This case was last updated from PACER on 07/15/2019 at 07:49:01 (UTC).

Sapp et al v. Industrial Action Services, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 05/16/2019 Sapp filed a Government Benefit - Government Benefit Recovery lawsuit against Industrial Action Services, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Delaware District. The Judge overseeing this case is Richard G. Andrews. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-00912

  • Filing Date:

    05/16/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Government Benefit Recovery

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Delaware District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Richard G. Andrews

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Kevin B Sapp

Jamie Hooper

Jamie Hopper

Defendants

Reladyne, LLC

Industrial Action Services, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Matthew F. Lintner

Attorney at Morris James LLP

500 Delaware Avenue, Suite 1500, P.O. Box 2306

Wilmington, DE 19899-2306

Albert J. Carroll

Attorney at Morris James LLP

500 Delaware Avenue, Suite 1500, P.O. Box 2306

Wilmington, DE 19899-2306

Alberto E. Chavez

Attorney at Morris James LLP

500 Delaware Avenue, Suite 1500, P.O. Box 2306

Wilmington, DE 19899-2306

Defendant Attorneys

Edward D. Shapiro

Irving M. Geslewitz

Peter C. McGivney

Attorney at Berger Harris, LLP

1105 N. Market Street, 11Th Floor

Wilmington, DE 19801

David B. Anthony

Attorney at Berger Harris, LLP

1105 N. Market Street, 11Th Floor

Wilmington, DE 19801

 

Court Documents

34 #2

Exhibit B

34 #1

Exhibit A

#34

(#34) Second AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants - filed by Kevin B Sapp, Jamie Hopper. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Lintner, Matthew) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

#33

(#33) SO ORDER Granting #32 Stipulated Consent to File Amended Complaint and Stipulation Relating to Scheduling (*Reset Answer Deadlines: Industrial Action Services, LLC answer due 8/1/2019; Reladyne, LLC answer due 8/1/2019. Amended Pleadings due by 7/1/2019) (see Stipulation for further details). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 6/18/2019. (nms) (Entered: 06/19/2019)

32 #1

Cover Letter to Judge Andrews from Matthew F. Lintner, Esquire

#32

(#32) STIPULATION regarding Consent to File Amended Complaint and Relating to Scheduling, by Jamie Hopper, Kevin B Sapp. (Attachments: #1 Letter)(Lintner, Matthew) Modified on 6/18/2019 (nms). (Entered: 06/18/2019)

#31

(#31) NOTICE of Appearance by Alberto E. Chavez on behalf of Jamie Hopper, Kevin B Sapp (Chavez, Alberto) (Entered: 06/18/2019)

#30

(#30) Order Setting Rule 16(b) Conference: A Scheduling Conference is set for 6/25/2019, at 10:00 AM in Chambers before Judge Richard G. Andrews (see Order for further details). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 6/10/2019. (nms) (Entered: 06/11/2019)

#29

(#29) OPENING BRIEF in Support re #28 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Industrial Action Services, LLC, Reladyne, LLC.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 6/21/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Anthony, David) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

3 #2

Proposed Order for Motion to Transfer

3 #1

Exhibit A

#2

(#2) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 7/12/2019 at 03:30 PM in Room 11521 before Judge Ewing Werlein, Jr. (Signed by Judge Ewing Werlein, Jr) Parties notified.(SarahShelbyadi, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 5/16/2019.] (Entered: 03/15/2019)

1 #5

Exhibit E

1 #4

Exhibit D

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from District Court of Harris County 127th, case number 2019-10428 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-22035760) filed by Reladyne, LLC, Industrial Action Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Sponsel, Thane) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 5/16/2019.] (Entered: 03/12/2019)

82 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#34) Second AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants - filed by Kevin B Sapp, Jamie Hopper. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Lintner, Matthew) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#33) SO ORDER Granting #32 Stipulated Consent to File Amended Complaint and Stipulation Relating to Scheduling (*Reset Answer Deadlines: Industrial Action Services, LLC answer due 8/1/2019; Reladyne, LLC answer due 8/1/2019. Amended Pleadings due by 7/1/2019) (see Stipulation for further details). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 6/18/2019. (nms) (Entered: 06/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#32) STIPULATION regarding Consent to File Amended Complaint and Relating to Scheduling, by Jamie Hopper, Kevin B Sapp. (Attachments: #1 Letter)(Lintner, Matthew) Modified on 6/18/2019 (nms). (Entered: 06/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#31) NOTICE of Appearance by Alberto E. Chavez on behalf of Jamie Hopper, Kevin B Sapp (Chavez, Alberto) (Entered: 06/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#30) Order Setting Rule 16(b) Conference: A Scheduling Conference is set for 6/25/2019, at 10:00 AM in Chambers before Judge Richard G. Andrews (see Order for further details). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 6/10/2019. (nms) (Entered: 06/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • Pro Hac Vice Attorneys Edward D. Shapiro and Irving M. Geslewitz for Industrial Action Services, LLC and Reladyne, LLC added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (ddp) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#29) OPENING BRIEF in Support re #28 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Industrial Action Services, LLC, Reladyne, LLC.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 6/21/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Anthony, David) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#28) MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings - filed by Industrial Action Services, LLC, Reladyne, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Anthony, David) Modified on 6/10/2019 (nms). (Entered: 06/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#27) Joint STATEMENT Pursuant to Local Rule 81.2, by Jamie Hopper, Kevin B Sapp. (Carroll, Albert) Modified on 6/7/2019 (nms). (Entered: 06/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SO ORDERED, re #26 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Kelsey D. Ratz, filed by Jamie Hopper, Kevin B Sapp, and #25 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Matthew J. Mussalli, filed by Jamie Hopper, Kevin B Sapp. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 6/6/2019. (nms) (Entered: 06/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 03/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Jamie Hooper, Kevin B Sapp, filed.(Mussalli, Matthew) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 5/16/2019.] (Entered: 03/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Submission Regarding Identity and Citizenship of Members of Defendants in Support of Notice of Removal by Industrial Action Services, LLC, Reladyne, LLC, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Sponsel, Thane) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 5/16/2019.] (Entered: 03/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) REPLY to #5 Opposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 6(b) , filed by Industrial Action Services, LLC, Reladyne, LLC. (Sponsel, Thane) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 5/16/2019.] (Entered: 03/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) AMENDED PETITION against All Defendants filed by Kevin B Sapp.(Mussalli, Matthew) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 5/16/2019.] (Entered: 03/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) RESPONSE in Opposition to #5 Opposed Motion for Extension of Time, filed by Kevin B Sapp. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Mussalli, Matthew) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 5/16/2019.] (Entered: 03/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Opposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 6(b) by Industrial Action Services, LLC, Reladyne, LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 4/9/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Sponsel, Thane) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 5/16/2019.] (Entered: 03/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER. Industrial Action Services, LLC and RelaDyne, LLC within 10 days after the entry of this Order, shall file verified proof indicating the identity and citizenship of any and all members of Defendants Industrial Action Services, LLC and RelaDyne, LLC, traced through each layer of each entity, however many there may be. (Signed by Judge Ewing Werlein, Jr) Parties notified. (marflores, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 5/16/2019.] (Entered: 03/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) MOTION to Transfer Case to United States District Court for the District of Delaware by Industrial Action Services, LLC, Reladyne, LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 4/5/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order for Motion to Transfer)(Sponsel, Thane) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 5/16/2019.] (Entered: 03/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 7/12/2019 at 03:30 PM in Room 11521 before Judge Ewing Werlein, Jr. (Signed by Judge Ewing Werlein, Jr) Parties notified.(SarahShelbyadi, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 5/16/2019.] (Entered: 03/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from District Court of Harris County 127th, case number 2019-10428 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-22035760) filed by Reladyne, LLC, Industrial Action Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Sponsel, Thane) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 5/16/2019.] (Entered: 03/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.