This case was last updated from PACER on 01/12/2020 at 07:48:11 (UTC).

Santiny Contractors, LLC v. Sayania et al

Case Summary

On 11/13/2019 Santiny Contractors, LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Sayania. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are John W. deGravelles and Erin Wilder-Doomes. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-00780

  • Filing Date:

    11/13/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Louisiana Middle District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John W. deGravelles

Referral Judge

Erin Wilder-Doomes

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Santiny Contractors, LLC

Defendants

Vicram Sayania

Nobel Hotels, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jacqueline Barber

Attorney at Law Office of Jacqueline Barber, LLC

3939 N. Causeway Blvd., Suite 301

Metairie, LA 70002

 

Court Documents

5 #2

Attachment Proposed Order

5 #1

Proposed Pleading;

#5

(#5) MOTION to Substitute Complaint by Santiny Contractors, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading;, #2 Attachment Proposed Order)(Barber, Jacqueline) (Entered: 12/02/2019)

#4

(#4) NOTICE AND ORDER: On or before 12/2/2019, Plaintiff Santiny Contractors, LLC shall file a motion to substitute its Complaint with a proposed pleading that is a comprehensive amended Complaint as set forth herein. The case will be allowed to proceed if jurisdiction is adequately established. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 11/22/2019. (SWE) Modified on 11/22/2019 to edit the docket text (SWE). Modified on 11/26/2019 to edit text(SWE). (Entered: 11/22/2019)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Civil Cover Sheet by Santiny Contractors, LLC (Barber, Jacqueline) (Entered: 11/14/2019)

#2

(#2) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 1/23/2020 at 03:30 PM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes. Status Report due by 1/9/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 11/14/2019. (BLR) (Entered: 11/14/2019)

1 #1

Exhibit Exhibit A

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-2031184.), filed by Santiny Contractors, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Barber, Jacqueline) (Attachment 1 replaced on 11/14/2019 to correct page orientation) (SWE). (Main Document 1 replaced on 12/3/2019 in accordance with RD 6) (SWE). (Entered: 11/13/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that the #5 Motion to Substitute Complaint filed by Plaintiff Santiny Contractors, LLC is HEREBY GRANTED. The Clerk is directed to substitute the Amended Complaint at R. Doc. 5-1 in the place of the original Complaint at R. Doc. 1, which shall become the operative Complaint in this matter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 12/3/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR) (Entered: 12/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION(S) REFERRED: #5 MOTION to Substitute Complaint . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (LT) (Entered: 12/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MOTION to Substitute Complaint by Santiny Contractors, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading;, #2 Attachment Proposed Order)(Barber, Jacqueline) (Entered: 12/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE AND ORDER: On or before 12/2/2019, Plaintiff Santiny Contractors, LLC shall file a motion to substitute its Complaint with a proposed pleading that is a comprehensive amended Complaint as set forth herein. The case will be allowed to proceed if jurisdiction is adequately established. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 11/22/2019. (SWE) Modified on 11/22/2019 to edit the docket text (SWE). Modified on 11/26/2019 to edit text(SWE). (Entered: 11/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of Civil Cover Sheet by Santiny Contractors, LLC (Barber, Jacqueline) (Entered: 11/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 1/23/2020 at 03:30 PM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes. Status Report due by 1/9/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 11/14/2019. (BLR) (Entered: 11/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-2031184.), filed by Santiny Contractors, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Barber, Jacqueline) (Attachment 1 replaced on 11/14/2019 to correct page orientation) (SWE). (Main Document 1 replaced on 12/3/2019 in accordance with RD 6) (SWE). (Entered: 11/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.