This case was last updated from PACER on 02/04/2020 at 07:33:04 (UTC).

Sandoval Quintana v. Quintana Dolores

Case Summary

On 12/06/2019 Sandoval Quintana filed an Other - Arbitration lawsuit against Quintana Dolores. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Nevada District. The Judges overseeing this case are Miranda M. Du and William G. Cobb. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-00730

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Arbitration

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Nevada District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Miranda M. Du

Referral Judge

William G. Cobb

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Cesar Omar Sandoval Quintana

Respondent

Jocelyn Mercedes Quintana Dolores

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Shann D. Winesett

Attorney at Pecos Law Group

8925 S. Pecos Road, Ste. 14

Henderson, NV 89074

 

Court Documents

#14

(#14) RESPONSE to #13 Order to Show Cause by Petitioner Cesar Omar Sandoval Quintana. (Winesett, Shann) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

#13

(#13) ORDERED that Petitioner show cause in writing by Monday, December 23, 2019 as to why this Court has jurisdiction over this case, including by proffering supplemental evidence that A.O.S.Q. was located within the unofficial northern division of this District (see LR IA 1-6) as that term is used in 22 U.S.C. 9003(b) at the time this case was filed. It is further ordered that the orders directing the United States Marshals Service to attempt to locate A.O.S.Q. in California (ECF Nos. #11 , #12 ) are vacated. The Clerk of Court is directed to strike them from the record. It is further ordered that the hearings previously set for December 19, 2019, and December 27, 2019 (ECF Nos. #8 , #9 ) are vacated. Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 12/16/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM) (Entered: 12/16/2019)

#12

(#12) STRICKEN pursuant to ECF No. #13 ORDER : AMENDED ORDER (re ECF No. #11 ) - The United States Marshals Service will make reasonable efforts to serve Respondent with a copy of the Order anywhere in California as soon as practicable, along with a copy of the other pleadings filed by Petitioner in this case (ECF Nos. #1 , #5 ), in an attempt to ensure Respondents appearance at the upcoming hearings in Reno, Nevada. To execute this order, the United States Marshals Service may enlist the assistance of other law enforcement authorities, including the local police and any United States Marshals Service offices in California. It is further ordered that the United States Marshals Service will attempt to locate and take physical custody of the 9-year old A.O.S.Q. in California solely for the purpose of transferring A.O.S.Q. to Petitioner's temporary physical custody. A.O.S.Q. will then remain in Petitioners temporary custody pending the outcome of the PI Hearing, and at least until the PI Hearing. It is further ordered that the Order remains in full force and effect at this time. Respondent is advised to review and comply with the Order. Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 12/13/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM) Modified on 12/16/2019 to denote STRICKEN (DRM). (Entered: 12/13/2019)

#11

(#11) STRICKEN pursuant to ECF No. #13 ORDER : ORDERED that the United States Marshals Service will make reasonable efforts to serve Respondent with a copy of the Order anywhere in the greater Sacramento, California metropolitan area as soon as practicable, along with a copy of the other pleadings filed by Petitioner in this case (ECF Nos. #1 , #5 ), in an attempt to ensure Respondent's appearance at the upcoming hearings in Reno. To execute this order, the United States Marshals Service may enlist the assistance of other law enforcement authorities, including the local police and the United States Marshals Service Office in Sacramento. It is further ordered that the United States Marshals Service will attempt to locate and take physical custody of the 9-year old A.O.S.Q. in the greater Sacramento, California metropolitan area solely for the purpose of transferring A.O.S.Q. to Petitioner's temporary physical custody. A.O.S.Q. will then remain in Petitioner's temporary custody pending the outcome of the PI Hearing, and at least until the PI Hearing. It is further ordered that the Order remains in full force and effect at this time. Respondent is advised to review and comply with the Order. Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 12/13/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM) Modified on 12/16/2019 to denote STRICKEN (DRM). (Entered: 12/13/2019)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re ECF No. #8 Order (typographical error re time of Dec 19, 2019 hearing corrected; see attached image) (Service of corrected image is attached.) (DRM) Modified on 12/12/2019 to add re "hearing" (DRM). (Entered: 12/12/2019)

#8

(#8) ORDERED that Petitioner's Motion (ECF No. 5) is granted as further specified below. It is further ordered that Respondent is prohibited from removing Petitioners son, A.O.S.Q., from the jurisdiction of this Court pending the PI Hearing. It is further ordered that no person acting in concert or participating with Respondent may take any action to remove A.O.S.Q. from the jurisdiction of this Court pending a determination on the merits of this petition, or interfere with the United States Marshals Services execution of this order. It is further ordered that the Court will hold a hearing on this order on Thursday, December 19, 2019 at 10 a.m. in Courtroom 5 of this United States District Court, 400 S. Virginia St., Reno, Nevada 89501 (the TRO Hearing). At the TRO Hearing, the Court will hear any arguments for extending, modifying, or dissolving this injunction. Respondent must file a written response to Petitioners Motion by 5 p.m. on Tuesday, December 17, 2019. If Respondent does not file a written response to Petitioners Motion by that time, the Court will vacate the TRO Hearing. It is further ordered that the PI Hearing and trial on the merits of the Verified Complaint is hereby scheduled to be held on December 27, 2019 at 10 a.m. in Courtroom 5 of this United States District Court, 400 S. Virginia St., Reno, Nevada 89501. Respondent must file her response to Petitioners Motion and the Verified Complaint by Monday, December 23, 2019. Petitioner may then file a reply by Thursday, December 26, 2019. The PI Hearing will proceed regardless of whether Respondent files any written response or appears before this Court. It is further ordered that Respondent must show cause at the PI Hearing why A.O.S.Q. should not be returned to Peru, accompanied by Petitioner, where further and appropriate custody determinations can be made under Peruvian law, and why the other relief requested in the Verified Complaint should not be granted. It is further ordered that the trial of this action on the merits is advanced and consolidated with the PI Hearing. Thus, the PI Hearing will finally determine the merits of this case. It is further ordered that the United States Marshals Service will serve Respondent with a copy of this order at 7430 Casey Road, Fallon, Nevada, 89406 as soon as practicable, along with a copy of the other pleadings filed by Petitioner in this case (ECF Nos. 1, 5), in an attempt to ensure Respondents appearance at the TRO Hearing and PI Hearing in Reno. To execute this order, the United States Marshals Service may enlist the assistance of other law enforcement authorities, including the local police. It is further ordered that the United States Marshals Service will attempt to locate and take physical custody of the 9-year old A.O.S.Q. at the time they effect service solely for the purpose of transferring A.O.S.Q. to Petitioners temporary physical custody. A.O.S.Q. will then remain in Petitioners temporary custody pending the outcome of the PI Hearing, and at least until the PI Hearing. It is further ordered that Petitioner and the United States Marshals Service will coordinate on the logistics of service and transferring of custody such that A.O.S.Q. may be immediately transferred to Petitioner if the United States Marshals Service is able to locate A.O.S.Q. when they effect service of this order.It is further ordered that Respondent must immediately surrender physical custody of A.O.S.Q. to Petitioner pending the outcome of the PI Hearing, as facilitated by the United States Marshals Service at the time they effect service of this order. Failure to comply may result in the Court holding Respondent in contempt of Court until she complies. As a warning to Respondent, this could include the Court ordering Respondents arrest if she does not comply with this order, including if she resists allowing the United States Marshals Service to take custody of A.O.S.Q. for the purpose of transferring custody to Petitioner. It is further ordered that, if Respondent refuses to immediately surrender physical custody of A.O.S.Q., the United States Marshals Service is authorized to use reasonable force to take physical custody of A.O.S.Q., and enter 7430 Casey Road, Fallon, Nevada, 89406 to search the premises for A.O.S.Q.to locate A.O.S.Q. and immediately transfer physical custody of A.O.S.Q. to Petitioner pending the outcome of the PI Hearing.It is further ordered that Respondent must immediately deliver to the United States Marshals Service, for safekeeping, A.O.S.Q.s passport if it is in Respondents possession, custody, or control, and must further notify the United States Marshals Service if Respondent knows of any person having possession of such a passport. The United States Marshals Service is authorized to receive and to hold any such passport pending further instructions from this Court. It is further ordered that Respondent must be present at both the TRO Hearing and the PI Hearing in Reno. It is further ordered that Petitioner must be present at the TRO Hearing and the PI Hearing in Reno, and must also bring A.O.S.Q. to those hearings if A.O.S.Q. is in his custody. Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 12/12/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM) (Main Document 8 replaced on 12/12/2019) (DRM). (Entered: 12/12/2019)

#5

(#5) MOTION to Expedite Entry of a Temporary Restraining Order, Application for a Warrant Seeking Physical Custody of Child by Petitioner Cesar Omar Sandoval Quintana. (Winesett, Shann) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

1 #15

Exhibit Exhibits to Complaint pages 243-257

1 #14

Exhibit Exhibits to Complaint pages 225-242

1 #13

Exhibit Exhibits to Complaint pages 201-224

1 #11

Exhibit Exhibits to Complaint pages 174-188

1 #10

Exhibit Exhibits to Complaint pages 170-173

1 #9

Exhibit Exhibits to Complaint pages 166-169

1 #8

Exhibit Exhibits to Complaint pages 162-165

1 #7

Exhibit Exhibits to Complaint pages 148-161

1 #5

Exhibit Exhibits to Complaint pages 38-104

1 #4

Exhibit Exhibit to Complaint pages 11-37

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Jocelyn Mercedes Quintana Dolores (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-5802817) by Cesar Omar Sandoval Quintana. Proof of service due by 3/5/2020. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Summons, #3 Exhibit Exhibits to Complaint pages 1-10, #4 Exhibit Exhibit to Complaint pages 11-37, #5 Exhibit Exhibits to Complaint pages 38-104, #6 Exhibit Exhibits to Complaint pages 105-147, #7 Exhibit Exhibits to Complaint pages 148-161, #8 Exhibit Exhibits to Complaint pages 162-165, #9 Exhibit Exhibits to Complaint pages 166-169, #10 Exhibit Exhibits to Complaint pages 170-173, #11 Exhibit Exhibits to Complaint pages 174-188, #12 Exhibit Exhibits to Complaint pages 189-200, #13 Exhibit Exhibits to Complaint pages 201-224, #14 Exhibit Exhibits to Complaint pages 225-242, #15 Exhibit Exhibits to Complaint pages 243-257)(Winesett, Shann) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (Entered: 12/06/2019)

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 12/23/2019. By Deputy Clerk: Peggie Vannozzi. The Court has reviewed Petitioner's response to the order to show cause (ECF No. #14 .) The Court stays this matter for sixty (60) days to give Petitioner time to conduct further investigation as to whether the child was located in Fallon, Nevada at the time the petition was filed. Petitioner is directed to file a supplemental response by 2/28/2020. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PAV) Modified on 12/23/2019 to correct typo (PAV). (Entered: 12/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) RESPONSE to #13 Order to Show Cause by Petitioner Cesar Omar Sandoval Quintana. (Winesett, Shann) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ORDERED that Petitioner show cause in writing by Monday, December 23, 2019 as to why this Court has jurisdiction over this case, including by proffering supplemental evidence that A.O.S.Q. was located within the unofficial northern division of this District (see LR IA 1-6) as that term is used in 22 U.S.C. 9003(b) at the time this case was filed. It is further ordered that the orders directing the United States Marshals Service to attempt to locate A.O.S.Q. in California (ECF Nos. #11 , #12 ) are vacated. The Clerk of Court is directed to strike them from the record. It is further ordered that the hearings previously set for December 19, 2019, and December 27, 2019 (ECF Nos. #8 , #9 ) are vacated. Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 12/16/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM) (Entered: 12/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) STRICKEN pursuant to ECF No. #13 ORDER : AMENDED ORDER (re ECF No. #11 ) - The United States Marshals Service will make reasonable efforts to serve Respondent with a copy of the Order anywhere in California as soon as practicable, along with a copy of the other pleadings filed by Petitioner in this case (ECF Nos. #1 , #5 ), in an attempt to ensure Respondents appearance at the upcoming hearings in Reno, Nevada. To execute this order, the United States Marshals Service may enlist the assistance of other law enforcement authorities, including the local police and any United States Marshals Service offices in California. It is further ordered that the United States Marshals Service will attempt to locate and take physical custody of the 9-year old A.O.S.Q. in California solely for the purpose of transferring A.O.S.Q. to Petitioner's temporary physical custody. A.O.S.Q. will then remain in Petitioners temporary custody pending the outcome of the PI Hearing, and at least until the PI Hearing. It is further ordered that the Order remains in full force and effect at this time. Respondent is advised to review and comply with the Order. Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 12/13/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM) Modified on 12/16/2019 to denote STRICKEN (DRM). (Entered: 12/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) STRICKEN pursuant to ECF No. #13 ORDER : ORDERED that the United States Marshals Service will make reasonable efforts to serve Respondent with a copy of the Order anywhere in the greater Sacramento, California metropolitan area as soon as practicable, along with a copy of the other pleadings filed by Petitioner in this case (ECF Nos. #1 , #5 ), in an attempt to ensure Respondent's appearance at the upcoming hearings in Reno. To execute this order, the United States Marshals Service may enlist the assistance of other law enforcement authorities, including the local police and the United States Marshals Service Office in Sacramento. It is further ordered that the United States Marshals Service will attempt to locate and take physical custody of the 9-year old A.O.S.Q. in the greater Sacramento, California metropolitan area solely for the purpose of transferring A.O.S.Q. to Petitioner's temporary physical custody. A.O.S.Q. will then remain in Petitioner's temporary custody pending the outcome of the PI Hearing, and at least until the PI Hearing. It is further ordered that the Order remains in full force and effect at this time. Respondent is advised to review and comply with the Order. Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 12/13/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM) Modified on 12/16/2019 to denote STRICKEN (DRM). (Entered: 12/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 12/13/2019. By Deputy Clerk: Peggie Vannozzi. The Court ordered Cristina Sanchez, the Court's Certified Court Interpreter/Coordinator, to translate the order (ECF No. #8 ) for the United States Marshal Services to provide to Respondent to accommodate potential language barriers. The translated order is attached to this minute order. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PAV) (Main Document 10 replaced on 12/13/2019) (PAV). (Entered: 12/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re ECF No. #8 Order (typographical error re time of Dec 19, 2019 hearing corrected; see attached image) (Service of corrected image is attached.) (DRM) Modified on 12/12/2019 to add re "hearing" (DRM). (Entered: 12/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDERED that Petitioner's Motion (ECF No. 5) is granted as further specified below. It is further ordered that Respondent is prohibited from removing Petitioners son, A.O.S.Q., from the jurisdiction of this Court pending the PI Hearing. It is further ordered that no person acting in concert or participating with Respondent may take any action to remove A.O.S.Q. from the jurisdiction of this Court pending a determination on the merits of this petition, or interfere with the United States Marshals Services execution of this order. It is further ordered that the Court will hold a hearing on this order on Thursday, December 19, 2019 at 10 a.m. in Courtroom 5 of this United States District Court, 400 S. Virginia St., Reno, Nevada 89501 (the TRO Hearing). At the TRO Hearing, the Court will hear any arguments for extending, modifying, or dissolving this injunction. Respondent must file a written response to Petitioners Motion by 5 p.m. on Tuesday, December 17, 2019. If Respondent does not file a written response to Petitioners Motion by that time, the Court will vacate the TRO Hearing. It is further ordered that the PI Hearing and trial on the merits of the Verified Complaint is hereby scheduled to be held on December 27, 2019 at 10 a.m. in Courtroom 5 of this United States District Court, 400 S. Virginia St., Reno, Nevada 89501. Respondent must file her response to Petitioners Motion and the Verified Complaint by Monday, December 23, 2019. Petitioner may then file a reply by Thursday, December 26, 2019. The PI Hearing will proceed regardless of whether Respondent files any written response or appears before this Court. It is further ordered that Respondent must show cause at the PI Hearing why A.O.S.Q. should not be returned to Peru, accompanied by Petitioner, where further and appropriate custody determinations can be made under Peruvian law, and why the other relief requested in the Verified Complaint should not be granted. It is further ordered that the trial of this action on the merits is advanced and consolidated with the PI Hearing. Thus, the PI Hearing will finally determine the merits of this case. It is further ordered that the United States Marshals Service will serve Respondent with a copy of this order at 7430 Casey Road, Fallon, Nevada, 89406 as soon as practicable, along with a copy of the other pleadings filed by Petitioner in this case (ECF Nos. 1, 5), in an attempt to ensure Respondents appearance at the TRO Hearing and PI Hearing in Reno. To execute this order, the United States Marshals Service may enlist the assistance of other law enforcement authorities, including the local police. It is further ordered that the United States Marshals Service will attempt to locate and take physical custody of the 9-year old A.O.S.Q. at the time they effect service solely for the purpose of transferring A.O.S.Q. to Petitioners temporary physical custody. A.O.S.Q. will then remain in Petitioners temporary custody pending the outcome of the PI Hearing, and at least until the PI Hearing. It is further ordered that Petitioner and the United States Marshals Service will coordinate on the logistics of service and transferring of custody such that A.O.S.Q. may be immediately transferred to Petitioner if the United States Marshals Service is able to locate A.O.S.Q. when they effect service of this order.It is further ordered that Respondent must immediately surrender physical custody of A.O.S.Q. to Petitioner pending the outcome of the PI Hearing, as facilitated by the United States Marshals Service at the time they effect service of this order. Failure to comply may result in the Court holding Respondent in contempt of Court until she complies. As a warning to Respondent, this could include the Court ordering Respondents arrest if she does not comply with this order, including if she resists allowing the United States Marshals Service to take custody of A.O.S.Q. for the purpose of transferring custody to Petitioner. It is further ordered that, if Respondent refuses to immediately surrender physical custody of A.O.S.Q., the United States Marshals Service is authorized to use reasonable force to take physical custody of A.O.S.Q., and enter 7430 Casey Road, Fallon, Nevada, 89406 to search the premises for A.O.S.Q.to locate A.O.S.Q. and immediately transfer physical custody of A.O.S.Q. to Petitioner pending the outcome of the PI Hearing.It is further ordered that Respondent must immediately deliver to the United States Marshals Service, for safekeeping, A.O.S.Q.s passport if it is in Respondents possession, custody, or control, and must further notify the United States Marshals Service if Respondent knows of any person having possession of such a passport. The United States Marshals Service is authorized to receive and to hold any such passport pending further instructions from this Court. It is further ordered that Respondent must be present at both the TRO Hearing and the PI Hearing in Reno. It is further ordered that Petitioner must be present at the TRO Hearing and the PI Hearing in Reno, and must also bring A.O.S.Q. to those hearings if A.O.S.Q. is in his custody. Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 12/12/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM) (Main Document 8 replaced on 12/12/2019) (DRM). (Entered: 12/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Motion Hearing held on 12/12/2019 before Chief Judge Miranda M. Du. Crtrm Administrator: T. Renfro; Pla Counsel: Shann Winesett; Court Reporter: Amber McClane; Time of Hearing: 8:03 - 8:37 a.m.; Courtroom: 4B; The Court Interpreter, Cristina Sanchez, is present to interpret for Plaintiff. Also present (telephonically from Reno) is Courtroom Administrator Peggie Vannozzi and Deputy U.S. Marshal Richard Manning. The Court advises Mr. Winesett that it has reviewed the complaint (ECF No. #1 ) and the motion (ECF No. 4 .) Mr. Winesett answers questions posed by the Court. Plaintiff, through the interpreter, answers questions. Deputy Manning answers questions posed by the Court. The Court makes findings for the record. A written order will issue. The Court sets a pre-preliminary hearing for 12/19/2019 at 2:00 PM. In the order the Court will issue, Defendant will be ordered to file a response by the end of the day on 12/17/2019. If Defendant does not respond, the hearing will be vacated. The preliminary injunction hearing is set for 12/27/2019 at 10:00 AM in Reno Courtroom 5 before Chief Judge Miranda M. Du. In light of the representations made by Mr. Winesett that the Plaintiff is indigent, the requirement for a bond is waived. The Court, counsel and Deputy Manning discuss issues surrounding the service of the order on the child and Defendant. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION to Expedite Entry of a Temporary Restraining Order, Application for a Warrant Seeking Physical Custody of Child by Petitioner Cesar Omar Sandoval Quintana. (Winesett, Shann) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • Docket(#4) STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Miranda M. Du. Chief Judge Du's Civil Standing Order is posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website and may be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PAV) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS ISSUED as to Jocelyn Mercedes Quintana Dolores. (DRM) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketCase randomly assigned to Chief Judge Miranda M. Du and Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb. (WJ) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Cesar Omar Sandoval Quintana. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Winesett, Shann) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Jocelyn Mercedes Quintana Dolores (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-5802817) by Cesar Omar Sandoval Quintana. Proof of service due by 3/5/2020. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Summons, #3 Exhibit Exhibits to Complaint pages 1-10, #4 Exhibit Exhibit to Complaint pages 11-37, #5 Exhibit Exhibits to Complaint pages 38-104, #6 Exhibit Exhibits to Complaint pages 105-147, #7 Exhibit Exhibits to Complaint pages 148-161, #8 Exhibit Exhibits to Complaint pages 162-165, #9 Exhibit Exhibits to Complaint pages 166-169, #10 Exhibit Exhibits to Complaint pages 170-173, #11 Exhibit Exhibits to Complaint pages 174-188, #12 Exhibit Exhibits to Complaint pages 189-200, #13 Exhibit Exhibits to Complaint pages 201-224, #14 Exhibit Exhibits to Complaint pages 225-242, #15 Exhibit Exhibits to Complaint pages 243-257)(Winesett, Shann) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less