This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/21/2021 at 08:31:09 (UTC).

Santee v. Oceaneering International, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 10/22/2021 Santee filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Oceaneering International, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is David Hittner. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:21-CV-03489

  • Filing Date:

    10/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

David Hittner

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Shanon R Santee

Defendants

Oceaneering International, Inc.

Transocean Offshore Deepwater Drilling Inc

Chevron U.S.A. Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Kurt B Arnold

Attorney at Arnold Itkin LLP

6009 Memorial Dr

Houston, TX 77007

John Gregory Grinnan, Jr

Attorney at Arnold & Itkin LLP

6009 Memorial Drive

Houston, TX 77007

Defendant Attorneys

Michael J Wray

Attorney at Holman Fenwick Willan USA LLP

5151 San Felipe, Suite 400

Houston, TX 77056

Robert L Klawetter

Attorney at Eastham Watson Dale & Forney

808 Travis Street,, Suite 1300

Houston, TX 77002

Michael Anthony Golemi

Attorney at Liskow Lewis

1001 Fannin St, Suite 1800

Houston, TX 77002

Jody M SchiselMeslin

Attorney at Liskow & Lewis

1001 Fannin St, Ste 1800

Houston, TX 77002

 

Court Documents

9 #4

Proposed Order

9 #3

Exhibit

9 #2

Exhibit

9 #1

Exhibit

#9

(#9) Joint RESPONSE to #7 MOTION to Remand filed by Chevron U.S.A. Inc., Transocean Offshore Deepwater Drilling Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Proposed Order)(SchiselMeslin, Jody) (Entered: 12/10/2021)

8 #5

Proposed Order on Plaintiff's Motion to Remand

8 #4

Exhibit 3 POB

8 #3

Exhibit 2 Santee Incident Statement

8 #2

Exhibit 1-A Santee Work History

8 #1

Exhibit 1 Daigle Declaration

#8

(#8) RESPONSE to #7 MOTION to Remand filed by Oceaneering International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Daigle Declaration, #2 Exhibit 1-A Santee Work History, #3 Exhibit 2 Santee Incident Statement, #4 Exhibit 3 POB, #5 Proposed Order on Plaintiff's Motion to Remand)(Wray, Michael) (Entered: 12/09/2021)

7 #3

Proposed Order

7 #2

Exhibit B

7 #1

Exhibit A

#7

(#7) MOTION to Remand by Shanon R Santee, filed. Motion Docket Date 12/10/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Proposed Order)(Grinnan, John) (Entered: 11/19/2021)

#6

(#6) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Transocean Offshore Deepwater Drilling Inc, filed.(Klawetter, Robert) (Entered: 11/09/2021)

#5

(#5) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Oceaneering International, Inc., filed.(Wray, Michael) (Entered: 11/08/2021)

#4

(#4) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Chevron U.S.A. Inc., filed.(SchiselMeslin, Jody) (Entered: 11/04/2021)

25 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Joint RESPONSE to #7 MOTION to Remand filed by Chevron U.S.A. Inc., Transocean Offshore Deepwater Drilling Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Proposed Order)(SchiselMeslin, Jody) (Entered: 12/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) RESPONSE to #7 MOTION to Remand filed by Oceaneering International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Daigle Declaration, #2 Exhibit 1-A Santee Work History, #3 Exhibit 2 Santee Incident Statement, #4 Exhibit 3 POB, #5 Proposed Order on Plaintiff's Motion to Remand)(Wray, Michael) (Entered: 12/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION to Remand by Shanon R Santee, filed. Motion Docket Date 12/10/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Proposed Order)(Grinnan, John) (Entered: 11/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Transocean Offshore Deepwater Drilling Inc, filed.(Klawetter, Robert) (Entered: 11/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Oceaneering International, Inc., filed.(Wray, Michael) (Entered: 11/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Chevron U.S.A. Inc., filed.(SchiselMeslin, Jody) (Entered: 11/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ANSWER to Complaint by Oceaneering International, Inc., filed.(Wray, Michael) (Entered: 10/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 1/5/2022 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 703 before Magistrate Judge Peter Bray. (Signed by Judge David Hittner) Parties notified.(ShannonHoldenadi, 4) (Entered: 10/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 165th Judicial District Court of Harris County, case number 2021-59104 (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0541-27237811) filed by Chevron U.S.A. Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Supplement, #7 Civil Cover Sheet, #8 Civil Cover Sheet, #9 Supplement, #10 Supplement, #11 Supplement, #12 Supplement)(Golemi, Michael) (Entered: 10/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Oceaneering International Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where Transocean Offshore Deepwater Drilling, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Chevron USA, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jody M SchiselMeslin