This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/08/2019 at 08:26:57 (UTC).

Sands v. BH Media Group, Inc.

Case Summary

On 10/09/2019 Sands filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against BH Media Group, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Nebraska District. The Judges overseeing this case are Cheryl R. Zwart and Robert F. Rossiter, Jr.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:19-CV-00442

  • Filing Date:

    10/09/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Cheryl R. Zwart

Presiding Judge

Robert F. Rossiter, Jr.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Steve Sands

Defendant

BH Media Group, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Richard P. Liebowitz

Attorney at LIEBOWITZ LAW FIRM

11 Sunrise Plaza, Suite 305

Valley Stream, NY 11580

Defendant Attorney

Michael C. Cox

Attorney at KOLEY, JESSEN LAW FIRM

1125 South 103Rd Street, Suite 800, One Pacific Place

Omaha, NE 68124

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Exhibit A

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

#9

RESTRICTED

#10

#11

#12

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) PROTECTIVE ORDER - Upon consideration of the parties' joint request for entry of a Protective Order, (Filing No. #10 ), the Court enters the following Protective Order governing the disclosure of confidential Discovery Material by a Producing Party to a Receiving Party in this Action. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (LKO) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) PROGRESSION ORDER - The deposition deadline is May 29, 2020. The trial and pretrial conference will not be set at this time. A status conference to discuss case progression, the parties' interest in settlement, and the trial and pretrial conference settings will be held with the undersigned magistrate judge on May 5, 2020 at 11:00 a.m. by telephone. Counsel shall use the conferencing instructions assigned to this case to participate in the conference. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (LKO) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting - Settlement Likely by Attorney Michael C. Cox on behalf of Defendant BH Media Group, Inc..(Cox, Michael) (Entered: 12/03/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) RESTRICTED CASE CONFERENCE INSTRUCTIONS. ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO THE E-GOVERNMENT ACT AND FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 5.2(a). Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (KLF) (Entered: 11/05/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) SCHEDULING ORDER - Rule 26 Meeting Report Deadline set for 12/5/2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (KLF) (Entered: 11/05/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 identifying Corporate Parent Berkshire Hathaway Credit Corporation, Other Affiliate Berkshire Hathaway, Inc., Other Affiliate Berkshire Hathaway, Inc. for BH Media Group, Inc.. by Attorney Michael C. Cox on behalf of Defendants BH Media Group, Inc., Berkshire Hathaway Credit Corporation, Berkshire Hathaway, Inc., Berkshire Hathaway, Inc..(Cox, Michael) (Entered: 11/04/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint by BH Media Group, Inc. (Cox, Michael) (Entered: 11/04/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) REPORT on the filing of an action regarding Copyright Infringement (original form mailed to the Office of Register of Copyrights with a copy of complaint #1 ). (KMM) (Entered: 10/10/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Summons Issued (COPY) as to defendant BH Media Group, Inc. regarding YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH ARE ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (KMM) (Entered: 10/10/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • (#3) TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Judge Robert F. Rossiter, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (KMM) (Entered: 10/10/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Summons Requested as to BH Media Group, Inc. regarding Complaint, #1 . (Liebowitz, Richard) (Entered: 10/09/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT with jury demand against BH Media Group, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANEDC-4035860), by Attorney Richard P. Liebowitz on behalf of Steve Sands (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Liebowitz, Richard) (Entered: 10/09/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BH Media Group, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael C. Cox