This case was last updated from PACER on 05/02/2021 at 08:52:32 (UTC).

Sandoval v. Covidien, LP et al

Case Summary

On 03/03/2021 Sandoval filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against Covidien, LP. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Xavier Rodriguez. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:21-CV-00207

  • Filing Date:

    03/03/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Xavier Rodriguez

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Selena Sandoval

Defendants

Covidien, LP

Medtronic, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

R. John Prudhomme

Attorney at Cagle Law Firm, P.C.

5300 Bee Cave Road, Bldg I, Suite 240

Austin, TX 78746

Defendant Attorneys

David McDonald Prichard

Attorney at Prichard Young, L.L.P.

10101 Reunion Place, Suite 600

San Antonio, TX 78216

Mark David Wolfe

Attorney at Prichard Young, LLP

10101 Reunion Place, Suite 600

San Antonio, TX 78216

Bryan T. Pratt

Attorney at Shook Hardy & Bacon LLP

2555 Grand Boulevard

Kansas City, MO 64108

Norma N. Bennett

Attorney at Shook Hardy and Bacon LLP

600 Travis Street Suite 3400

Houston, TX 77002

 

Court Documents

#18

(#18) ADVISORY TO THE COURT by Covidien, LP, Medtronic, Inc. . (Wolfe, Mark) (Entered: 04/09/2021)

#17

RESTRICTED

16 #2

Proposed Order

16 #1

Exhibit A

#16

(#16) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Norma N. Bennett on behalf of Bryan T. Pratt ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-14635497) by on behalf of Covidien, LP, Medtronic, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order)(Bennett, Norma) (Entered: 03/26/2021)

#15

(#15) ORDER GRANTING re #13 Unopposed MOTION to Continue Status Conference filed by Selena Sandoval, ( Status Conference Re-set for 3/31/2021 03:00 PM before Judge Xavier Rodriguez,). Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (wg) (Entered: 03/23/2021)

#14

(#14) Rule 26(f) Discovery Report/Case Management Plan by Covidien, LP, Medtronic, Inc.. (Wolfe, Mark) (Entered: 03/23/2021)

13 #1

Proposed Order

#13

(#13) Unopposed MOTION to Continue Status Conference by Selena Sandoval. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Prudhomme, R.) (Entered: 03/22/2021)

#12

(#12) ADVISORY TO THE COURT by Covidien, LP, Medtronic, Inc. . (Wolfe, Mark) (Entered: 03/15/2021)

#11

(#11) ORDER and ADVISORY, Plaintiff(s) confer with the Defendant(s) as required by Fed. R. Civ. P 26(f) to submit a Rule 26(f) Report in the format shown in the attached documents for the Courts consideration by March 23, 2021., Notice of right to consent to disposition of a civil case by a U.S. Magistrate Judge within (30) days of the filing of this Order. Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (wg) (Entered: 03/11/2021)

#10

(#10) AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER, ( ADR Report Deadline due by 5/19/2022,, Amended Pleadings due by 5/4/2021,, Discovery due by 2/3/2022,, Joinder of Parties due by 5/4/2021,, Dispositive Motions due by 4/21/2022,, Jury Selection set for 9/12/2022 10:30AM before Judge Xavier Rodriguez,, Jury Trial set for 9/12/2022 10:30 AM before Judge Xavier Rodriguez,, Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/1/2022 10:30 AM before Judge Xavier Rodriguez,). Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (wg) (Entered: 03/11/2021)

9 #1

Proposed Order

#9

(#9) MOTION to Strike Documents Due to Erroneous Filing by Covidien, LP, Medtronic, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Prichard, David) (Entered: 03/08/2021)

#8

(#8) ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE AND HEARING ON ALL PENDING MOTIONS ( Status Conference set for 3/24/2021 10:30 AM before Judge Xavier Rodriguez,). Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (mgr) (Entered: 03/08/2021)

#7

(#7) SCHEDULING ORDER: Pretrial Conference set for 7/21/2022 10:30 AM before Judge Xavier Rodriguez, Jury Selection and Trial reset for 8/1/2022 10:30AM before Judge Xavier Rodriguez, ADR Report Deadline due by 5/19/2022, Amended Pleadings due by 5/4/2021, Discovery due by 2/3/2022, Motions due by 4/21/2022,. Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (mgr) (Entered: 03/08/2021)

#6

(#6) STANDING ORDER CONCERNING REMOVED CASES. Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (mgr) (Entered: 03/08/2021)

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Covidien, LP, Medtronic, Inc. (Filing fee $402 receipt number 0542-14550707), filed by Covidien, LP, Medtronic, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8)(Prichard, David) (Entered: 03/03/2021)

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) ADVISORY TO THE COURT by Covidien, LP, Medtronic, Inc. . (Wolfe, Mark) (Entered: 04/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Xavier Rodriguez: Status Conference held on 3/31/2021 (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.). (Court Reporter Gigi Simcox.)(wg) (Entered: 04/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketText Order GRANTING #16 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted leave to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Entered by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (dc3) (Entered: 03/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Norma N. Bennett on behalf of Bryan T. Pratt ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-14635497) by on behalf of Covidien, LP, Medtronic, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order)(Bennett, Norma) (Entered: 03/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ORDER GRANTING re #13 Unopposed MOTION to Continue Status Conference filed by Selena Sandoval, ( Status Conference Re-set for 3/31/2021 03:00 PM before Judge Xavier Rodriguez,). Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (wg) (Entered: 03/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Rule 26(f) Discovery Report/Case Management Plan by Covidien, LP, Medtronic, Inc.. (Wolfe, Mark) (Entered: 03/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Unopposed MOTION to Continue Status Conference by Selena Sandoval. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Prudhomme, R.) (Entered: 03/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketText Order GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART #9 Motion to Strike entered by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. Document Nos. 2, 3, 4, and 5 are stricken. The parties shall abide by the Amended Scheduling Order (dkt no. 10) and Order and Advisory (dkt. no. 11). The Order Setting Status Conference (dkt. no. 8) will remain in effect. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (dc3) (Entered: 03/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ADVISORY TO THE COURT by Covidien, LP, Medtronic, Inc. . (Wolfe, Mark) (Entered: 03/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER and ADVISORY, Plaintiff(s) confer with the Defendant(s) as required by Fed. R. Civ. P 26(f) to submit a Rule 26(f) Report in the format shown in the attached documents for the Courts consideration by March 23, 2021., Notice of right to consent to disposition of a civil case by a U.S. Magistrate Judge within (30) days of the filing of this Order. Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (wg) (Entered: 03/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER, ( ADR Report Deadline due by 5/19/2022,, Amended Pleadings due by 5/4/2021,, Discovery due by 2/3/2022,, Joinder of Parties due by 5/4/2021,, Dispositive Motions due by 4/21/2022,, Jury Selection set for 9/12/2022 10:30AM before Judge Xavier Rodriguez,, Jury Trial set for 9/12/2022 10:30 AM before Judge Xavier Rodriguez,, Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/1/2022 10:30 AM before Judge Xavier Rodriguez,). Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (wg) (Entered: 03/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION to Strike Documents Due to Erroneous Filing by Covidien, LP, Medtronic, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Prichard, David) (Entered: 03/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE AND HEARING ON ALL PENDING MOTIONS ( Status Conference set for 3/24/2021 10:30 AM before Judge Xavier Rodriguez,). Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (mgr) (Entered: 03/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SCHEDULING ORDER: Pretrial Conference set for 7/21/2022 10:30 AM before Judge Xavier Rodriguez, Jury Selection and Trial reset for 8/1/2022 10:30AM before Judge Xavier Rodriguez, ADR Report Deadline due by 5/19/2022, Amended Pleadings due by 5/4/2021, Discovery due by 2/3/2022, Motions due by 4/21/2022,. Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (mgr) (Entered: 03/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) STANDING ORDER CONCERNING REMOVED CASES. Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (mgr) (Entered: 03/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketIf ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Farrer (wg) (Entered: 03/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketCase directly assigned to Judge Xavier Rodriguez related case SA21CV108-XR. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (wg) (Entered: 03/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Covidien, LP, Medtronic, Inc. (Filing fee $402 receipt number 0542-14550707), filed by Covidien, LP, Medtronic, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8)(Prichard, David) (Entered: 03/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where COVIDIEN LP is a litigant

Latest cases where Medtronic, Inc. is a litigant