This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/01/2023 at 06:59:02 (UTC).

Saravenaz Safai et al. v. Flagstar Bancorp, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 01/31/2023 Saravenaz Safai filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Flagstar Bancorp, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Michigan Eastern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Elizabeth A. Stafford and Linda V. Parker. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:23-CV-10241

  • Filing Date:

    01/31/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Elizabeth A. Stafford

Presiding Judge

Linda V. Parker

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Saravenaz Safai

Defendants

Flagstar Bancorp Inc.

Flagstar Bank FSB

Does 1-50, inclusive

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Seyed A Kazerounian

Attorney at Kazerounian Law Group, APC

245 Fischer Avenue, Suite D1

Costa Mesa, CA 92626

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Exhibit A - Complaint

1 #2

Exhibit B - 2022.08.23 Minute Order

1 #3

Exhibit C - First Amended Class Action Complaint

1 #4

Exhibit D - Case Management Order

1 #5

Exhibit E - 2022.11.01 Status Conference Continued

1 #6

Exhibit F- Summons and Initiating State Court documents

1 #7

Declaration of William E. Ridgway and Exhibits 1-3

2 #2

Main Document

2 #1

Proposed Order

#3

(#3) ORDER Granting Joint Stipulation 9 to Transfer Venue to the Eastern District of Michigan and to Toll and Extend Flagstar's Deadline to Respond to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint by Judge David O. Carter. Case Electronically Sent. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated.) SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. (twdb) [Transferred from cacd on 1/31/2023.] (Entered: 01/30/2023)

4 #4

Main Document Public Docket Sheet

4 #1

*Restricted*

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/31/2023
  • DocketTEXT-ONLY NOTICE: This case has been transferred from the Central District of California. Pending motions must be refiled on this court's docket by the filing party. Attorneys not admitted to practice in this court must complete the attorney admissions application and be admitted before appearing on this court's docket. All previously filed documents can be accessed on the originating court's docket using PACER. (VLun) (Entered: 01/31/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Docket Sheet from California Central; Case Number 8:23-cv-00165. (Entered: 01/31/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER Granting Joint Stipulation 9 to Transfer Venue to the Eastern District of Michigan and to Toll and Extend Flagstar's Deadline to Respond to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint by Judge David O. Carter. Case Electronically Sent. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated.) SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. (twdb) [Transferred from cacd on 1/31/2023.] (Entered: 01/30/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Joint STIPULATION to Transfer Case to Eastern District Of Michigan And To Toll And Extend Flagstar's Deadline To Respond To Plaintiff's Amended Complaint filed by defendants Flagstar Bancorp, Inc., Flagstar Bank, FSB. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Van Ness, Caroline) [Transferred from cacd on 1/31/2023.] (Entered: 01/30/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) TRANSFERREDNOTICE OF REMOVAL from Orange County Superior Court, case number 302022-01266908-CU-NP-CXC Receipt No: ACACDC-34691062 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendants Flagstar Bank, FSB, Flagstar Bancorp, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - 2022.08.23 Minute Order, #3 Exhibit C - First Amended Class Action Complaint, #4 Exhibit D - Case Management Order, #5 Exhibit E - 2022.11.01 Status Conference Continued, #6 Exhibit F- Summons and Initiating State Court documents, #7 Declaration of William E. Ridgway and Exhibits 1-3) (Attorney Caroline Williams Van Ness added to party Flagstar Bancorp, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Caroline Williams Van Ness added to party Flagstar Bank, FSB(pty:dft))(Van Ness, Caroline)[Transferred from California Central; Case Number 8:23-cv-00165.] (Entered: 01/26/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less