This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/26/2020 at 12:34:45 (UTC).

Sands v. Papaya Holdings, LLC

Case Summary

On 05/27/2020 Sands filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against Papaya Holdings, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is P. Kevin Castel. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-04079

  • Filing Date:

    05/27/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

  • Courthouse:

    New York Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

P. Kevin Castel

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Steve Sands

Defendant

Papaya Holdings, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Richard Liebowitz

Attorney at Liebowitz Law Firm, PLLC

11 Sunrise Plaza, Suite 301, Suite 305

Valleystream, NY 11580

Defendant Attorneys

Mark Alan Lerner

Attorney at Duane Morris LLP

230 Park Avenue, Ste 1130

New York, NY 10169

Alanna B. Newman

Attorney at Duane Morris LLP

230 Park Avenue, Ste 1130

New York, NY 10169

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) ANSWER to #1 Complaint. Document filed by Papaya Holdings, LLC..(Lerner, Mark) (Entered: 07/24/2020)

#9

(#9) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Comcast Corporation, Corporate Parent Fandango Media, LLC, Corporate Parent NBCUniversal Fandango Holdings, LLC, Corporate Parent Flixster, Inc., Corporate Parent Warner Media, LLC, Corporate Parent WB Communications, Inc., Corporate Parent Fandango Holdings LLC, Corporate Parent MTC Acquisition LLC for Papaya Holdings, LLC. Document filed by Papaya Holdings, LLC..(Lerner, Mark) (Entered: 07/24/2020)

#8

(#8) ORDER granting #7 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer; granting #7 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. Application GRANTED. The initial pretrial conference previously scheduled for July 27, 2020 is adjourned to September 14, 2020 at 12:00 pm. SO ORDERED. Papaya Holdings, LLC answer due 7/24/2020( Initial Conference set for 9/14/2020 at 12:00 PM before Judge P. Kevin Castel. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 6/05/2020) (ama) (Entered: 06/05/2020)

#7

(#7) LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #4 Order for Initial Pretrial Conference, #1 Complaint addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Mark Lerner, Esq. dated June 4, 2020., LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Mark Lerner, Esq. dated June 4, 2020. Document filed by Papaya Holdings, LLC..(Lerner, Mark) (Entered: 06/04/2020)

#6

(#6) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Mark Alan Lerner on behalf of Papaya Holdings, LLC..(Lerner, Mark) (Entered: 06/04/2020)

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Alanna B. Newman on behalf of Papaya Holdings, LLC..(Newman, Alanna) (Entered: 06/04/2020)

#4

(#4) ORDER INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 7/27/2020 at 12:30 PM before Judge P. Kevin Castel. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 5/28/2020) (mro) (Entered: 05/29/2020)

#3

(#3) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Papaya Holdings, LLC..(pne) (Entered: 05/28/2020)

#2

(#2) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Papaya Holdings, LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Steve Sands..(Liebowitz, Richard) (Entered: 05/27/2020)

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Papaya Holdings, LLC. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-20007173)Document filed by Steve Sands. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B).(Liebowitz, Richard) (Entered: 05/27/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ANSWER to #1 Complaint. Document filed by Papaya Holdings, LLC..(Lerner, Mark) (Entered: 07/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Comcast Corporation, Corporate Parent Fandango Media, LLC, Corporate Parent NBCUniversal Fandango Holdings, LLC, Corporate Parent Flixster, Inc., Corporate Parent Warner Media, LLC, Corporate Parent WB Communications, Inc., Corporate Parent Fandango Holdings LLC, Corporate Parent MTC Acquisition LLC for Papaya Holdings, LLC. Document filed by Papaya Holdings, LLC..(Lerner, Mark) (Entered: 07/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER granting #7 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer; granting #7 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. Application GRANTED. The initial pretrial conference previously scheduled for July 27, 2020 is adjourned to September 14, 2020 at 12:00 pm. SO ORDERED. Papaya Holdings, LLC answer due 7/24/2020( Initial Conference set for 9/14/2020 at 12:00 PM before Judge P. Kevin Castel. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 6/05/2020) (ama) (Entered: 06/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #4 Order for Initial Pretrial Conference, #1 Complaint addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Mark Lerner, Esq. dated June 4, 2020., LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Mark Lerner, Esq. dated June 4, 2020. Document filed by Papaya Holdings, LLC..(Lerner, Mark) (Entered: 06/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Mark Alan Lerner on behalf of Papaya Holdings, LLC..(Lerner, Mark) (Entered: 06/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Alanna B. Newman on behalf of Papaya Holdings, LLC..(Newman, Alanna) (Entered: 06/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 7/27/2020 at 12:30 PM before Judge P. Kevin Castel. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 5/28/2020) (mro) (Entered: 05/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Papaya Holdings, LLC..(pne) (Entered: 05/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (pne) (Entered: 05/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pne) (Entered: 05/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • DocketCASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge P. Kevin Castel. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pne) (Entered: 05/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO SUBMIT AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT. Notice to Attorney Richard Liebowitz to submit a completed AO 121 Form Copyright to court for review. Use the event type AO 121 Copyright - Notice of Submission by Attorney found under the event list Other Documents. (pne) (Entered: 05/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Richard Liebowitz. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (pne) (Entered: 05/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Papaya Holdings, LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Steve Sands..(Liebowitz, Richard) (Entered: 05/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Papaya Holdings, LLC. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-20007173)Document filed by Steve Sands. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B).(Liebowitz, Richard) (Entered: 05/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Alan B Newman