This case was last updated from PACER on 07/13/2020 at 09:41:56 (UTC).

Santos v. HBR Management, Inc.

Case Summary

On 03/09/2020 Santos filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against HBR Management, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Nevada District. The Judges overseeing this case are Kent J. Dawson and Elayna J. Youchah. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-00480

  • Filing Date:

    03/09/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Nevada District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Kent J. Dawson

Referral Judge

Elayna J. Youchah

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Adrian Santos

Defendants

HBR Management, Inc.

The Original Roofing Company

HBR Management, Inc. also known as The Original Roofing Company doing business as The Original Roofing Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Christian James Gabroy

Attorney at Gabroy Law Offices

170 South Green Valley Parkway

Henderson, NV 89012

Kaine M. Messer

Attorney at Gabroy Law Offices

170 S. Green Valley Pkwy., Ste 280

Henderson, NV 89012

Defendant Attorneys

Cody S. Mounteer

Attorney at Marquis Aurbach Coffing

10001 Park Run Drive

Las Vegas, NV 89145

Thomas William Stewart

Attorney at Marquis Aurbach Coffing

10001 Park Run Drive

Las Vegas, NV 89145

Thomas Stewart

Attorney at Valiente Mott

7785 W. Sahara Avenue, Suite 102

Las Vegas, NV 89117

 

Court Documents

#15

(#15) NOTICE of Change of Firm Affiliation by HBR Management, Inc.. (Stewart, Thomas) (Entered: 04/27/2020)

#13

(#13) SCHEDULING ORDER Granting #12 Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 11/13/2020. Motions due by 12/18/2020. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 1/18/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 4/2/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR) (Entered: 04/02/2020)

#12

(#12) Joint Stipulated Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order by Defendant HBR Management, Inc.. (Stewart, Thomas) (Entered: 04/01/2020)

#11

(#11) ORDER Granting #10 Stipulation for Substitution of Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 3/31/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR) (Entered: 03/31/2020)

#10

(#10) Unopposed STIPULATION for Substitution of Counsel by Defendant HBR Management, Inc.. (Stewart, Thomas) (Entered: 03/30/2020)

#9

(#9) STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant HBR Management, Inc.. (Mounteer, Cody) (Entered: 03/23/2020)

#8

(#8) ORDER denying #7 Stipulation to Extend Deadlines, without prejudice. Parties shall submit a revised stipulation. See order for detail. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 3/19/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS) (Entered: 03/19/2020)

#7

(#7) STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) re Discovery by Defendant HBR Management, Inc.. (Stewart, Thomas) (Entered: 03/17/2020)

#6

(#6) ANSWER re #1 Petition for Removal, filed by HBR Management, Inc.. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 4/30/2020.(Stewart, Thomas) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (Entered: 03/16/2020)

#5

(#5) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for #2 Minute Order Removal Case, by Defendant HBR Management, Inc.. (Stewart, Thomas) (Entered: 03/09/2020)

#4

(#4) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by HBR Management, Inc.. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Stewart, Thomas) (Entered: 03/09/2020)

#3

(#3) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Adrian Santos. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Gabroy, Christian) (Entered: 03/09/2020)

#2

(#2) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Kent J. Dawson on 3/9/2020. Statement regarding removed action is due by 3/24/2020. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 4/8/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR) (Entered: 03/09/2020)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Eighth Judicial District Court, Clark County, NV, Case Number A-20-809115-C, (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0978-5919240) by HBR Management, Inc. dba and aka The Original Roofing Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Stewart, Thomas) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (Entered: 03/09/2020)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) NOTICE of Change of Firm Affiliation by HBR Management, Inc.. (Stewart, Thomas) (Entered: 04/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2020
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. AO 85 Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (A copy of form AO 85 has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service.) (no image attached) (MR) (Entered: 04/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) SCHEDULING ORDER Granting #12 Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 11/13/2020. Motions due by 12/18/2020. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 1/18/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 4/2/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR) (Entered: 04/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Joint Stipulated Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order by Defendant HBR Management, Inc.. (Stewart, Thomas) (Entered: 04/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER Granting #10 Stipulation for Substitution of Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 3/31/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR) (Entered: 03/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Unopposed STIPULATION for Substitution of Counsel by Defendant HBR Management, Inc.. (Stewart, Thomas) (Entered: 03/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant HBR Management, Inc.. (Mounteer, Cody) (Entered: 03/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER denying #7 Stipulation to Extend Deadlines, without prejudice. Parties shall submit a revised stipulation. See order for detail. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 3/19/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS) (Entered: 03/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) re Discovery by Defendant HBR Management, Inc.. (Stewart, Thomas) (Entered: 03/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ANSWER re #1 Petition for Removal, filed by HBR Management, Inc.. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 4/30/2020.(Stewart, Thomas) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (Entered: 03/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for #2 Minute Order Removal Case, by Defendant HBR Management, Inc.. (Stewart, Thomas) (Entered: 03/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by HBR Management, Inc.. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Stewart, Thomas) (Entered: 03/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Adrian Santos. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Gabroy, Christian) (Entered: 03/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Kent J. Dawson on 3/9/2020. Statement regarding removed action is due by 3/24/2020. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 4/8/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR) (Entered: 03/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • DocketCase randomly assigned to Judge Kent J. Dawson and Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah. (MR) (Entered: 03/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Eighth Judicial District Court, Clark County, NV, Case Number A-20-809115-C, (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0978-5919240) by HBR Management, Inc. dba and aka The Original Roofing Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Stewart, Thomas) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (Entered: 03/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less