This case was last updated from PACER on 05/05/2020 at 08:23:06 (UTC).

In Re: Application of Sandoz Canada Inc., for an Order to Take Discovery for Use in Foreign Proceedings

Case Summary

On 03/06/2020 In Re Application of Sandoz Canada Inc , for an Order to Take Discovery for Use in Foreign Proceedings was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Maryland District. The Judges overseeing this case are Gina L Simms and Theodore D. Chuang. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:20-CV-00618

  • Filing Date:

    03/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Maryland District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Gina L Simms

Presiding Judge

Theodore D. Chuang

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Sandoz Canada Inc.

Respondent

Michelle Freemer

In Re

Application of Sandoz Canada Inc., for an Order to Take Discovery for Use in Foreign Proceedings

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and In Re Attorney

Michael R Sklaire

Attorney at Greenberg Traurig LLP

1750 Tysons Blvd Ste 1000

Mclean, VA 22102

 

Court Documents

#3

(#3) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Gina L Simms for Discovery. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 3/17/2020. (cags, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 03/17/2020)

#2

(#2) CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 3/16/2020. (dg3s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 03/16/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/16/2020
  • Docket(#4) PAPERLESS ORDER directing counsel for Sandoz to file a three page single-spaced letter with case law to support why its petition (ECF No. 1) was filed ex parte. Counsel shall file its letter by May 15, 2020, provided that Petitioner can do so safely, i.e., without violating the current state and federal government orders/directives in effect regarding the COVID-19 pandemic. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gina L Simms on 4/16/2020. (tds, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 04/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Gina L Simms for Discovery. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 3/17/2020. (cags, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 03/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 3/16/2020. (dg3s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 03/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • DocketFiling fee: $ 47.00, receipt number 84637036086 (dg3s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 03/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Theodore D. Chuang. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 03/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less