This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/15/2022 at 08:37:56 (UTC).

Santicola v. Hunter-Tannersville Central School District et al

Case Summary

On 01/14/2022 Santicola filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Hunter-Tannersville Central School District. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Glenn T. Suddaby and Therese Wiley Dancks. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-00029

  • Filing Date:

    01/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Glenn T. Suddaby

Referral Judge

Therese Wiley Dancks

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ronald V. Santicola

Lanesville, NY 12450

Defendants

Hunter-Tannersville Central School District

President Joseph Biden

Vice President Kamala Harris

Senator Charles Schumer

Congresswoman Nancy Pelosi

Secretary of State Antony Blinken

Director of FBI Christopher Wray

Govenor Kathy Hochul

John L. Hennessy

Sundar Pichal

Pope Francis

Attorney General Merrick Garland

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) Plaintiff's notice of voluntary dismissal without prejudice pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i).(mgh) Modified on 1/25/2022 to change from a letter motion to a ntc. of vol. dismissal (sal ). (Entered: 01/24/2022)

6 #1

Attachment to Pro Se Notice

6 #6

Main Document

#5

(#5) G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Conference set for 4/14/2022 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 4/7/2022. All conferences are conducted by telephone. Plaintiff's attorney will initiate the call (unless the Court directs differently) and shall contact Judge Dancks' Chambers at 315-234-8618 (a dedicated line solely for telephone conferences) once all parties are on the line. Counsel may use a teleconferencing service for assistance initiating conference calls to the Court. For cases involving pro se parties, the Court will initiate the call for the Rule 16 Conference. Pro se parties are instructed to provide the Court with a telephone number where they may be reached for a conference call. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (mgh) (Entered: 01/14/2022)

#4

(#4) MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Ronald V. Santicola. Motions referred to Therese Wiley Dancks. (mgh) (Entered: 01/14/2022)

#3

(#3) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis with attachments filed by Ronald V. Santicola Motions referred to Therese Wiley Dancks. (mgh) (Entered: 01/14/2022)

2 #11

Summons Issued as to Pope Francis

2 #10

Summons Issued as to CEO Sundar Pichal

2 #9

Summons Issued as to Chairman John L. Hennessy

2 #8

Summons Issued as to Governor Kathy Hochul

2 #7

Summons Issued as to Director of the FBI Christopher Wray

2 #6

Summons Issued as to Attorney General Merrick B. Garland

2 #5

Summons Issued as to Secretary of State Antony J. Blinken

2 #4

Summons Issued as to Congresswoman Nancy Pelosi

2 #3

Summons Issued as to Senator Charles Schumer

2 #2

Summmons Issued as to Vice President Kamala Harris

2 #1

Summons Issued as to President Joseph Biden

2 #2

Main Document

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) TEXT ORDER DISMISSING CASE that, because such a #9 notice of voluntary dismissal is self-executing, the Clerk of Court is directed to close the action. SO ORDERED by Chief Judge Glenn T. Suddaby on 1/25/2022. (Copy served upon plaintiff via regular mail) (sal) (Entered: 01/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Plaintiff's notice of voluntary dismissal without prejudice pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i).(mgh) Modified on 1/25/2022 to change from a letter motion to a ntc. of vol. dismissal (sal ). (Entered: 01/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • Docket(#8) AMENDED TEXT ORDER: Court has reviewed the docket. The Court is in the process of reviewing the complaint for sufficiency under 28 USC Section 1915(e)(2) and will issue a determination in due time. However, since Plaintiff paid the requisite filing fee, the Clerk is directed to issue the summonses and Plaintiff is solely responsible for serving the respective summons and complaint on each of the defendants in accordance with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and the NDNY Local Rules. The Court also has before it a Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis and a Motion to Appoint Counsel, which will also be decided by the Court in due course. Because the Court is conducting an initial review, the 4/14/2022 initial conference (see General Order 25) and the related deadlines of exchange of Rule 26 Mandatory Disclosures and filing of a Civil Case Management Plan are adjourned without new date at this time. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks on 1/18/2022. (A copy of this Text Order has been served on pro se party(ies) via regular mail.(sg) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • Docket(#7) TEXT ORDER: Court has reviewed the docket. The Court is in the process of reviewing the complaint for sufficiency under 28 USC Section 1915 before it can direct service of the complaint and will issue a determination in due time. The Court also has before it a Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis and a Motion to Appoint Counsel, which will also be decided by the Court in due course. Because the Court is conducting an initial review, the 4/14/2022 initial conference (see General Order 25) and the related deadlines of exchange of Rule 26 Mandatory Disclosures and filing of a Civil Case Management Plan are adjourned without new date at this time. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks on 1/18/2022. (A copy of this Text Order has been served on pro se party(ies) via regular mail.)(sg) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) PRO SE HANDBOOK and NOTICE mailed to Ronald V. Santicola on 1/14/2022. (Attachments: #1 Attachment to Pro Se Notice) (mgh) (Entered: 01/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Conference set for 4/14/2022 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 4/7/2022. All conferences are conducted by telephone. Plaintiff's attorney will initiate the call (unless the Court directs differently) and shall contact Judge Dancks' Chambers at 315-234-8618 (a dedicated line solely for telephone conferences) once all parties are on the line. Counsel may use a teleconferencing service for assistance initiating conference calls to the Court. For cases involving pro se parties, the Court will initiate the call for the Rule 16 Conference. Pro se parties are instructed to provide the Court with a telephone number where they may be reached for a conference call. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (mgh) (Entered: 01/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Ronald V. Santicola. Motions referred to Therese Wiley Dancks. (mgh) (Entered: 01/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis with attachments filed by Ronald V. Santicola Motions referred to Therese Wiley Dancks. (mgh) (Entered: 01/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to Joseph Biden, Antony Blinken, Francis, Kamala Harris, John L. Hennessy, Kathy Hochul, Hunter-Tannersville Central School District, Nancy Pelosi, Sundar Pichal, Charles Schumer, Christopher Wray. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued as to President Joseph Biden, #2 Summmons Issued as to Vice President Kamala Harris, #3 Summons Issued as to Senator Charles Schumer, #4 Summons Issued as to Congresswoman Nancy Pelosi, #5 Summons Issued as to Secretary of State Antony J. Blinken, #6 Summons Issued as to Attorney General Merrick B. Garland, #7 Summons Issued as to Director of the FBI Christopher Wray, #8 Summons Issued as to Governor Kathy Hochul, #9 Summons Issued as to Chairman John L. Hennessy, #10 Summons Issued as to CEO Sundar Pichal, #11 Summons Issued as to Pope Francis)(mgh) (Entered: 01/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Joseph Biden, Antony Blinken, Francis, Kamala Harris, John L. Hennessy, Kathy Hochul, Hunter-Tannersville Central School District, Nancy Pelosi, Sundar Pichal, Charles Schumer, Christopher Wray and Merrick Garland.(Filing fee $402 receipt number ALB012310) filed by Ronald V. Santicola. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Attachment, #4 Cover Letter, #5 Mailing Envelope)(mgh) Modified on 1/19/2022 (mgh). (Entered: 01/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Director of F.B.I. Christopher A. Wray is a litigant