This case was last updated from PACER on 09/20/2021 at 10:21:06 (UTC).

Sangrik v. Mondelez International, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 07/22/2021 Sangrik filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Mondelez International, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Ohio Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is J. Philip Calabrese. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-01415

  • Filing Date:

    07/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

J. Philip Calabrese

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

James Sangrik

Defendants

Mondelez International, Inc.

Mondelez Global LLC

Giant Eagle Inc.

John Doe

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Gary M. Goldfarb

Attorney at Law Office ofGary M. Goldfarb

2000 Standard Bldg., 1370 Ontario Street

Cleveland, OH 44113

Defendant Attorneys

Maryia Y. Jones

Attorney at JFB Legal

500 East Main Street

Norfolk, VA 23510

Ezio A. Listati

Attorney at Thrasher, Dinsmore & Dolan - Cleveland

1111 Superior Avenue

Cleveland, OH 44114

Leo M. Spellacy, Jr.

Attorney at Thrasher, Dinsmore & Dolan - Cleveland

1111 Superior Avenue

Cleveland, OH 44114

 

Court Documents

#14

(#14) Report of Parties' Planning Meeting - parties do not consent to this case being assigned to the magistrate judge filed by James Sangrik. (Goldfarb, Gary) Modified text on 8/30/2021 (S,SR). (Entered: 08/30/2021)

#13

(#13) Initial Disclosures filed by James Sangrik. (Goldfarb, Gary) (Entered: 08/27/2021)

#12

(#12) Waiver of Service Returned Executed by James Sangrik. Mondelez International, Inc. waiver sent on 8/5/2021, answer due 10/4/2021 filed on behalf of James Sangrik (Goldfarb, Gary) (Entered: 08/23/2021)

11 #1

Exhibit A - Affidavit of Maryia Jones

11 #11

Main Document

#10

(#10) Answer to Complaint with Jury Demand (Related Doc #1 ) filed by Giant Eagle Inc., Mondelez Global LLC, Mondelez International, Inc. (Spellacy, Leo) (Entered: 08/19/2021)

9 #1

Rule 26 Report of Parties

9 #9

Main Document

#5

(#5) Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Mondelez International, Inc.. (Spellacy, Leo) (Entered: 07/22/2021)

#4

(#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Mondelez International Inc. for Mondelez Global LLC filed by Mondelez Global LLC. (Spellacy, Leo) (Entered: 07/22/2021)

#3

(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Giant Eagle Inc. (Spellacy, Leo) Modified filer on 7/22/2021 (S,SR). (Entered: 07/22/2021)

#2

(#2) Magistrate Consent Form issued. (L,Ja) (Entered: 07/22/2021)

1 #4

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #3

Exhibit C - Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal filed in State Court

1 #2

Exhibit B - Docket from State Court dated 7.22.21

1 #1

Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint

1 #1

Main Document

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketIMPORTANT: Notice [non-document]: The Case Management Conference previously scheduled for 9/14/2021 is cancelled. Counsel have advised the case is settled and are directed to file a notice of dismissal no later than October 13, 2021. (Y,A) (Entered: 09/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketIMPORTANT: Notice [non-document] The Case Management Conference previously scheduled for 9/14/2021 at 1:00 p.m. will now be held at 11:00 a.m. in Chambers 16B before Judge J. Philip Calabrese. Change of time only. (Y,A) (Entered: 09/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Report of Parties' Planning Meeting - parties do not consent to this case being assigned to the magistrate judge filed by James Sangrik. (Goldfarb, Gary) Modified text on 8/30/2021 (S,SR). (Entered: 08/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Initial Disclosures filed by James Sangrik. (Goldfarb, Gary) (Entered: 08/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Waiver of Service Returned Executed by James Sangrik. Mondelez International, Inc. waiver sent on 8/5/2021, answer due 10/4/2021 filed on behalf of James Sangrik (Goldfarb, Gary) (Entered: 08/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder [non-document]: granting Defendant's Motion for appearance pro hac vice by attorney Maryia Y. Jones for Giant Eagle Inc.,Maryia Y. Jones for Mondelez Global LLC,Maryia Y. Jones for Mondelez International, Inc.. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for NextGen CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. NextGen CM/ECF registration can be done online at www.pacer.gov. Login with your PACER credentials, go to the Maintenance tab, click Attorney Admissions/E-File Registration, select Ohio Northern District Court and then select Pro Hac Vice. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are already registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register again. (ECF No. #11 ). Judge J. Philip Calabrese on 8/20/2021.(Y,A) (Entered: 08/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Motion for attorney Maryia Y. Jones to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number AOHNDC-10992364, filed by Giant Eagle Inc., Mondelez Global LLC, Mondelez International, Inc.. Related document(s) #10 , #1 . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Maryia Jones)(Spellacy, Leo) (Entered: 08/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Answer to Complaint with Jury Demand (Related Doc #1 ) filed by Giant Eagle Inc., Mondelez Global LLC, Mondelez International, Inc. (Spellacy, Leo) (Entered: 08/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Case Management Conference Scheduling Order with case management conference to be held on 9/14/2021 at 1:00 p.m. in Chambers 16B before Judge J. Philip Calabrese. (Attachments: #1 Rule 26 Report of Parties)(Y,A) (Entered: 07/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder [non-document]: Defendants' motion for an extension to answer, move, or otherwise plead in response to the complaint (ECF No. #7 ) is unopposed and granted. Defendants shall have until August 19, 2021 to respond to the complaint. Judge J. Philip Calabrese on 7/30/2021. (Y,A) (Entered: 07/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 07/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Motion for extension of 21 days until August 19, 2021 to answer Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Giant Eagle Inc., Mondelez Global LLC, Mondelez International, Inc. Related document(s) #1 . (Spellacy, Leo) (Entered: 07/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal in State Court Case No. CV-21-948862 filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal in State Court)Related document(s) #1 .(Spellacy, Leo) (Entered: 07/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Mondelez International, Inc.. (Spellacy, Leo) (Entered: 07/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Mondelez International Inc. for Mondelez Global LLC filed by Mondelez Global LLC. (Spellacy, Leo) (Entered: 07/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Giant Eagle Inc. (Spellacy, Leo) Modified filer on 7/22/2021 (S,SR). (Entered: 07/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • DocketNotice by Clerk that Mondelez International, Inc. and Giant Eagle Inc. failed to file a corporate disclosure statement as required by Local Rule 3.13(b). (L,Ja) (Entered: 07/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Magistrate Consent Form issued. (L,Ja) (Entered: 07/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • DocketRandom Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Jonathan D. Greenberg. (L,Ja) (Entered: 07/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • DocketJudge J. Philip Calabrese assigned to case. (L,Ja) (Entered: 07/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Notice of Removal from Cuyahoga County Court of Common Pleas, case number CV-21-948862 with jury demand, Filing fee paid $ 402, receipt number AOHNDC-10945905.. Filed by Mondelez International, Inc., Giant Eagle Inc., Mondelez Global LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Docket from State Court dated 7.22.21, #3 Exhibit C - Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal filed in State Court, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (Spellacy, Leo) (Entered: 07/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GIANT EAGLE INC is a litigant

Latest cases where MONDELEZ INTERNATIONAL, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Mondelez Global LLC Group Benefits Plan. the is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ezio A Listati