This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/06/2022 at 06:06:42 (UTC).

Sandoval v. Caterpillar, Inc.

Case Summary

On 09/29/2021 Sandoval filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Caterpillar, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Anne Y. Shields and Joan M. Azrack. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-05403

  • Filing Date:

    09/29/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Anne Y. Shields

Presiding Judge

Joan M. Azrack

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Sonia Sandoval

3Rd Party Plaintiffs and Defendants

Caterpillar, Inc.

TD SUPPLIES, INC.

Defendant and 3Rd Party Defendant

TD SUPPLIES, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Sandra Maria Radna

Attorney at Law Offices of Sandra M. Radna, P.C.

200 Broadhollow Road, Suite 314

Melville, NY 11747

3Rd Party Plaintiff and Defendant Attorney

Timothy Robert Ross Freeman

Attorney at Tanenbaum Keale LLP

Three Gateway Center, Suite 1301

Newark, NJ 07102

 

Court Documents

#14

(#14) ORDER DISMISSING CASE re #13 Joint Stipulation of Dismissal with prejudice pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, with each party to bear its own costs and fees. Case closed. So Ordered by Judge Joan M. Azrack on 3/30/2022. (Coleman, Laurie) (Entered: 03/30/2022)

#13

(#13) STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Sonia Sandoval (Radna, Sandra) (Entered: 03/29/2022)

#12

(#12) Letter MOTION for pre motion conference Adjournment Request by Caterpillar, Inc.. (Freeman, Timothy) (Entered: 03/08/2022)

#11

(#11) NOTICE of Appearance by Sandra Maria Radna on behalf of All Plaintiffs (notification declined or already on case) (Radna, Sandra) (Entered: 03/03/2022)

#10

(#10) Letter MOTION to Adjourn Conference by Caterpillar, Inc.. (Freeman, Timothy) (Entered: 01/14/2022)

9 #2

Certificate of Service

9 #1

Exhibit

9 #9

Main Document

8 #2

Joint Letter Requirements

8 #1

AYS Rules

8 #8

Main Document

#7

(#7) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Caterpillar, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Caterpillar Inc. for Caterpillar, Inc.. (Freeman, Timothy) (Entered: 12/27/2021)

6 #1

Certificate of Service

6 #6

Main Document

#5

(#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Sonia Sandoval. Caterpillar, Inc. waiver sent on 10/29/2021, answer due 12/28/2021. (Radna, Sandra) (Entered: 12/07/2021)

1 #2

Proposed Summons proposed summons

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet signed civil cover sheet

1 #1

Main Document

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ORDER DISMISSING CASE re #13 Joint Stipulation of Dismissal with prejudice pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, with each party to bear its own costs and fees. Case closed. So Ordered by Judge Joan M. Azrack on 3/30/2022. (Coleman, Laurie) (Entered: 03/30/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Sonia Sandoval (Radna, Sandra) (Entered: 03/29/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketYour proposed summons attached to #9 Third Party Complaint was not issued for one of the following reasons: Did not use the correct Summons form AO 441 Rev 7/10, SUMMONS ON A THIRD-PARTY COMPLAINT. Please correct and resubmit using Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet. (Coleman, Laurie) (Entered: 03/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER granting #12 Motion for Pre Motion Conference. Upon counsels' request the telephonic initial conference scheduled for March 28, 2022 is ADJOURNED to May 24, 2022 at 10:30 AM. Counsel are directed to call the AT&T Teleconference Center at (877) 810-9415 at the time of the conference and enter Access Code 9005911 when prompted. Counsel are reminded that the joint initial letter and joint proposed discovery plan are to be filed on ECF by May 20, 2022. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Anne Y. Shields on 3/9/2022. (Mucciaccio, Dina) (Entered: 03/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Letter MOTION for pre motion conference Adjournment Request by Caterpillar, Inc.. (Freeman, Timothy) (Entered: 03/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE of Appearance by Sandra Maria Radna on behalf of All Plaintiffs (notification declined or already on case) (Radna, Sandra) (Entered: 03/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER granting #10 Motion to Adjourn Conference. Upon counsels' request the telephonic initial conference scheduled for February 7, 2022 is ADJOURNED to March 28, 2022 at 11:30 AM. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Anne Y. Shields on 1/18/2022. (Mucciaccio, Dina) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Letter MOTION to Adjourn Conference by Caterpillar, Inc.. (Freeman, Timothy) (Entered: 01/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against TD SUPPLIES, INC., filed by Caterpillar, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Certificate of Service) (Freeman, Timothy) (Entered: 01/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER: Initial Conference set for 2/7/2022 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Anne Y. Shields.The parties are directed to call the ATTteleconferencing center at (877) 810-9415 and to enter Access Code9005911 when prompted. See order and attachments. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Anne Y. Shields on 12/28/2021. (Attachments: #1 AYS Rules, #2 Joint Letter Requirements) (Torres, Jasmine) (Entered: 12/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Caterpillar, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Caterpillar Inc. for Caterpillar, Inc.. (Freeman, Timothy) (Entered: 12/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Caterpillar, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Freeman, Timothy) (Entered: 12/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Sonia Sandoval. Caterpillar, Inc. waiver sent on 10/29/2021, answer due 12/28/2021. (Radna, Sandra) (Entered: 12/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to Caterpillar, Inc.. (Landow, Concetta) (Entered: 10/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Landow, Concetta) (Entered: 10/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Joan M. Azrack and Magistrate Judge Anne Y. Shields. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Landow, Concetta) (Entered: 10/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Landow, Concetta) (Entered: 10/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Sonia Sandoval, as Administratrix of Estate of Osvaldo Flores Olguin, deceased, and Sonia Sandoval, Individually, against Caterpillar, Inc. filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-14883928 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -NO,, filed by Sonia Sandoval. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet , #2 Proposed Summons ) (Radna, Sandra) Modified on 10/4/2021 (Landow, Concetta). (Entered: 09/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Caterpillar, Inc. is a litigant