus and Kimberly A. Jolson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-01664

  • Filing Date:

    03/17/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Edmund A. Sargus

Referral Judge

Kimberly A. Jolson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Hildegard Sarkissian

Defendants

Kaiser Foundation Hospitals

The Permanente Medical Group

Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc.

C R Bard Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Raymond Parker White

Attorney at Poswall, White and Brelsford

1001 G Street, Suite 301

Sacramento, CA 95814

Defendant Attorneys

Kevin M Hara

Attorney at Reed Smith LLP

355 South Grand Avenue, Suite 2900

Los Angeles, CA 90071-1514

Eric John Buhr

Attorney at Reed Smith LLP

355 S. Grand Avenue, Suite 2900

Los Angeles, CA 90071-1514

Michael Kevin Brown

Attorney at Reed Smith LLP

355 South Grand Avenue Suite 2900

Los Angeles, CA 90071-1514

William Darrell Kloss, Jr.

Attorney at Vorys Sater Seymour & Pease - 2

Po Box 1008, 52 E Gay Street

Columbus, OH 43216-1008

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE. Signed by Judge MDL Panel on 3/15/2022. (jml, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/15/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/17/2022.] (Entered: 03/16/2022)

#13

(#13) Short Form ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand filed by C R Bard Inc. (Kloss, William) (Entered: 04/12/2022)

12 #1

*Restricted*

12 #12

Main Document Public Docket Sheet

#10

(#10) STIPULATION To Extend Time To Respond To Complaint (L.R. 6-1) filed by C. R. Bard, Inc. and Hildegard Sarkissian. (Buhr, Eric) (Filed on 3/4/2022) Modified on 3/7/2022 (anj, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 3/17/2022.] (Entered: 03/04/2022)

#9

(#9) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by C. R. Bard, Inc. re #8 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines, #1 Notice of Removal, #2 Jury Demand, #5 Notice (Other), Electronic Filing Error, 7 Case Assigned by Intake,, #6 Certificate of Service, #3 Certificate of Interested Entities, #4 Certificate of Interested Entities (Buhr, Eric) (Filed on 3/2/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/17/2022.] (Entered: 03/02/2022)

#8

(#8) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 5/26/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/2/2022 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor. (anj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/17/2022.] (Entered: 03/02/2022)

#6

(#6) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE/ PROOF OF SERVICE by C. R. Bard, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal, #2 Jury Demand, #5 Notice (Other), #3 Certificate of Interested Entities, #4 Certificate of Interested Entities (Buhr, Eric) (Filed on 3/1/2022) Modified on 3/2/2022 (anj, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 3/17/2022.] (Entered: 03/01/2022)

#5

(#5) Notice Of Pendency Of Other Actions Or Proceedings by C. R. Bard, Inc. (Buhr, Eric) (Filed on 3/1/2022) Modified on 3/2/2022 (anj, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 3/17/2022.] (Entered: 03/01/2022)

#4

(#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement by C. R. Bard, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Becton, Dickinson and Company, Other Affiliate T. Rowe Price Group, Inc. for C. R. Bard, Inc.. (Buhr, Eric) (Filed on 3/1/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/17/2022.] (Entered: 03/01/2022)

#3

(#3) Certificate of Interested Entities by C. R. Bard, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent T. Rowe Price Group, Inc., Corporate Parent Becton, Dickinson and Company for C. R. Bard, Inc.. (Buhr, Eric) (Filed on 3/1/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/17/2022.] (Entered: 03/01/2022)

#2

(#2) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by C. R. Bard, Inc.. (Buhr, Eric) (Filed on 3/1/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/17/2022.] (Entered: 03/01/2022)

1 #5

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #4

Exhibit D - Amended Complaint

1 #3

Exhibit C - Dismissal of Hospital Defendants

1 #2

Exhibit B - MDL Transfer Order

1 #1

Exhibit A - Complaint and State Court papers

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Short Form ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand filed by C R Bard Inc. (Kloss, William) (Entered: 04/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • DocketJudge Edmund A. Sargus and Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson added. (er) (Entered: 03/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Case transferred in from District of California Northern; Case Number 3:22-cv-01292. Original file electronic copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 03/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE. Signed by Judge MDL Panel on 3/15/2022. (jml, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/15/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/17/2022.] (Entered: 03/16/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) STIPULATION To Extend Time To Respond To Complaint (L.R. 6-1) filed by C. R. Bard, Inc. and Hildegard Sarkissian. (Buhr, Eric) (Filed on 3/4/2022) Modified on 3/7/2022 (anj, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 3/17/2022.] (Entered: 03/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by C. R. Bard, Inc. re #8 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines, #1 Notice of Removal, #2 Jury Demand, #5 Notice (Other), Electronic Filing Error, 7 Case Assigned by Intake,, #6 Certificate of Service, #3 Certificate of Interested Entities, #4 Certificate of Interested Entities (Buhr, Eric) (Filed on 3/2/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/17/2022.] (Entered: 03/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 5/26/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/2/2022 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor. (anj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/17/2022.] (Entered: 03/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket#Electronic filing error. NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Kevin Michael Hara. The docket shows a different address from what is appearing on the document. Please update your personal pr ofile on ECF. Re: #1 Notice of Removal, filed by C. R. Bard, Inc. (anj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/17/2022.] (Entered: 03/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • Docket(#7) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 3/16/2022. (anj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/17/2022.] (Entered: 03/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE/ PROOF OF SERVICE by C. R. Bard, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal, #2 Jury Demand, #5 Notice (Other), #3 Certificate of Interested Entities, #4 Certificate of Interested Entities (Buhr, Eric) (Filed on 3/1/2022) Modified on 3/2/2022 (anj, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 3/17/2022.] (Entered: 03/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Notice Of Pendency Of Other Actions Or Proceedings by C. R. Bard, Inc. (Buhr, Eric) (Filed on 3/1/2022) Modified on 3/2/2022 (anj, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 3/17/2022.] (Entered: 03/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement by C. R. Bard, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Becton, Dickinson and Company, Other Affiliate T. Rowe Price Group, Inc. for C. R. Bard, Inc.. (Buhr, Eric) (Filed on 3/1/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/17/2022.] (Entered: 03/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Certificate of Interested Entities by C. R. Bard, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent T. Rowe Price Group, Inc., Corporate Parent Becton, Dickinson and Company for C. R. Bard, Inc.. (Buhr, Eric) (Filed on 3/1/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/17/2022.] (Entered: 03/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by C. R. Bard, Inc.. (Buhr, Eric) (Filed on 3/1/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/17/2022.] (Entered: 03/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand from San Francisco Superior Court. Their case number is CGC-20-588458. (Filing fee $402 receipt number ACANDC-16950627). Filed by C. R. Bard, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint and State Court papers, #2 Exhibit B - MDL Transfer Order, #3 Exhibit C - Dismissal of Hospital Defendants, #4 Exhibit D - Amended Complaint, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Buhr, Eric) (Filed on 3/1/2022) Modified on 3/2/2022 (anj, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 3/17/2022.] (Entered: 03/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where The Permanente Medical Group is a litigant

Latest cases where KAISER FOUNDATION HOSPITALS is a litigant

Latest cases where KAISER FOUNDATION HEALTH PLAN INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where C.R. Bard, Inc. is a litigant