This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/06/2022 at 04:27:02 (UTC).

SanMedica International et al v. Metabolic Research Center et al

Case Summary

On 05/14/2020 SanMedica International filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against Metabolic Research Center. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Utah District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Daphne A. Oberg and Jill N. Parrish. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-00316

  • Filing Date:

    05/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Daphne A. Oberg

Presiding Judge

Jill N. Parrish

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

SanMedica International

Quality IP Holdings

Defendants

Metabolic Research Center

Metabolic Research Center of Jacksonville

Metabolic Research Center of Fort Walton Beach

Metabolic Research Center of Merritt Island

Metabolic Research Center of Brevard County

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jason M. Kerr

Attorney at PRICE PARKINSON & KERR PLLC

5742 W Harold Gatty Dr Ste 101

Salt Lake City, UT 84116

Ronald F. Price

Attorney at PRICE PARKINSON & KERR PLLC

5742 W Harold Gatty Dr

Salt Lake City, UT 84116

Steven Garff

Attorney at PRICE PARKINSON & KERR PLLC

5742 W Harold Gatty Dr Ste 101

Salt Lake City, UT 84116

Defendant Attorneys

Robert S. Weisbein

Attorney at FOLEY & LARDNER LLP

90 Park Ave

New York, NY 10016-1314

Wesley D. Felix

Attorney at FELIX PLLC

68 S Main St Ste 800

Salt Lake City, UT 84101

William Bradley Russell

Attorney at FOLEY & LARDNER LLP

1 Independent Dr Ste 1300

Jacksonville, FL 32202

Brenda E. Weinberg

Attorney at FELIX WEINBERG PLLC

68 S Main St Ste 800

Salt Lake City, UT 84101

 

Court Documents

#28

(#28) Report on the Final Decision of an action sent to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (alf) (Entered: 05/04/2021)

27 #1

Text of Proposed Order Dismissing Case without Prejudice

27 #27

Main Document

#25

(#25) Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Motion to Dismiss filed by Plaintiffs Quality IP Holdings, SanMedica International. Motions referred to Daphne A. Oberg.(Kerr, Jason) (Entered: 03/31/2021)

23 #1

Text of Proposed Order

23 #23

Main Document

#22

(#22) NOTICE of Appearance by Brenda E. Weinberg on behalf of Metabolic Research Center, Metabolic Research Center of Brevard County, Metabolic Research Center of Fort Walton Beach, Metabolic Research Center of Jacksonville, Metabolic Research Center of Merritt Island (Weinberg, Brenda) (Entered: 02/03/2021)

17 #1

Affidavit of Soileau

17 #17

Main Document

#8

#6

#5

RESTRICTED

#4

RESTRICTED

3 #1

Complaint

#3

2 #1

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

#2

#1

24 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) Report on the Final Decision of an action sent to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (alf) (Entered: 05/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Terminated per Notice #27 . Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg no longer assigned to case (alf) (Entered: 05/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) Plaintiff's NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL MOTION to Dismiss Voluntary without prejudice filed by Plaintiffs Quality IP Holdings, SanMedica International. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Dismissing Case without Prejudice)(Kerr, Jason) Modified on 5/4/2021 to a notice from a motion. Motion does not need to be filed (alf). (Entered: 05/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) DOCKET TEXT ORDER granting #25 Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiffs shall have until May 3, 2021 to respond to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss #17 . Signed by Judge Jill N. Parrish on 4/1/2021. No attached document. (do) (Entered: 04/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Motion to Dismiss filed by Plaintiffs Quality IP Holdings, SanMedica International. Motions referred to Daphne A. Oberg.(Kerr, Jason) (Entered: 03/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) DOCKET TEXT ORDER granting #23 Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiffs shall have until April 1, 2021 to respond to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Jill N. Parrish on 3/1/2021. No attached document. (do) (Entered: 03/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Motion to Dismiss filed by Plaintiffs Quality IP Holdings, SanMedica International. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) Motions referred to Daphne A. Oberg.(Garff, Steven) (Entered: 02/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) NOTICE of Appearance by Brenda E. Weinberg on behalf of Metabolic Research Center, Metabolic Research Center of Brevard County, Metabolic Research Center of Fort Walton Beach, Metabolic Research Center of Jacksonville, Metabolic Research Center of Merritt Island (Weinberg, Brenda) (Entered: 02/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) ORDER granting #19 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney William Bradley Russell for Metabolic Research Center, Metabolic Research Center of Brevard County, Metabolic Research Center of Fort Walton Beach, Metabolic Research Center of Jacksonville and Metabolic Research Center of Merritt Island.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html. Instructions are available at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/rules-practice. Signed by Judge Jill N. Parrish on 2/2/21. (alf) (Entered: 02/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) ORDER granting #18 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Robert S. Weisbein for Metabolic Research Center, Metabolic Research Center of Brevard County, Metabolic Research Center of Fort Walton Beach, Metabolic Research Center of Jacksonville and Metabolic Research Center of Merritt Island.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html. Instructions are available at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/rules-practice. Signed by Judge Jill N. Parrish on 2/2/21. (alf) (Entered: 02/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 10/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Ex Parte (Not Sealed) MOTION for Service by Publication filed by Plaintiffs Quality IP Holdings, SanMedica International. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Steven Garff, #2 Text of Proposed Order Order) Motions referred to Daphne A. Oberg.(Kerr, Jason) (Entered: 10/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE- Plaintiffs are directed to respond to this Order to Show Cause on or before October 29, 2020, to inform the court of the status of this action and their intentions to proceed. Failure to do so may result in dismissal of this action. Signed by Judge Jill N. Parrish on 10/08/2020. (nl) (Entered: 10/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within the earlier of fourteen(14) days after any defendant has appeared or twenty-eight (28) days after any defendant has been served with the complaint. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg on 6/8/20. (alf) (Entered: 06/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • Docket(#7) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg under 28:636 (b)(1)(A), Magistrate to hear and determine all nondispositive pretrial matters. No attached document. Signed by Judge Jill N. Parrish on 6/5/20. (ss) (Entered: 06/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CIVIL STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge Jill N. Parrish on 6/4/20. (ss) (Entered: 06/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT****Corrected**Summons Issued Electronically as to Metabolic Research Center. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (jl) (Entered: 05/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued as to Metabolic Research Center. (jl) (Entered: 05/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Report on the Filing of an action sent to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (jl) (Entered: 05/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AUTDC-3576183) filed by SanMedica International, Quality IP Holdings. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) Assigned to Judge Jill N. Parrish (Kerr, Jason) (Entered: 05/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Case has been indexed and assigned to Judge Jill N. Parrish. Plaintiffs Quality IP Holdings, SanMedica International is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (jl) (Entered: 05/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SanMedica International is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Steven William Garff

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ronald F. Price