This case was last updated from PACER on 10/30/2021 at 08:47:09 (UTC).

Sandra Edmonds v. Donel Investments L.L.C. et al

Case Summary

On 08/31/2021 Sandra Edmonds filed a Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination lawsuit against Donel Investments L L C. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Stephen V. Wilson and Patricia Donahue. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-07000

  • Filing Date:

    08/31/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Stephen V. Wilson

Referral Judge

Patricia Donahue

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Sandra Edmonds

Defendants

Donel Investments L.L.C.

Does 1-10

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Peter Shahriari

Attorney at Law Office of Hakimi and Shahriari

1800 Vine Street

Los Angeles, CA 90028

Anoush Hakimi

Attorney at Law Office of Hakimi and Shahriari

1800 Vine Street

Los Angeles, CA 90028

Kyle W Wilson

Attorney at Law Office of Hakimi and Shahriari

1800 Vine Street

Los Angeles, CA 90028

Laura Anne Steven

Attorney at Law Office of Hakimi and Shahriari

1800 Vine Street

Los Angeles, CA 90028

Defendant Attorney

Benjamin Donel

Attorney at Law Offices of Benjamin Donel Inc

6003 Compton Avenue

Los Angeles, CA 90001

 

Court Documents

#1

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

#9

(#9) NEW CASE ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (pc) (Entered: 09/01/2021)

#10

(#10) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS TO FILE JOINT REPORT by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. It is the policy of this Court to encourage expedient resolution of civil litigation. Cf. Fed. R. Civ. P. 1 (noting that rules of civil procedure should be construed to "secure the just, speedy, and inexpensive determination of every action and proceeding"). In accordance with that policy, the Court reminds the parties that "a defendant's voluntary removal of alleged barriers prior to trial can have the effect of mooting a plaintiff's ADA claim." Oliver v. Ralphs Grocery Co., 654 F.3d 903, 905 (9th Cir. 2011). (See document for details). In light of the foregoing, the parties are ORDERED to issue a joint status report at least 7 days prior to the initial status conference. (mrgo) (Entered: 09/01/2021)

#11

(#11) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Sandra Edmonds, upon Defendant Donel Investments L.L.C. served on 10/5/2021, answer due 10/26/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon LIDA KOHANSAMEH - Agent Authorized to Accept Service in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Hakimi, Anoush) (Entered: 10/20/2021)

#12

(#12) ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Donel Investments L.L.C..(Attorney Benjamin Donel added to party Donel Investments L.L.C.(pty:dft))(Donel, Benjamin) (Entered: 10/26/2021)

#13

(#13) ORDER SETTING INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE for 11/29/2021 at 3:00 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (pc) (Entered: 10/27/2021)

#14

(#14) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Answer to Complaint #12 . The following error(s) was/were found: Caption of document is incomplete/incorrect. Local Rule 7.1-1 No Notice of Interested Parties and/or no copies. Other error(s) with document(s): Incorrect court caption. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (mrgo) (Entered: 10/27/2021)

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Answer to Complaint #12 . The following error(s) was/were found: Caption of document is incomplete/incorrect. Local Rule 7.1-1 No Notice of Interested Parties and/or no copies. Other error(s) with document(s): Incorrect court caption. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (mrgo) (Entered: 10/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ORDER SETTING INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE for 11/29/2021 at 3:00 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (pc) (Entered: 10/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Donel Investments L.L.C..(Attorney Benjamin Donel added to party Donel Investments L.L.C.(pty:dft))(Donel, Benjamin) (Entered: 10/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Sandra Edmonds, upon Defendant Donel Investments L.L.C. served on 10/5/2021, answer due 10/26/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon LIDA KOHANSAMEH - Agent Authorized to Accept Service in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Hakimi, Anoush) (Entered: 10/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS TO FILE JOINT REPORT by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. It is the policy of this Court to encourage expedient resolution of civil litigation. Cf. Fed. R. Civ. P. 1 (noting that rules of civil procedure should be construed to "secure the just, speedy, and inexpensive determination of every action and proceeding"). In accordance with that policy, the Court reminds the parties that "a defendant's voluntary removal of alleged barriers prior to trial can have the effect of mooting a plaintiff's ADA claim." Oliver v. Ralphs Grocery Co., 654 F.3d 903, 905 (9th Cir. 2011). (See document for details). In light of the foregoing, the parties are ORDERED to issue a joint status report at least 7 days prior to the initial status conference. (mrgo) (Entered: 09/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NEW CASE ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (pc) (Entered: 09/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Donel Investments L.L.C. (lh) (Entered: 08/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (lh) (Entered: 08/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh) (Entered: 08/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Stephen V. Wilson and Magistrate Judge Patricia Donahue. (lh) (Entered: 08/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by plaintiff Sandra Edmonds, (Shahriari, Peter) (Entered: 08/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Sandra Edmonds. (Shahriari, Peter) (Entered: 08/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Sandra Edmonds. (Shahriari, Peter) (Entered: 08/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-31899930 - Fee: $402, filed by plaintiff Sandra Edmonds. (Attorney Peter Shahriari added to party Sandra Edmonds(pty:pla))(Shahriari, Peter) (Entered: 08/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DONEL INVESTMENTS LLC is a litigant