This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/10/2022 at 07:58:48 (UTC).

Santa Barbara Cottage v. Humana Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 05/11/2022 Santa Barbara Cottage filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Humana Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr and Alicia G. Rosenberg. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-03211

  • Filing Date:

    05/11/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr

Referral Judge

Alicia G. Rosenberg

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Santa Barbara Cottage Hospital

Defendants

Humana Insurance Company

Humana Health Plan, Inc.

DOES 1 through 25, inclusive

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Karlene Jasmine Rogers-Aberman

Melanie Joy Stephenson-Laws

Richard A Lovich

Venetia Byars

Defendant Attorneys

Ronald K Alberts

Shannon Lissa Ernster

 

Court Documents

#15

(#15) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr. The Court sets an in-person Mandatory Scheduling Conference set for hearing on July 29, 2022 at 8:30 AM before Judge Stanley Blumenfeld Jr. The parties shall file a Joint Rule 26(f) Report by July 19, 2022. SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS. (jgr) (Entered: 07/01/2022)

#14

(#14) ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) filed by Defendants Humana Health Plan, Inc., Humana Insurance Company.(Ernster, Shannon) (Entered: 07/01/2022)

#13

(#13) NOTICE OF DISMISSAL filed by Plaintiff Santa Barbara Cottage Hospital pursuant to FRCP 41a(1) as to Humana Health Plan of California, Inc.. (Byars, Venetia) (Entered: 06/30/2022)

#12

(#12) MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr.: The parties filed a Second Stipulation seeking to extend Defendants' time to respond to the complaint by an additional 14 days #11 . The Court elects to grant the requested two-week extension with an admonition that the parties should not expect a further continuance. The parties are further advised that this extension will not extend the case management deadlines that will be set, and they are ordered to include this sentence verbatim in their Joint Rule 26(f) Report in the statement of the case. Court Reporter: N/A. (gk) (Entered: 06/22/2022)

11 #1

Proposed Order Further Extending Defendants Deadline to Respond to Plaintiffs Co

11 #11

Main Document

#10

(#10) NOTICE CONFIRMING NOTIFICATION TO STATE COURT OF REMOVAL filed by Defendants Humana Health Plan of California, Inc., Humana Health Plan, Inc., Humana Insurance Company. (Ernster, Shannon) (Entered: 05/23/2022)

#9

(#9) Joint STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Humana Health Plan, Inc. answer now due 6/17/2022; Humana Health Plan of California, Inc. answer now due 6/17/2022; Humana Insurance Company answer now due 6/17/2022, re Complaint - (Discovery) filed by Defendants Humana Health Plan, Inc.; Humana Health Plan of California, Inc.; Humana Insurance Company.(Ernster, Shannon) (Entered: 05/13/2022)

#8

(#8) CIVIL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr. (jgr) (Entered: 05/11/2022)

#7

(#7) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (jtil) (Entered: 05/11/2022)

#6

(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil) (Entered: 05/11/2022)

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr and Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. (jtil) (Entered: 05/11/2022)

#4

(#4) NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Defendants Humana Health Plan of California, Inc., Humana Health Plan, Inc., Humana Insurance Company. correcting Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties,,, #3 (Ernster, Shannon) (Entered: 05/11/2022)

#3

(#3) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Humana Health Plan of California, Inc., Humana Health Plan, Inc., Humana Insurance Company, identifying Santa Barbara Cottage Hospital, Plaintiff; Humana Insurance Company, Defendant and subsidiary of Humana Inc.; Humana Health Plan of California, Inc., Defendant and subsidiary of Humana Inc.; Humana Health Plan, Inc., Defendant subsidiary of Humana Inc.; Arcadian Health Plan, Inc., subsidiary of Humana Inc. and real party in interest; and CHA HMO, Inc, subsidiary of Humana Inc. and real party in interest. (Attorney Ronald K Alberts added to party Humana Health Plan of California, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Ronald K Alberts added to party Humana Health Plan, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Ronald K Alberts added to party Humana Insurance Company(pty:dft))(Alberts, Ronald) (Entered: 05/11/2022)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants HUMANA HEALTH PLAN OF CALIFORNIA, INC., a California corporation, HUMANA HEALTH PLAN, INC., a Delaware for-profit corporation, HUMANA INSURANCE COMPANY, a Wisconsin for-profit corporation. (Ernster, Shannon) (Entered: 05/11/2022)

1 #2

Declaration In Support of Removal

1 #1

Declaration In Support of Removal

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

07/01/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#15) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr. The Court sets an in-person Mandatory Scheduling Conference set for hearing on July 29, 2022 at 8:30 AM before Judge Stanley Blumenfeld Jr. The parties shall file a Joint Rule 26(f) Report by July 19, 2022. SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS. (jgr) (Entered: 07/01/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/01/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#14) ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) filed by Defendants Humana Health Plan, Inc., Humana Insurance Company.(Ernster, Shannon) (Entered: 07/01/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/30/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#13) NOTICE OF DISMISSAL filed by Plaintiff Santa Barbara Cottage Hospital pursuant to FRCP 41a(1) as to Humana Health Plan of California, Inc.. (Byars, Venetia) (Entered: 06/30/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/21/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#12) MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr.: The parties filed a Second Stipulation seeking to extend Defendants' time to respond to the complaint by an additional 14 days #11 . The Court elects to grant the requested two-week extension with an admonition that the parties should not expect a further continuance. The parties are further advised that this extension will not extend the case management deadlines that will be set, and they are ordered to include this sentence verbatim in their Joint Rule 26(f) Report in the statement of the case. Court Reporter: N/A. (gk) (Entered: 06/22/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/16/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#11) Joint STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to July 1, 2022 re Complaint - (Discovery) filed by Defendants Humana Health Plan of California, Inc., Humana Health Plan, Inc., Humana Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Further Extending Defendants Deadline to Respond to Plaintiffs Complaint)(Ernster, Shannon) (Entered: 06/16/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/23/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#10) NOTICE CONFIRMING NOTIFICATION TO STATE COURT OF REMOVAL filed by Defendants Humana Health Plan of California, Inc., Humana Health Plan, Inc., Humana Insurance Company. (Ernster, Shannon) (Entered: 05/23/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/13/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#9) Joint STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Humana Health Plan, Inc. answer now due 6/17/2022; Humana Health Plan of California, Inc. answer now due 6/17/2022; Humana Insurance Company answer now due 6/17/2022, re Complaint - (Discovery) filed by Defendants Humana Health Plan, Inc.; Humana Health Plan of California, Inc.; Humana Insurance Company.(Ernster, Shannon) (Entered: 05/13/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/11/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#8) CIVIL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr. (jgr) (Entered: 05/11/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/11/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (jtil) (Entered: 05/11/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/11/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil) (Entered: 05/11/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/11/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr and Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. (jtil) (Entered: 05/11/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/11/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Defendants Humana Health Plan of California, Inc., Humana Health Plan, Inc., Humana Insurance Company. correcting Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties,,, #3 (Ernster, Shannon) (Entered: 05/11/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/11/2022

DocketCONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiff Santa Barbara Cottage Hospital in Santa Barbara Superior Court on 3/30/2022, attached to Ernster Decl as Exhibit A. (jtil) (Entered: 05/11/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/11/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Humana Health Plan of California, Inc., Humana Health Plan, Inc., Humana Insurance Company, identifying Santa Barbara Cottage Hospital, Plaintiff; Humana Insurance Company, Defendant and subsidiary of Humana Inc.; Humana Health Plan of California, Inc., Defendant and subsidiary of Humana Inc.; Humana Health Plan, Inc., Defendant subsidiary of Humana Inc.; Arcadian Health Plan, Inc., subsidiary of Humana Inc. and real party in interest; and CHA HMO, Inc, subsidiary of Humana Inc. and real party in interest. (Attorney Ronald K Alberts added to party Humana Health Plan of California, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Ronald K Alberts added to party Humana Health Plan, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Ronald K Alberts added to party Humana Insurance Company(pty:dft))(Alberts, Ronald) (Entered: 05/11/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/11/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants HUMANA HEALTH PLAN OF CALIFORNIA, INC., a California corporation, HUMANA HEALTH PLAN, INC., a Delaware for-profit corporation, HUMANA INSURANCE COMPANY, a Wisconsin for-profit corporation. (Ernster, Shannon) (Entered: 05/11/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/11/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Santa Barbara County Superior Court, case number 22CV01260 Receipt No: ACACDC-33281757 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendants HUMANA HEALTH PLAN, INC., a Delaware for-profit corporation, HUMANA HEALTH PLAN OF CALIFORNIA, INC., a California corporation, HUMANA INSURANCE COMPANY, a Wisconsin for-profit corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration In Support of Removal, #2 Declaration In Support of Removal) (Attorney Shannon Lissa Ernster added to party HUMANA HEALTH PLAN OF CALIFORNIA, INC., a California corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Shannon Lissa Ernster added to party HUMANA HEALTH PLAN, INC., a Delaware for-profit corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Shannon Lissa Ernster added to party HUMANA INSURANCE COMPANY, a Wisconsin for-profit corporation(pty:dft))(Ernster, Shannon) (Entered: 05/11/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less