This case was last updated from PACER on 07/13/2019 at 11:12:32 (UTC).

Sanks v. Board of Trustees, Plumbers and Pipefitters Local 553

Case Summary

On 04/05/2019 Sanks filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against Board of Trustees, Plumbers and Pipefitters Local 553. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are J. Phil Gilbert and Gilbert C. Sison. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-00381

  • Filing Date:

    04/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Illinois Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

J. Phil Gilbert

Referral Judge

Gilbert C. Sison

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

John R Sanks

Sandpoint, ID 83864

Defendant

Board of Trustees, Plumbers and Pipefitters Local 553

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Deborah A. Arbogast

7905 Forsyth Boulevard

Clayton, MO 63105

Defendant Attorney

Janine M. Martin

Attorney at Hammond and Shinners, P.C.

13205 Manchester Road, Suite 210

St. Louis, MO 63131

 

Court Documents

#29

(#29) MEMORANDUM in Support of Defendant's Motion to dismiss #17 - Response filed by John R Sanks. (amv) (Entered: 07/12/2019)

#28

(#28) RESPONSE to Motion re #17 MOTION to Dismiss filed by John R Sanks. (amv) (Entered: 07/11/2019)

#27

(#27) MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion for Sanctions (response) re #23 MOTION for Sanctions filed by John R Sanks. (amv) (Entered: 07/11/2019)

#26

(#26) RESPONSE to Motion re #23 MOTION for Sanctions filed by John R Sanks. (amv) (Entered: 07/11/2019)

24 #3

Exhibit C to Memorandum

24 #2

Exhibit B to Memorandum

#24

(#24) MEMORANDUM in Support re #23 MOTION for Sanctions filed by Board of Trustees, Plumbers and Pipefitters Local 553. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Memorandum, #2 Exhibit B to Memorandum, #3 Exhibit C to Memorandum)(Martin, Janine) (Entered: 06/12/2019)

#23

(#23) MOTION for Sanctions by Board of Trustees, Plumbers and Pipefitters Local 553. (Martin, Janine) (Entered: 06/12/2019)

#17

(#28) RESPONSE to Motion re #17 MOTION to Dismiss filed by John R Sanks. (amv) (Entered: 07/11/2019)

#7

(#8) ORDER denying at this time the #7 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. A review of the motion reveals that counsel did not follow Local Rule 83.1(g) in filing the motion. Counsel is free to file another motion to withdraw that comports with Local Rule 83.1(g). Signed by Magistrate Judge Gilbert C. Sison on 4/9/2019. (klh)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED. (Entered: 04/09/2019)

#6

(#6) EXHIBITS by John R Sanks to #1 Complaint. (amv) (Entered: 04/08/2019)

#5

(#5) Summons Issued as to Board of Trustees, Plumbers and Pipefitters Local 553 and returned to attorney for service. (trb) (Entered: 04/08/2019)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Deborah A. Arbogast on behalf of John R Sanks (Arbogast, Deborah) (Entered: 04/08/2019)

2 #1

Consent Brochure

#2

(#2) Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge J. Phil Gilbert and Magistrate Judge Gilbert C. Sison assigned. All future documents must bear case number 19-381-JPG-GCS. If the parties consent to Magistrate Judge assignment, the consent form with instruction is attached for your convenience. (Attachments: #1 Consent Brochure)(trb) (Entered: 04/05/2019)

1 #2

Summons

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#6) EXHIBITS by John R Sanks to #1 Complaint. (amv) (Entered: 04/08/2019)

24 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint see Doc. #29 by John R Sanks. (amv) (Entered: 07/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#29) MEMORANDUM in Support of Defendant's Motion to dismiss #17 - Response filed by John R Sanks. (amv) (Entered: 07/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#28) RESPONSE to Motion re #17 MOTION to Dismiss filed by John R Sanks. (amv) (Entered: 07/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#27) MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion for Sanctions (response) re #23 MOTION for Sanctions filed by John R Sanks. (amv) (Entered: 07/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#26) RESPONSE to Motion re #23 MOTION for Sanctions filed by John R Sanks. (amv) (Entered: 07/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#25) ORDER re #23 MOTION for Sanctions filed by Board of Trustees, Plumbers and Pipefitters Local 553. This matter comes before the Court for case management. As of this date, Sanks has not filed a response to the June 12, 2019 motion for sanctions. Under Local Rule 7.1(g), Sanks had fourteen days to respond to the motion. Thus, the Court DIRECTS Sanks to file a response to the motion for sanctions on or before July 15, 2019. The Court notes that the failure to respond to the motion "may, in the Court's discretion, be considered an admission of the merits of the motion" and may result in the dismissal of his case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gilbert C. Sison on 7/8/2019. (klh)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED. (Entered: 07/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#24) MEMORANDUM in Support re #23 MOTION for Sanctions filed by Board of Trustees, Plumbers and Pipefitters Local 553. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Memorandum, #2 Exhibit B to Memorandum, #3 Exhibit C to Memorandum)(Martin, Janine) (Entered: 06/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) MOTION for Sanctions by Board of Trustees, Plumbers and Pipefitters Local 553. (Martin, Janine) (Entered: 06/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • (#22) NOTICE of Hearing: Telephonic Status Conference set for 7/29/2019 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Gilbert C. Sison. Instructions for the conference call are as follows: (1) call toll-free, 888-273-3658; (2) when prompted, enter the seven-digit Access Code: 5699758; (3) when prompted, enter the four-digit Security Code: 0381. (dmw2)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED. (Entered: 06/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) SCHEDULING AND DISCOVERY ORDER: Discovery due by 1/17/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 1/31/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gilbert C. Sison on 6/11/2019. (Attachments: #1 Joint Report of Parties)(dmw2) (Entered: 06/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 04/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ORDER granting #9 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Deborah A. Arbogast terminated. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1(g), Sanks, who is now proceeding pro se, should retain new counsel and on or before May 2, 2019 Sanks or new counsel shall file a supplementary appearance that provides an address at which the party and/or the new counsel may receive service of documents related to the Case. The Court DIRECTS Ms. Abrogast to serve Sanks with a copy of this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gilbert C. Sison on 4/10/2019. (klh)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED. (Entered: 04/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Amended MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by John R Sanks. (Arbogast, Deborah) (Entered: 04/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER denying at this time the #7 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. A review of the motion reveals that counsel did not follow Local Rule 83.1(g) in filing the motion. Counsel is free to file another motion to withdraw that comports with Local Rule 83.1(g). Signed by Magistrate Judge Gilbert C. Sison on 4/9/2019. (klh)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED. (Entered: 04/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Plaintiff by John R Sanks. (Arbogast, Deborah) (Entered: 04/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) EXHIBITS by John R Sanks to #1 Complaint. (amv) (Entered: 04/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Summons Issued as to Board of Trustees, Plumbers and Pipefitters Local 553 and returned to attorney for service. (trb) (Entered: 04/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Deborah A. Arbogast on behalf of John R Sanks (Arbogast, Deborah) (Entered: 04/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • (#3) NOTICE OF ACTION In all cases filed in, removed to, or transferred to this court, all attorneys, including government attorneys, shall file a written entry of appearance before addressing the court. Attorney Arbogast does not have a Notice of Appearance on file in this case. (trb)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED. (Entered: 04/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge J. Phil Gilbert and Magistrate Judge Gilbert C. Sison assigned. All future documents must bear case number 19-381-JPG-GCS. If the parties consent to Magistrate Judge assignment, the consent form with instruction is attached for your convenience. (Attachments: #1 Consent Brochure)(trb) (Entered: 04/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Board of Trustees, Plumbers and Pipefitters Local 553 ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0754-3848255.), filed by John R Sanks. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Arbogast, Deborah) (Entered: 04/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less