This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/14/2021 at 15:10:54 (UTC).

Sarabia v. Burns et al

Case Summary

On 07/09/2021 Sarabia filed a Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange lawsuit against Burns. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Delaware District. The Judges overseeing this case are Leonard P. Stark and Stephanos Bibas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-01010

  • Filing Date:

    07/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Leonard P. Stark

Stephanos Bibas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Evaristo Sarabia

Defendants

Stephen S. Burns

Julio C. Rodriquez

Michael Fabian

Darren Post

Phil Richard Schmidt

David T. Hamamoto

Keith A. Feldman

Jane Reiss

Dale G. Spencer

Michael D. Gates

Mickey W. Kowitz

Angela Strand Boydston

Martin J. Rucidlo

Mark A. Walsh

Andrew C. Richardson

Steven R. Hash

Judith A. Hannaway

Nominal Defendant

Lordstown Motors Corp.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Ryan M. Ernst

Attorney at Bielli & Klauder, LLC

1204 N. Market Street

Wilmington, DE 19801

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Verification

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

#3

#4

(#4) Joint STIPULATION Regarding Related Action and Consolidation by Angela Strand Boydston, Stephen S. Burns, Michael Fabian, Keith A. Feldman, Michael D. Gates, David T. Hamamoto, Mickey W. Kowitz, Lordstown Motors Corp., Jane Reiss, Julio C. Rodriquez, Phil Richard Schmidt, Dale G. Spencer. (Choa, Jonathan) (Entered: 09/27/2021)

#5

(#5) ORDER: DESIGNATION OF CIRCUIT JUDGE TO HOLD A DISTRICT COURT WITHIN THE CIRCUIT, designating and assigning the Honorable Stephanos Bibas of the United States Court of Appeals for the Third Circuit. Signed by Judge D. Brooks Smith, Chief Judge of the United States Court of Appeals for the Third Circuit on 10/1/2021. (rjb) (Entered: 10/01/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/01/2021
  • DocketCase Reassigned to Judge Stephanos Bibas of the United States Court of Appeals for the Third Circuit. Please include the initials of the Judge (SB) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb) (Entered: 10/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER: DESIGNATION OF CIRCUIT JUDGE TO HOLD A DISTRICT COURT WITHIN THE CIRCUIT, designating and assigning the Honorable Stephanos Bibas of the United States Court of Appeals for the Third Circuit. Signed by Judge D. Brooks Smith, Chief Judge of the United States Court of Appeals for the Third Circuit on 10/1/2021. (rjb) (Entered: 10/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketCase associated with lead case: Create association to 1:21-cv-00604-LPS. (ntl) (Entered: 09/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSO ORDERED, re #4 Joint STIPULATION Regarding Related Action and Consolidation with lead case no. 21-604-LPS. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 9/28/21. (ntl) (Entered: 09/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Joint STIPULATION Regarding Related Action and Consolidation by Angela Strand Boydston, Stephen S. Burns, Michael Fabian, Keith A. Feldman, Michael D. Gates, David T. Hamamoto, Mickey W. Kowitz, Lordstown Motors Corp., Jane Reiss, Julio C. Rodriquez, Phil Richard Schmidt, Dale G. Spencer. (Choa, Jonathan) (Entered: 09/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Evaristo Sarabia: For Angela Strand Boydston waiver sent on 7/30/2021, answer due 9/28/2021; Stephen S. Burns waiver sent on 7/30/2021, answer due 9/28/2021; Michael Fabian waiver sent on 7/30/2021, answer due 9/28/2021; Keith A. Feldman waiver sent on 7/30/2021, answer due 9/28/2021; Michael D. Gates waiver sent on 7/30/2021, answer due 9/28/2021; David T. Hamamoto waiver sent on 7/30/2021, answer due 9/28/2021; Judith A. Hannaway waiver sent on 7/30/2021, answer due 9/28/2021; Steven R. Hash waiver sent on 7/30/2021, answer due 9/28/2021; Mickey W. Kowitz waiver sent on 7/30/2021, answer due 9/28/2021; Lordstown Motors Corp. waiver sent on 7/30/2021, answer due 9/28/2021; Darren Post waiver sent on 7/30/2021, answer due 9/28/2021; Jane Reiss waiver sent on 7/30/2021, answer due 9/28/2021; Andrew C. Richardson waiver sent on 7/30/2021, answer due 9/28/2021; Julio C. Rodriquez waiver sent on 7/30/2021, answer due 9/28/2021; Martin J. Rucidlo waiver sent on 7/30/2021, answer due 9/28/2021; Phil Richard Schmidt waiver sent on 7/30/2021, answer due 9/28/2021; Dale G. Spencer waiver sent on 7/30/2021, answer due 9/28/2021; Mark A. Walsh waiver sent on 7/30/2021, answer due 9/28/2021. (Klauder, David) (Entered: 08/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Leonard P. Stark. Please include the initials of the Judge (LPS) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb) (Entered: 07/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketNo Summons Issued. (myr) (Entered: 07/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (myr) (Entered: 07/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed against Angela Strand Boydston, Stephen S. Burns, Michael Fabian, Keith A. Feldman, Michael D. Gates, David T. Hamamoto, Judith A. Hannaway, Steven R. Hash, Mickey W. Kowitz, Lordstown Motors Corp., Darren Post, Jane Reiss, Andrew C. Richardson, Julio C. Rodriquez, Martin J. Rucidlo, Phil Richard Schmidt, Dale G. Spencer, Mark A. Walsh - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADEDC-3654546.) - filed by Evaristo Sarabia. (Attachments: #1 Verification, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(myr) (Entered: 07/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Lordstown Motors Corp. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ryan M. Ernst