This case was last updated from PACER on 08/06/2019 at 07:10:35 (UTC).

Sanrio, Inc. v. FAB Starpoint LLC

Case Summary

On 06/07/2019 Sanrio, Inc filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against FAB Starpoint LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Alka Sagar and Stephen V. Wilson. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-04977

  • Filing Date:

    06/07/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Alka Sagar

Presiding Judge

Stephen V. Wilson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Sanrio, Inc.

Defendant

FAB Starpoint LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Mark Andrew Grannis

Attorney at Harris Wilshire and Grannis LLP

1919 M Street Nw 8Th Floor

Washington, DC 20036

Defendant Attorney

Aryeh L Kaufman

Attorney at Law Office of Aryeh Kaufman

5482 Wilshire Boulevard Suite 1907

Los Angeles, CA 90036

 

Court Documents

#13

(#13) Receipt of Order of Remand filed. (mrgo) (Entered: 07/15/2019)

#12

(#12) TRANSMITTAL of documents to Los Angeles County Superior Court. A certified copy of the order of remand and a copy of the docket sheet from this court was sent to Los Angeles County Superior Court. (mrgo) (Entered: 06/21/2019)

#11

(#11) ORDER ON STIPULATION TO REMAND REMOVED ACTION by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. Case remanded to Los Angeles County Superior Court, Case number 19TRCV00410. Case Terminated. Made JS-6. (mrgo) (Entered: 06/21/2019)

10 #1

Proposed Order on Joint Stipulation to Remand Case

#10

(#10) Joint STIPULATION to Remand Case to State Court filed by Defendant FAB Starpoint LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order on Joint Stipulation to Remand Case)(Kaufman, Aryeh) (Entered: 06/14/2019)

#9

(#9) ORDER SETTING INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE for 7/22/2019 at 3:00 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (pc) (Entered: 06/10/2019)

#8

(#8) NEW CASE ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (pc) (Entered: 06/10/2019)

#7

(#7) NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Joseph Lipari. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (esa) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

#6

(#6) NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Jason Sultzer. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (esa) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

#5

(#5) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

#4

(#4) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Stephen V. Wilson and Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. (esa) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

#3

(#3) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant FAB Starpoint LLC. (Kaufman, Aryeh) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant FAB Starpoint LLC, (Kaufman, Aryeh) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

1 #5

Exhibit ''E'' - Order to Show Cause Hearing

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior - Torrance Courthouse, case number 19TRCV00410 Receipt No: 0973-23882477 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant FAB Starpoint LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ''A'' - State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit ''B'' - State Civil Case Cover Sheet and Addendum Thereto, #3 Exhibit ''C'' - State Court Notice of Case Assignment and Notice of Case Management Conference, #4 Exhibit ''D'' - Proof of Service of State Complaint, #5 Exhibit ''E'' - Order to Show Cause Hearing) (Attorney Aryeh L Kaufman added to party FAB Starpoint LLC(pty:dft))(Kaufman, Aryeh) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

1 #4

Exhibit ''D'' - Proof of Service of State Complaint

1 #3

Exhibit ''C'' - State Court Notice of Case Assignment and No

1 #2

Exhibit ''B'' - State Civil Case Cover Sheet and Addendum Th

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) Receipt of Order of Remand filed. (mrgo) (Entered: 07/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) TRANSMITTAL of documents to Los Angeles County Superior Court. A certified copy of the order of remand and a copy of the docket sheet from this court was sent to Los Angeles County Superior Court. (mrgo) (Entered: 06/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) ORDER ON STIPULATION TO REMAND REMOVED ACTION by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. Case remanded to Los Angeles County Superior Court, Case number 19TRCV00410. Case Terminated. Made JS-6. (mrgo) (Entered: 06/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Joint STIPULATION to Remand Case to State Court filed by Defendant FAB Starpoint LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order on Joint Stipulation to Remand Case)(Kaufman, Aryeh) (Entered: 06/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER SETTING INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE for 7/22/2019 at 3:00 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (pc) (Entered: 06/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NEW CASE ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (pc) (Entered: 06/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Joseph Lipari. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (esa) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Jason Sultzer. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (esa) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Stephen V. Wilson and Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. (esa) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • CONFORMED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE executed by Plaintiff Sanrio, Inc., upon Defendant FAB Starpoint LLC served on 5/10/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Edward Doe, Manager, in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity. Original Summons NOT returned. (Filed in state court 5/17/19, submitted as document 1, attachment 4) (esa) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against defendant FAB Starpoint LLC, Jury Demand, filed by plaintiff Sanrio, Inc. (Filed in state court 5/8/19, submitted as document 1, attachment 1) (esa) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant FAB Starpoint LLC. (Kaufman, Aryeh) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant FAB Starpoint LLC, (Kaufman, Aryeh) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior - Torrance Courthouse, case number 19TRCV00410 Receipt No: 0973-23882477 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant FAB Starpoint LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ''A'' - State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit ''B'' - State Civil Case Cover Sheet and Addendum Thereto, #3 Exhibit ''C'' - State Court Notice of Case Assignment and Notice of Case Management Conference, #4 Exhibit ''D'' - Proof of Service of State Complaint, #5 Exhibit ''E'' - Order to Show Cause Hearing) (Attorney Aryeh L Kaufman added to party FAB Starpoint LLC(pty:dft))(Kaufman, Aryeh) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.