This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/01/2022 at 07:42:50 (UTC).

Sansom v. Syngenta Crop Protection, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 11/02/2021 Sansom filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Syngenta Crop Protection, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Haywood S Gilliam, Jr. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:21-CV-08532

  • Filing Date:

    11/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Haywood S Gilliam, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Loren Sansom

Defendants

Syngenta Crop Protection, LLC

Syngenta AG

Chevron Phillips Chemical Company LP

Chevron USA, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Steven D. Davis

Attorney at TorHoerman Law LLC

210 South Main Street

Edwardsville, IL 62025

Defendant Attorney

Celeste Marie Brecht

Attorney at Jones Day

555 South Flower Street, 50Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Exhibit Declaration and Exhibits

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

#3

(#3) Notice of Compliance by Chevron USA, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal (Brecht, Celeste) (Filed on 11/3/2021) Modified on 11/4/2021 (bns, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 11/03/2021)

#4

(#4) Certificate of Interested Entities by Chevron USA, Inc. (Brecht, Celeste) (Filed on 11/3/2021) (Entered: 11/03/2021)

#5

(#5) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Chevron USA, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Chevron U.S.A. Holdings Inc. and Chevron Corporation for Chevron USA, Inc.. (Brecht, Celeste) (Filed on 11/3/2021) (Entered: 11/03/2021)

#6

(#6) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 1/24/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/31/2022 01:30 PM. (bns, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2021) (Entered: 11/04/2021)

#7

(#7) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Chevron USA, Inc... (Brecht, Celeste) (Filed on 11/15/2021) (Entered: 11/15/2021)

#8

(#8) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Loren Sansom.. (Davis, Steven) (Filed on 11/16/2021) (Entered: 11/16/2021)

#10

(#10) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Haywood S Gilliam, Jr for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim no longer assigned to case,. Signed by The Clerk on 11/17/21. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2021) (Entered: 11/17/2021)

#12

(#12) CONDITIONAL ORDER (CTO-10) re MDL 3004, In re: Paraquat Products Liability Litigation. This case will be transferred to the Southern District of Illinois. Signed by Judge MDL Panel on 11/24/2021. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2021) (Entered: 11/30/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/30/2021
  • DocketCase transferred from California Northern has been opened in Southern District of Illinois as case 3:21-pq-01509, filed 11/30/2021. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2021) (Entered: 11/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • DocketNotified IT to transfer case. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2021) (Entered: 11/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) CONDITIONAL ORDER (CTO-10) re MDL 3004, In re: Paraquat Products Liability Litigation. This case will be transferred to the Southern District of Illinois. Signed by Judge MDL Panel on 11/24/2021. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2021) (Entered: 11/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • Docket(#11) CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOR REASSIGNED CIVIL CASE.Notice is hereby given that a Case Management Conference has been set for February 1, 2022, before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr., at 2:00 p.m., in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, 1301 Clay Street, Oakland, CA. Case Management Statement due by January 25th. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. All future filings should reflect the case number as 4:21-cv-08532-HSG. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2021) (Entered: 11/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Haywood S Gilliam, Jr for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim no longer assigned to case,. Signed by The Clerk on 11/17/21. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2021) (Entered: 11/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • Docket(#9) CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (mkl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2021) (Entered: 11/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Loren Sansom.. (Davis, Steven) (Filed on 11/16/2021) (Entered: 11/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Chevron USA, Inc... (Brecht, Celeste) (Filed on 11/15/2021) (Entered: 11/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 1/24/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/31/2022 01:30 PM. (bns, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2021) (Entered: 11/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Chevron USA, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Chevron U.S.A. Holdings Inc. and Chevron Corporation for Chevron USA, Inc.. (Brecht, Celeste) (Filed on 11/3/2021) (Entered: 11/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Certificate of Interested Entities by Chevron USA, Inc. (Brecht, Celeste) (Filed on 11/3/2021) (Entered: 11/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Notice of Compliance by Chevron USA, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal (Brecht, Celeste) (Filed on 11/3/2021) Modified on 11/4/2021 (bns, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 11/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • Docket(#2) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 11/17/2021. (anj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2021) (Entered: 11/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Contra Costa Superior Court. Their case number is C21-01595. (Filing fee $402 receipt number ACANDC-16585065). Filed byChevron USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration and Exhibits, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Brecht, Celeste) (Filed on 11/2/2021) (Entered: 11/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Syngenta Crop Protection L L C is a litigant

Latest cases where Syngenta, AG is a litigant

Latest cases where CHEVRON PHILLIPS CHEMICAL COMPANY LP is a litigant

Latest cases where Chevron USA, Inc. is a litigant