This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/02/2022 at 07:35:18 (UTC).

Sarah Countryman et al v. Kia Motors America Inc et al

Case Summary

On 06/03/2022 Sarah Countryman filed a Property - Personal Property Product Liability lawsuit against Kia Motors America Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Cormac J. Carney and Autumn D. Spaeth. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:22-CV-01117

  • Filing Date:

    06/03/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Cormac J. Carney

Referral Judge

Autumn D. Spaeth

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Sarah Countryman

Richmond, VA 23225

Matthew Countryman

Richmond, VA 23225

Defendants

Kia Motors America Inc

Hyman Bros Nissan Kia

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Hyman Bros Nissan Kia

1 #3

Kia Motors America, Inc.

#2

(#2) CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Matthew Countryman, Sarah Countryman, (sh) (Entered: 06/06/2022)

#3

(#3) REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, Declaration in Support filed by Plaintiff Matthew Countryman, Sarah Countryman. (sh) (Entered: 06/06/2022)

#4

(#4) DECLARATION In Support of Plaintiffs Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis #3 filed by Plaintiffs Matthew Countryman, Sarah Countryman. (sh) (Entered: 06/06/2022)

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Cormac J. Carney and Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth. (sh) (Entered: 06/06/2022)

#6

(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (sh) (Entered: 06/06/2022)

#7

(#7) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (sh) (Entered: 06/06/2022)

#8

(#8) ORDER by Judge Cormac J. Carney: Denying #3 REQUEST to Proceed in Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60). This case is hereby DISMISSED immediately. MD JS-6, Case Terminated. (twdb) (Entered: 06/15/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER by Judge Cormac J. Carney: Denying #3 REQUEST to Proceed in Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60). This case is hereby DISMISSED immediately. MD JS-6, Case Terminated. (twdb) (Entered: 06/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (sh) (Entered: 06/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (sh) (Entered: 06/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Cormac J. Carney and Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth. (sh) (Entered: 06/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) DECLARATION In Support of Plaintiffs Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis #3 filed by Plaintiffs Matthew Countryman, Sarah Countryman. (sh) (Entered: 06/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, Declaration in Support filed by Plaintiff Matthew Countryman, Sarah Countryman. (sh) (Entered: 06/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Matthew Countryman, Sarah Countryman, (sh) (Entered: 06/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Defendants Hyman Bros Nissan Kia, Kia Motors America Inc.Case assigned to Judge Cormac J. Carney for all further proceedings. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth. Jury Demanded., filed by Plaintiff Sarah Countryman, Matthew Countryman. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Hyman Bros Nissan Kia, #3 Kia Motors America, Inc.) (sh) (Entered: 06/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Kia Motors America, Inc. is a litigant