This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/04/2019 at 07:07:20 (UTC).

Sandoz Inc. et al v. United Therapeutics Corporation et al

Case Summary

On 09/05/2019 Sandoz Inc filed an Other - Antitrust lawsuit against United Therapeutics Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Robert W. Gettleman. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-05953

  • Filing Date:

    09/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Antitrust

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Robert W. Gettleman

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Sandoz Inc.

RareGen, LLC

Petitioner

Mohan P. Rao

Defendants

United Therapeutics Corporation

Smiths Medical ASD, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Terance A Gonsalves

Attorney at Alston & Bird LLP

1201 West Peachtree Street Ne, Suite 4900

Atlanta, GA 30309

Jonathan David Parente

Attorney at Alston & Bird LLP

1201 West Peachtree Street

Atlanta, GA 30309

Brendan J. Healey

Attorney at Baron Jarris Healey

225 W. Washington St., Suite 2200

Chicago, IL 60606

Steven L Baron

Attorney at Baron Harris Healey

225 W. Washington Street, Suite 2200

Chicago, IL 60606

Defendant Attorneys

Adrienne Elizabeth Van Winkle

Attorney at Williams & Connolly LLP

725 12Th St Nw

Washington, DC 20005

William Jay Dorsey

Attorney at Blank Rome

444 W. Lake Street, Suite 1650

Chicago, IL 60606

Paige B Tinkham

Attorney at Blank Rome LLP

444 West Lake Street, Suite 1650

Chicago, IL 60606

 

Court Documents

#20

#19

#18

#17

#16

#15

RESTRICTED

#14

#13

#12

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #3

Declaration Rao Declaration

1 #2

Declaration Parente Declaration

1 #1

Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Quash

#1

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Pursuant to the Joint Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal #19 and pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a), Mohan P. Rao, Ph.D.'s Motion to quash #1 is withdrawn and this action is voluntarily dismissed. Status hearing set for 10/1/2019 is stricken. Mailed notice (cn). (Entered: 09/25/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) STIPULATION of Dismissal Joint Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal (Baron, Steven) (Entered: 09/24/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: At the parties' request and by agreement, hearing on Non-party Mohan P. Rao's motion to quash #1 set for 9/24/2019 is stricken and reset to 10/1/2019 at 9:00 a.m. Mailed notice (cn). (Entered: 09/23/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) REQUEST for Clerk of Court to refund filing fee in the amount of 300,, regarding order on motion to appear pro hac vice,, terminate motions #12 Sandoz v. United Therapeutics (Van Winkle, Adrienne) (Entered: 09/16/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: At the parties' request and by agreement, hearing on Non-party Mohan P. Rao's motion to quash #1 set for 9/17/2019 is stricken and reset to 9/24/2019 at 9:00 a.m. Mailed notice (cn). (Entered: 09/16/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on September 11, 2019 before the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman. Order Number: 36037. Court Reporter Contact Information: Nancy L. Bistany - nancy_bistany@ilnd.uscourts.gov - 312.435.7626. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 10/3/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/15/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/11/2019. (Bistany, Nancy) (Entered: 09/12/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) STATUS Report Regarding Telephonic Hearing Before Magistrate Judge Goodman by United Therapeutics Corporation (Van Winkle, Adrienne) (Entered: 09/11/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Motion hearing held on 9/11/2019. Non-party Mohan P. Rao's motion to quash #1 is entered and continued to 9/17/2019 at 9:30 a.m. United Therapeutics Corp.'s oral motion for fees and costs is denied. Mailed notice (cn). (Entered: 09/11/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Attorneys Jonathan Parente #11 and Adrienne Van Winkle's #7 motions for leave to appear pro hac vice are granted. Mailed notice (cn). (Entered: 09/11/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-16223880. (Gonsalves, Terance) (Entered: 09/10/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 09/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MEMORANDUM by United Therapeutics Corporation in Opposition to motion to quash, #1 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of T. Adams-Sherman, #2 Exhibit Joint Pretrial Stipulation, #3 Exhibit Judicial Action Form)(Van Winkle, Adrienne) (Entered: 09/10/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-16220221. (Van Winkle, Adrienne) (Entered: 09/10/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant United Therapeutics Corporation by William Jay Dorsey (Dorsey, William) (Entered: 09/10/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Motion by Terance A Gonsalves for presentment of Motion to quash #1 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 9/11/2019 at 09:15 AM. (Gonsalves, Terance) Docket Text Modified by Clerk's Office on 9/9/2019 (ph, ). (Entered: 09/06/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Movant Mohan P. Rao by Brendan J. Healey (Healey, Brendan) (Entered: 09/06/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • Docket***Civil Case Terminated. (ph, ) (Entered: 09/09/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Movant Mohan P. Rao by Terance A Gonsalves (Gonsalves, Terance) (Entered: 09/05/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert. Case assignment: Random assignment. (td, ) (Entered: 09/05/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Gonsalves, Terance) (Entered: 09/05/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) MISCELLANEOUS CASE by Mohan P. Rao Non-Party Mohan P. Rao's Motion to Quash Filing fee $ 47, receipt number 0752-16208095. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Quash, #2 Declaration Parente Declaration, #3 Declaration Rao Declaration)(Gonsalves, Terance) Docket Text Modified by Clerk's Office on 9/9/2019 (ph, ). (Entered: 09/05/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where United Therapeutics Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where Smiths Medical ASD is a litigant

Latest cases where Sandoz Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jonathan David Parente