This case was last updated from PACER on 07/05/2019 at 10:05:52 (UTC).

Sandra Alne et al v. Alcoa, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 04/25/2019 Sandra Alne filed a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability lawsuit against Alcoa, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are John A. Kronstadt, Rozella A. Oliver, Jacqueline Chooljian and Cormac J. Carney. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-03346

  • Filing Date:

    04/25/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

John A. Kronstadt

Cormac J. Carney

Referral Judges

Rozella A. Oliver

Jacqueline Chooljian

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Sandra Alne

John Alne

Defendants

Does 1-500 Inclusive

Alcoa, Inc.

Imerys Talc America, Inc.

Colgate-Palmolive Company

Johnson and Johnson

Reynolds Metals Company

Cyprus Amax Minerals Co.

Pfizer, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Lina Chagoya

Attorney at Gori Julian and Associates PC

3848 W. Carson Street Suite 103

Torrance, CA 90503

Dimitri Nivet Nichols

Attorney at Gori Julian and Associates PC

3848 W Carson Street Suite 103

Torrance, CA 90503

Defendant Attorneys

Alexander G Calfo

Attorney at King and Spalding LLP

633 West 5Th Street Suite 1700

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Susan Victoria Vargas

Attorney at King and Spalding LLP

633 West Fifth Street Suite 1700

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Julia Elizabeth Romano

Attorney at King and Spalding LLP

633 West Fifth Street Suite 1600

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Stacy Lynn Foster

Attorney at King and Spalding LLP

633 West 5Th Street Suite 1700

Los Angeles, CA 90071

 

Court Documents

#15

(#15) TRANSMITTAL of documents to Los Angeles Superior Court, County of Los Angeles. A certified copy of the order of remand and a copy of the docket sheet from this court was sent to Los Angeles Superior Court, County of Los Angeles. (yl) (Entered: 05/23/2019)

#14

(#14) ORDER by Judge Cormac J. Carney. The OSC Talc Actions are hereby REMANDED to state court. Any motions or ex parte applications to remand that are pending in the OSC Talc Actions are DENIED AS MOOT, and the hearings vacated. Case Terminated. Made JS-6 (rrey) (Entered: 05/21/2019)

#13

(#13) JOINDER filed by Plaintiffs John Alne, Sandra Alne (Cucu, Rebecca) (Entered: 05/21/2019)

12 #22

Exhibit M

12 #21

Exhibit L

12 #20

Exhibit K Part 2

12 #19

Exhibit K Part 1

12 #18

Exhibit J

12 #17

Exhibit I Part 5

12 #16

Exhibit I Part 4

12 #7

Exhibit F

12 #6

Exhibit E

12 #5

Exhibit D

12 #4

Exhibit C

12 #3

Exhibit B

12 #2

Exhibit A

12 #1

Declaration of Julia E. Romano

#12

(#12) RESPONSE filed by Defendant Johnson and Johnsonto Order to Show Cause,, #10 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Julia E. Romano, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H Part 1, #10 Exhibit H Part 2, #11 Exhibit H Part 3, #12 Exhibit H Part 4, #13 Exhibit I Part 1, #14 Exhibit I Part 2, #15 Exhibit I Part 3, #16 Exhibit I Part 4, #17 Exhibit I Part 5, #18 Exhibit J, #19 Exhibit K Part 1, #20 Exhibit K Part 2, #21 Exhibit L, #22 Exhibit M)(Romano, Julia) (Entered: 05/13/2019)

36 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) TRANSMITTAL of documents to Los Angeles Superior Court, County of Los Angeles. A certified copy of the order of remand and a copy of the docket sheet from this court was sent to Los Angeles Superior Court, County of Los Angeles. (yl) (Entered: 05/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) ORDER by Judge Cormac J. Carney. The OSC Talc Actions are hereby REMANDED to state court. Any motions or ex parte applications to remand that are pending in the OSC Talc Actions are DENIED AS MOOT, and the hearings vacated. Case Terminated. Made JS-6 (rrey) (Entered: 05/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) JOINDER filed by Plaintiffs John Alne, Sandra Alne (Cucu, Rebecca) (Entered: 05/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) RESPONSE filed by Defendant Johnson and Johnsonto Order to Show Cause,, #10 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Julia E. Romano, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H Part 1, #10 Exhibit H Part 2, #11 Exhibit H Part 3, #12 Exhibit H Part 4, #13 Exhibit I Part 1, #14 Exhibit I Part 2, #15 Exhibit I Part 3, #16 Exhibit I Part 4, #17 Exhibit I Part 5, #18 Exhibit J, #19 Exhibit K Part 1, #20 Exhibit K Part 2, #21 Exhibit L, #22 Exhibit M)(Romano, Julia) (Entered: 05/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 9027(e)(3) filed by Plaintiff Sandra Alne (Cucu, Rebecca) (Entered: 05/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY REMAINING CENTRAL DISTRICT TALC ACTIONS SHOULD NOT BE REMANDED by Judge Cormac J. Carney. The Court hereby ORDERS Johnson & Johnson to show cause why the remaining Central District Talc Actions should not be remanded. Johnson & Johnson shall respond in writing by Monday, May 13, 2019. The plaintiffs in these actions shall file a response, if any, by the following Monday, May 20, 2019. The Court will then take the matter under submission and issue a ruling no later than Monday, June 3, 2019. (rrey) (Entered: 05/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Movant Johnson and Johnson, re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , Corporate Disclosure Statement #3 , Notice (Other) #5 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #4 served on April 26, 2019. (Calfo, Alexander) (Entered: 05/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 19-03-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 2:19-cv-03036 CJC (JCx). Case transferred from Judge John A. Kronstadt and Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver to Judge Cormac J. Carney and Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:19-cv-03346 CJC (JCx). Signed by Judge Cormac J. Carney. (mrgo) (Entered: 05/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car) (Entered: 04/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John A. Kronstadt and Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. (car) (Entered: 04/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), filed by Defendant Johnson and Johnson. Filed in State Court on 3/20/2017 Submitted with Attachment 2 to Notice of Removal #1 (car) (Entered: 04/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Alcoa, Inc., Colgate-Palmolive Company, Cyprus Amax Minerals Co., Does 1-500 Inclusive, Imerys Talc America, Inc., Johnson and Johnson, Pfizer, Inc., Reynolds Metals Company Jury Demanded., filed by plaintiffs John Alne, Sandra Alne. Filed in State Court on 2/8/2017 Submitted with Attachment 1 to Notice of Removal #1 (car) (Entered: 04/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE Of Pendency Of Other Actions Or Proceedings [L.R. 83-1.4] And Requests For Stay of Proceedings filed by Movant Johnson & Johnson. (Calfo, Alexander) (Entered: 04/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Movant Johnson & Johnson, (Calfo, Alexander) (Entered: 04/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Movant Johnson & Johnson (Calfo, Alexander) (Entered: 04/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Movant Johnson & Johnson. (Calfo, Alexander) (Entered: 04/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Court, case number BC659850 Receipt No: 0973-23619459 - Fee: $400, filed by Movant Johnson & Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C Part 1, #4 Exhibit C Part 2, #5 Exhibit C Part 3, #6 Exhibit C Part 4, #7 Exhibit C Part 5, #8 Exhibit C Part 6, #9 Exhibit D) (Attorney Alexander G Calfo added to party Johnson & Johnson(pty:bkmov))(Calfo, Alexander) (Entered: 04/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where REYNOLDS METALS CO. is a litigant

Latest cases where ALCOA INC is a litigant

Latest cases where COLGATE-PALMOLIVE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where CYPRUS AMAX MINERALS COMPANY is a litigant